Lechuga v. Ramparts, LLC
Plaintiff: Bryant Lechuga
Defendant: Ramparts, LLC and MGM Resorts International
Case Number: 2:2019cv01731
Filed: October 4, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Presiding Judge: Andrew P Gordon
Referring Judge: Brenda Weksler
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 28, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 21 SCHEDULING ORDER Granting #20 Discovery Plan and Scheduling Order. Discovery due by 5/4/2020. Motions due by 6/3/2020. Proposed Joint Pretrial Order due by 7/3/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brenda Weksler on 11/20/2019.(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JQC)
November 19, 2019 Filing 20 Stipulated Discovery Plan and Scheduling Order by Defendant Ramparts, LLC. (Christensen, Deverie)
November 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER Granting #18 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brenda Weksler on 11/12/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JQC)
November 6, 2019 Filing 18 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Donald P. Paradiso for Defendant Ramparts, LLC. (Christensen, Deverie)
November 6, 2019 Filing 17 ANSWER to #13 Amended Complaint filed by Ramparts, LLC.(Christensen, Deverie)
November 4, 2019 Filing 16 Joint STATUS REPORT Regarding Removal by Defendant Ramparts, LLC. (Christensen, Deverie)
October 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER. IT IS ORDERED that #8 the defendants' motion to dismiss is DENIED as moot because it is directed at the original complaint. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 10/28/2019.(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JQC)
October 23, 2019 Filing 14 RESPONSE to #8 Motion to Dismiss by Plaintiff Bryant Lechuga. Replies due by 10/30/2019. (Kemp, James)
October 23, 2019 Filing 13 First AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Ramparts, LLC by Bryant Lechuga. Removes parties. Proof of service due by 1/21/2020.(Kemp, James)
October 21, 2019 Filing 12 STATEMENT REGARDING REMOVAL by Defendants MGM Resorts International, Ramparts, LLC. (Christensen, Deverie)
October 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER setting Early Neutral Evaluation session. Early Neutral Evaluation session is hereby scheduled to commence 12/10/2019 at 9:30 a.m. in the chambers of the undersigned magistrate judge on the third floor of the Lloyd D. George United States Courthouse, 333 Las Vegas Boulevard South, Las Vegas, Nevada. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 10/10/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JQC)
October 10, 2019 Filing 10 CLERK'S NOTICE pursuant to Local Rule 16-6 this case has been assigned to the Early Neutral Evaluation Program. Magistrate Judge Koppe is randomly reassigned as the evaluating judge in this case. (no image attached) (RFJ)
October 9, 2019 Filing 9 ANSWER re #1 Petition for Removal, filed by Ramparts, LLC. Discovery Plan/Scheduling Order due by 11/23/2019.(Christensen, Deverie) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court.
October 9, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION to Dismiss by Defendants MGM Resorts International, Ramparts, LLC. Responses due by 10/23/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B) (Christensen, Deverie)
October 8, 2019 Filing 7 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Bryant Lechuga. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Kemp, James)
October 7, 2019 Filing 6 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Magistrate Judge Elayna J. Youchah on 10/7/2019. By Judicial Assistant: E. Santiago. With good cause appearing, the Honorable Magistrate Judge Elayna J. Youchah recuses herself in this action. IT IS ORDERED that this action is referred to the Clerk for random reassignment of this case for all further proceedings. (no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ES)
October 4, 2019 Filing 5 STANDING ORDER. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Andrew P. Gordon. Judge Gordon's Chambers Practices, which are posted on the U.S. District Court, District of Nevada public website, may also be accessed directly via this hyperlink: #www.nvd.uscourts.gov. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DKJ)
October 4, 2019 Filing 4 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Ramparts, LLC that identifies all parties that have an interest in the outcome of this case. Corporate Parent Mandalay Resort Group, Corporate Parent MGM Resorts International for Ramparts, LLC added. (Christensen, Deverie)
October 4, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE: Pursuant to Local Rule 16-6 this case has been assigned to the Early Neutral Evaluation Program. Magistrate Judge Elayna J. Youchah will be the evaluating judge in this case. (no image attached) (JQC)
October 4, 2019 Filing 2 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 10/4/2019. Statement regarding removed action is due by 10/19/2019. Joint Status Report regarding removed action is due by 11/3/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JQC)
October 4, 2019 Case randomly assigned to Judge Andrew P. Gordon and Magistrate Judge Brenda Weksler. (JQC)
October 4, 2019 Filing 1 PETITION FOR REMOVAL from District Court Clark County Nevada, Case Number A-19-797249-C, (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0978-5726947) by MGM Resorts International, Ramparts, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Errata B)(Christensen, Deverie) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lechuga v. Ramparts, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ramparts, LLC
Represented By: Deverie J. Christensen
Represented By: Donald P. Paradiso
Represented By: Joshua A Sliker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MGM Resorts International
Represented By: Deverie J. Christensen
Represented By: Donald P. Paradiso
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bryant Lechuga
Represented By: James P. Kemp
Represented By: Victoria Lynn Neal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?