Martin v. Williams et al
Plaintiff: Weslie Martin
Defendant: Cossman, Martinez, Rangel, Berry, James Dzurenda, Brian Williams, George Taino and Dugan
Case Number: 2:2019cv01815
Filed: October 16, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Presiding Judge: Jennifer A Dorsey
Referring Judge: Brenda Weksler
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 8, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 11, 2019 Filing 6 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Magistrate Judge Brenda Weksler on 12/11/2019. MOTIONS: A document requesting a court order must be styled as a motion, not a letter. See Federal Rules of Civil Procedure 7. Letters to a judge will be disregarded. (Attachments: #1 Letter) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
December 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER denying #4 Motion/Application for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis Payment of filing fees or IFP due within 30 days from date of this order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brenda Weksler on 12/2/2019.(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF, cc: IFP to P - JM)
November 12, 2019 Filing 4 APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Weslie Martin. (MR)
October 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER. IT IS ORDERED that #1 Plaintiff's application to proceed in forma pauperis is DENIED without prejudice to file a new application. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk of the Court will retain #1 -1 the complaint but will not file it at this time. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brenda Weksler on 10/23/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - Prisoner IFP instructions/form mailed to P - MR)
October 17, 2019 Filing 2 ADVISORY LETTER to litigant. (MR)
October 16, 2019 Filing 1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Weslie Martin. (Attachments: #1 Complaint, #2 Motion for Preliminary Injunction, #3 Declaration, #4 Request for Appointment of Counsel, #5 Proposed Summons w/USM-285 Forms) (MR)
October 16, 2019 Case randomly assigned to Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey and Magistrate Judge Brenda Weksler. (RT)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Martin v. Williams et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cossman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Martinez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rangel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Berry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Dzurenda
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brian Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: George Taino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dugan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Weslie Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?