Cenegenics, LLC v. Gaines et al
Plaintiff: Cenegenics, LLC
Defendant: The Anti-Aging Group, LLC, Dr. Richard Gaines, Gainswave, Hormone Clinics, Lifegaines Medical and Aesthetics LLC, Sexual MD Solutions, LLC and Anti-Aging Group, LLC
Case Number: 2:2019cv01797
Filed: October 15, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Presiding Judge: Cam Ferenbach
Referring Judge: James C Mahan
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:1114
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 12, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 9, 2019 Filing 29 REPLY to Response to #21 Motion to Dismiss by Defendants Richard Gaines, Lifegaines Medical and Aesthetics LLC. (Torsiello, Dominique)
December 2, 2019 Filing 28 RESPONSE to #21 Motion to Dismiss by Plaintiff Cenegenics, LLC. Replies due by 12/9/2019. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Paul Adams, #2 Exhibit A to Adams Declaration, #3 Declaration of Matthew D. Murphey, #4 Exhibit 1 to Murphey Declaration, #5 Exhibit 2 to Murphey Declaration, #6 Exhibit 3 to Murphey Declaration, #7 Exhibit 4 to Murphey Declaration, #8 Exhibit 5 to Murphey Declaration) (Murphey, Matthew)
November 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER granting #11 Verified Petition for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Daniel Lustig for Richard Gaines,Daniel Lustig for Lifegaines Medical and Aesthetics LLC and approving Designation of Local Counsel F. Christopher Austin. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 11/20/2019. Any Attorney not yet registered with the Court's CM/ECF System shall submit a Registration Form on the Court's website #www.nvd.uscourts.gov(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
November 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER granting #22 Stipulation; Anti-Aging Group, LLC answer due 11/25/2019; Hormone Clinics answer due 11/25/2019; Sexual MD Solutions, LLC answer due 11/25/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 11/19/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
November 19, 2019 Filing 25 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Richard Gaines, Lifegaines Medical and Aesthetics LLC that identifies all parties that have an interest in the outcome of this case. Corporate Parent CBO LLC, Other Affiliate Amy Steffey for Lifegaines Medical and Aesthetics LLC added. (Austin, F.)
November 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER granting #17 Verified Petition for Permission for Matthew Daniel Murphey to Practice Pro Hac Vice and approving Designation of Local Counsel Maximilien D. Fetaz. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 11/19/2019. Any Attorney not yet registered with the Court's CM/ECF System shall submit a Registration Form on the Court's website #www.nvd.uscourts.gov(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
November 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER granting #12 Verified Petition for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Dominique Torsiello for Richard Gaines,Dominique Torsiello for Lifegaines Medical and Aesthetics LLC and approving Designation of Local Counsel F. Christopher Austin. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 11/19/2019. Any Attorney not yet registered with the Court's CM/ECF System shall submit a Registration Form on the Court's website #www.nvd.uscourts.gov(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM) Modified to correct linkage on 11/19/2019 (JM).
November 19, 2019 Filing 22 STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME (First Request) for Defendants The Anti-Aging Group, LLC, Sexual MD Solutions, LLC, and Hormone Clinics to Respond to the Complaint by Plaintiff Cenegenics, LLC. (Fetaz, Maximilien)
November 18, 2019 Filing 21 MOTION to Dismiss #1 Complaint,, by Defendants Richard Gaines, Lifegaines Medical and Aesthetics LLC. Responses due by 12/2/2019. (Austin, F.)
November 18, 2019 Filing 20 NOTICE of Corrected Image/Document re #15 Notice of Corrected Image/Document, #11 Motion for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice - Verified Petition, by Defendants Richard Gaines, Lifegaines Medical and Aesthetics LLC. (Service of corrected image is attached.) (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing) (Austin, F.)
November 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER granting #14 Stipulation; Richard Gaines answer due 11/18/2019; Lifegaines Medical and Aesthetics LLC answer due 11/18/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 11/15/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
November 15, 2019 Filing 18 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Judge James C. Mahan on 11/15/2019 Re: #15 Notice of Corrected Image/Document for #11 Motion for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice - Verified Petition. ERROR: The Notary Public's signature is missing on page 4, lines 11-13. CORRECTION:The Notary Public shall correctly sign her/his name. Attorney Daniel Lustig is to file the corrected Motion /Verified Petition using the Notice of Corrected Image/Document event and link to document #11 .(no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - NEV)
November 14, 2019 Filing 17 MOTION/VERIFIED PETITION for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice by Matthew Murphey and DESIGNATION of Local Counsel Maximilien D. Fetaz (Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 0978-5777286) by Plaintiff Cenegenics, LLC. (Fetaz, Maximilien) Modified to un-terminate on 11/19/2019 (JM).
November 14, 2019 Filing 16 NOTICE of Corrected Image/Document re #12 Motion for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice - Verified Petition, by Defendants Richard Gaines, Lifegaines Medical and Aesthetics LLC. (Service of corrected image is attached.) (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing) (Austin, F.)
November 14, 2019 Filing 15 NOTICE of Corrected Image/Document re #11 Motion for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice - Verified Petition, by Defendants Richard Gaines, Lifegaines Medical and Aesthetics LLC. (Service of corrected image is attached.) (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing) (Austin, F.)
November 7, 2019 Filing 14 STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME (First Request) re #1 Complaint,, by Defendants Richard Gaines, Lifegaines Medical and Aesthetics LLC. (Austin, F.)
November 7, 2019 Filing 13 CLERK'S NOTICE of violation of LR IA 11-2. Attorney Action Required to ECF No. #11 and #12 . Documents are not on the form furnished by the clerk.Counsel is advised to download and complete the "Verified Petition" form from this Court's website and refile using the event Notice of Corrected Image/Document and link to #11 and #12 . (no image attached) (NEV)
November 7, 2019 Filing 12 View Corrected Image #16 as to MOTION/VERIFIED PETITION for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice by Dominique J. Torsiello and DESIGNATION of Local Counsel F. Christopher Austin (Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 0978-5767873) by Defendants Richard Gaines, Lifegaines Medical and Aesthetics LLC. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing) (Austin, F.) Modified to terminate on 11/19/2019 (JM).
November 7, 2019 Filing 11 View Corrected Image #20 as to MOTION/VERIFIED PETITION for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice by Daniel Lustig and DESIGNATION of Local Counsel F. Christopher Austin (Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 0978-5767848) by Defendants Richard Gaines, Lifegaines Medical and Aesthetics LLC. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing) (Austin, F.) Modified on 11/19/2019 to reflect new corrected image filed (EDS).
October 23, 2019 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Cenegenics, LLC. Lifegaines Medical and Aesthetics LLC served on 10/17/2019, answer due 11/7/2019. (Fetaz, Maximilien)
October 23, 2019 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Cenegenics, LLC. Hormone Clinics served on 10/17/2019, answer due 11/7/2019. (Fetaz, Maximilien)
October 23, 2019 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Cenegenics, LLC. Anti-Aging Group, LLC served on 10/17/2019, answer due 11/7/2019. (Fetaz, Maximilien)
October 23, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Cenegenics, LLC. Sexual MD Solutions, LLC served on 10/17/2019, answer due 11/7/2019. (Fetaz, Maximilien)
October 16, 2019 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to All Defendants re #1 Complaint. (ADR)
October 16, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE TO COUNSEL PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE IA 11-2. Counsel Matthew Daniel Murphey to comply with completion and filing of the Verified Petition and Designation of Local Counsel. For your convenience, click on the following link to obtain the form from the Court's website - #www.nvd.uscourts.gov. Upon approval of the Verified Petition, counsel is required to register for the Court's Case Management and Electronic Case Filing (CM/ECF) system and the electronic service of documents. Please visit the Court's website www.nvd.uscourts.gov to register Attorney. Verified Petition due by 11/30/2019. (no image attached) (ADR)
October 16, 2019 Filing 4 AO 120 - REPORT on the filing or determination of an action regarding a patent or trademark. E-mailed to the US Patent and Trademark Office. (Attachments: #1 Complaint) (ADR)
October 15, 2019 Case randomly assigned to Judge James C. Mahan and Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach. (ADR)
October 15, 2019 Filing 3 PROPOSED SUMMONS to be issued by Plaintiff Cenegenics, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons)(Fetaz, Maximilien)
October 15, 2019 Filing 2 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Cenegenics, LLC. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Fetaz, Maximilien)
October 15, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Richard Gaines, Gainswave, Hormone Clinics, Lifegaines Medical and Aesthetics LLC, Sexual MD Solutions, LLC, The Anti-Aging Group, LLC (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0978-5738686) by Cenegenics, LLC. Proof of service due by 1/13/2020. (Attachments: #1 Index, #2 Exhibit A and B, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Fetaz, Maximilien) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cenegenics, LLC v. Gaines et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Anti-Aging Group, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dr. Richard Gaines
Represented By: F. Christopher Austin
Represented By: Daniel Lustig
Represented By: Dominique Julia Torsiello
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gainswave
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hormone Clinics
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lifegaines Medical and Aesthetics LLC
Represented By: F. Christopher Austin
Represented By: Daniel Lustig
Represented By: Dominique Julia Torsiello
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sexual MD Solutions, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anti-Aging Group, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cenegenics, LLC
Represented By: Michael D Rounds
Represented By: Maximilien Fetaz
Represented By: Matthew Daniel Murphey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?