Stradley v. Dzurenda et al
Plaintiff: Mark Stradley
Defendant: G. Bryan, J. Dzurenda, M. Minev, B. Williams and B Faulkner
Case Number: 2:2019cv01748
Filed: October 7, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Presiding Judge: Daniel J Albregts
Referring Judge: Gloria M Navarro
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 6, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 5, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION to Extend Time (Second Request) re #5 Order, filed by Plaintiff Mark Stradley. (ADR)
November 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER Granting #4 Motion to Extend Time. Fully complete application to proceed in forma pauperis or payment of filing fees due 12/9/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Daniel J. Albregts on 11/5/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
November 1, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION to Extend Time (First Request) re #3 Order on Application to Proceed in forma pauperis, filed by Plaintiff Mark Stradley. (ADR)
October 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER Denying #1 Application for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. File a fully complete application to proceed in forma pauperis or Payment of filing fees due within 30 days. Signed by Magistrate Judge Daniel J. Albregts on 10/9/2019.(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - Encl.: application to proceed in forma pauperis by a prisoner w/ instructions - ADR)
October 8, 2019 Filing 2 ADVISORY LETTER to litigant. (ADR)
October 7, 2019 Filing 1 APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, filed by Plaintiff Mark Stradley. (Attachments: #1 Complaint, #2 Motion for Preliminary Injunction, #3 Motion to Extend Prison Copywork/Appointment of Counsel)(ADR)
October 7, 2019 Case randomly assigned to Judge Gloria M. Navarro and Magistrate Judge Daniel J. Albregts. (RT)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Stradley v. Dzurenda et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: G. Bryan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J. Dzurenda
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M. Minev
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: B. Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: B Faulkner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mark Stradley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?