Holloway v. Loera et al
Plaintiff: Andwanita Holloway
Defendant: Bertha Zepeda Loera and FD Nevada, LLC
Case Number: 2:2019cv01726
Filed: October 4, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Presiding Judge: Jennifer A Dorsey
Referring Judge: Nancy J Koppe
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 18, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER Granting #7 Stipulation re Rule 26(f) Conference. The deadline to hold the Rule 26(f) conference is extended to 3/18/2020 with the resulting proposed discovery plan to be filed by 3/25/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 11/18/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
November 15, 2019 Filing 7 First STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME (First Request) re Discovery To Stay Discovery Pending Final Settlement Agreement by Plaintiff Andwanita Holloway. (Ladah, Ramzy)
October 7, 2019 Filing 6 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 10/7/2019. Defendants filed an answer prior to removal. Docket No. 1-8. The Court hereby ORDERS that a proposed discovery plan must be filed by November 18, 2019. IT IS SO ORDERED. (no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - TM)
October 4, 2019 Filing 5 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 10/4/2019. Joint Status Report regarding removed action is due by 11/3/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
October 4, 2019 Case randomly assigned to Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey and Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe. (ADR)
October 4, 2019 Filing 4 STATEMENT REGARDING REMOVAL by Defendants Bertha Zepeda Loera and FD Nevada, LLC. (Clark, Troy) Modified on 10/5/2019 to include additional filing party (MMM).
October 4, 2019 Filing 3 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Bertha Zepeda Loera. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Clark, Troy)
October 4, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET to #1 Petition for Removal,, by Defendant Bertha Zepeda Loera. (Clark, Troy)
October 4, 2019 Filing 1 PETITION FOR REMOVAL from Eighth Judicial District Court, Case Number A-19-802532-C, (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0978-5726685) by Bertha Zepeda Loera. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit, #8 Exhibit, #9 Exhibit, #10 Exhibit)(Clark, Troy) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Holloway v. Loera et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Andwanita Holloway
Represented By: Ramzy P Ladah
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bertha Zepeda Loera
Represented By: Troy Clark
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FD Nevada, LLC
Represented By: Ramzy P Ladah
Represented By: Troy Clark
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?