United States of America v. Jhun et al
Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: Wells Fargo Bank N.A., Brandon A. Jhun, Elske Van Hemert and LN Management LLC Series 7241 Brook Crest
Case Number: 2:2019cv01749
Filed: October 8, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Presiding Judge: Kent J Dawson
Referring Judge: Andrew P Gordon
2 Judge: Nancy J Koppe
Nature of Suit: Taxes
Cause of Action: 26:7401
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 8, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 26, 2019 Filing 6 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by United States of America re #2 Summons Issued. Wells Fargo Bank N.A. waiver sent on 11/21/2019, answer due 1/20/2020. (Kukso, Boris)
November 18, 2019 Filing 5 STANDING ORDER. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Andrew P. Gordon. Judge Gordon's Chambers Practices, which are posted on the U.S. District Court, District of Nevada public website, may also be accessed directly via this hyperlink: #www.nvd.uscourts.gov. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MAJ)
November 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. This case is reassigned to Judge Andrew P. Gordon for all further proceedings. All further documents must bear the correct case number 2:19-cv-01749-APG-NJK. Signed by Judge Kent J. Dawson on 11/15/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
November 14, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE OF RELATED CASES 2:14-cv-01936-APG-EJY by Plaintiff United States of America. (Kukso, Boris)
October 8, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to All Defendants re #1 Complaint. (SLD)
October 8, 2019 Case randomly assigned to Judge Kent J. Dawson and Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe. (SLD)
October 8, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants by United States of America. Proof of service due by 1/6/2020. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Summons)(Kukso, Boris) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. Jhun et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wells Fargo Bank N.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brandon A. Jhun
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Elske Van Hemert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LN Management LLC Series 7241 Brook Crest
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Boris Kukso
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?