T1 Payments LLC v. New U Life Corporation
Plaintiff: T1 Payments LLC
Defendant: New U Life Corporation
Interested Party: Rome & Associates, A.P.C. and Bradley O Cebeci
Case Number: 2:2019cv01816
Filed: October 17, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Presiding Judge: Daniel J Albregts
Referring Judge: Andrew P Gordon
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 23, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 24, 2020 Filing 83 REPLY to Response to #78 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages, by Plaintiff T1 Payments LLC, Counter Defendant T1 Payments LLC. (Kennedy, Dennis)
November 20, 2020 Filing 82 REPLY to RESPONSE to #72 Motion to Compel by Defendant New U Life Corporation. (Premsrirut, Puoy) Modified on 11/21/2020 to link to underlying motion per LR IC 2-2 (MMM).
November 20, 2020 Filing 81 ERRATA to #73 Response by Defendant New U Life Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (Premsrirut, Puoy)
November 17, 2020 Filing 80 RESPONSE/OBJECTION to #79 REPLY to Response to #64 Motion to Disqualify Counsel and #78 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages, by Interested Parties Bradley O Cebeci, Rome & Associates, A.P.C.. Replies due by 11/24/2020. (Bice, Todd) Modified on 11/17/2020 to reflect correct docket entry relationship (MMM).
November 16, 2020 Filing 79 REPLY to Response to #64 Motion to Disqualify Counsel by Plaintiff T1 Payments LLC, Counter Defendant T1 Payments LLC. (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit 36, #3 Exhibit 37, #4 Exhibit 38, #5 Exhibit 39, #6 Exhibit 40, #7 Exhibit 41, #8 Exhibit 42) (Kennedy, Dennis)
November 16, 2020 Filing 78 MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages re #79 REPLY to Response to #64 Motion to Disqualify Counsel by Plaintiff T1 Payments LLC, Counter Defendant T1 Payments LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1) (Kennedy, Dennis) Modified on 11/17/2020 to add document link (MMM).
November 16, 2020 Filing 77 REPLY to Response to #62 Motion for Protective Order,,, by Plaintiff T1 Payments LLC, Counter Defendant T1 Payments LLC. (Attachments: #1 Index Index of Exhibits to T1 Payments LLC's Reply in Support of Its Motion for Protective Order, #2 Exhibit Exhibit A Oct. 27, 2020 e-mail from M. Scarborough, Esq. regarding NewU Life's subpeona to Mastercard) (Kaplan, Kory)
November 13, 2020 Filing 76 RESPONSE to #72 Motion to Compel by Plaintiff T1 Payments LLC, Counter Defendant T1 Payments LLC. Replies due by 11/20/2020. (Attachments: #1 Index Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit Exhibit A Declaration of Ari N. Rothman) (Kaplan, Kory)
November 9, 2020 Filing 75 JOINDER to #73 Response by Defendant New U Life Corporation. (Premsrirut, Puoy)
November 9, 2020 Filing 74 RESPONSE to #62 Motion for Protective Order,,, by Counter Claimants New U Life Corporation, New U Life Corporation, Defendant New U Life Corporation. Replies due by 11/16/2020. (Attachments: #1 Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit A - Visa subpoena, #3 Exhibit B- Mastercard subpoena, #4 Exhibit C - Priority subpoena, #5 Exhibit D - email re Model Protective Order) (Dahlberg, Brianna)
November 9, 2020 Filing 73 RESPONSE to #64 Motion to Disqualify Counsel by Bradley O. Cebeci and Rome & Associates, A.P.C. Replies due by 11/16/2020. (Bice, Todd) Modified text on 11/10/2020 (EDS).
October 30, 2020 Filing 72 MOTION to Compel Discovery Responses by Defendant New U Life Corporation. Responses due by 11/13/2020. (Attachments: #1 Index, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C) (Premsrirut, Puoy)
October 27, 2020 Filing 71 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Magistrate Judge Daniel J. Albregts on 10/27/2020. ORDER granting #63 Motion; In light of the fact that the #62 Motion for Protective Order is not ripe, the Court will grant the stay of production of documents at issue until it issues an order on the underlying Motion for Protective Order once it is fully briefed. (no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KB)
October 27, 2020 Filing 70 ERRATA to #57 Response by Defendant New U Life Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit B) (Premsrirut, Puoy)
October 26, 2020 Filing 69 APPENDIX Volume 5 of 5 to #64 Motion to Disqualify Counsel by Plaintiff T1 Payments LLC, Counter Defendant T1 Payments LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 31, #2 Exhibit 32, #3 Exhibit 33, #4 Exhibit 34, #5 Exhibit 35) (Kennedy, Dennis)
October 26, 2020 Filing 68 APPENDIX Volume 4 of 5 to #64 Motion to Disqualify Counsel by Plaintiff T1 Payments LLC, Counter Defendant T1 Payments LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 24a, #2 Exhibit 24b, #3 Exhibit 24c, #4 Exhibit 25, #5 Exhibit 26, #6 Exhibit 27, #7 Exhibit 28, #8 Exhibit 29, #9 Exhibit 30) (Kennedy, Dennis)
October 26, 2020 Filing 67 APPENDIX Volume 3 of 5 to #64 Motion to Disqualify Counsel by Plaintiff T1 Payments LLC, Counter Defendant T1 Payments LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 20, #2 Exhibit 21a, #3 Exhibit 21b, #4 Exhibit 22, #5 Exhibit 23) (Kennedy, Dennis)
October 26, 2020 Filing 66 APPENDIX Volume 2 of 5 to #64 Motion to Disqualify Counsel by Plaintiff T1 Payments LLC, Counter Defendant T1 Payments LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 18, #2 Exhibit 19a, #3 Errata 19b) (Kennedy, Dennis)
October 26, 2020 Filing 65 APPENDIX Volume 1 of 5 to #64 Motion to Disqualify Counsel by Plaintiff T1 Payments LLC, Counter Defendant T1 Payments LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit 13, #14 Exhibit 14a, #15 Exhibit 14b, #16 Exhibit 15, #17 Exhibit 16, #18 Exhibit 17) (Kennedy, Dennis)
October 26, 2020 Filing 64 MOTION to Disqualify Counsel New U Life Corporation's Counsel by Plaintiff T1 Payments LLC, Counter Defendant T1 Payments LLC. (Kennedy, Dennis)
October 26, 2020 Filing 63 Emergency MOTION to Stay Production of Documents re #62 Motion,, by Plaintiff T1 Payments LLC, Counter Defendant T1 Payments LLC. Responses due by 11/9/2020. (Attachments: #1 Index Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit Visa Counsel Email Chain, #3 Exhibit Declaration of Ari N. Rothman, #4 Exhibit October 14, 2020 Email Chain, #5 Exhibit Mastercard Counsel Email Chain, #6 Exhibit Meet and Confer Email Chain, #7 Exhibit Notices of Subpoenas Third Parties, #8 Exhibit Declaration of Andrea Strachan) (Kaplan, Kory)
October 26, 2020 Filing 62 MOTION for Protective Order by Plaintiff T1 Payments LLC, Counter Defendant T1 Payments LLC. Responses due by 11/9/2020. (Attachments: #1 Index Index of Exhibits to T1 Payments LLC's Motion for Protective Order, #2 Exhibit Subpoena to Mastercard, #3 Exhibit Subpoena to Visa, #4 Exhibit Subpeona to Priority Payment, #5 Exhibit Declaration of Ari Rothman, #6 Exhibit Exhbit E July 2018 email from Marc Lefebvr to Zuly Cruz, etal., #7 Exhibit Email from Kami DiSavio to Ari Rothman, #8 Exhibit October 22 Email from Eugene Rome, #9 Exhibit New U Life Interrogatory Responses, #10 Exhibit Declaration of Andrea Strachan, #11 Exhibit Email Chain with Mastercard Counsel) (Kaplan, Kory) Modified on 10/26/2020 to change motion type from Motion for Misc Relief to Motion for Protective Order (MMM).
October 26, 2020 Filing 61 REPLY to Response to #49 Motion to Compel,, by Plaintiff T1 Payments LLC, Counter Defendant T1 Payments LLC. (Kaplan, Kory)
October 23, 2020 Filing 60 RESPONSE to #50 Motion to Extend/Shorten Time by Plaintiff T1 Payments LLC, Counter Defendant T1 Payments LLC. Replies due by 10/30/2020. (Kaplan, Kory)
October 22, 2020 Filing 59 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Dennis L. Kennedy on behalf of Plaintiff T1 Payments LLC, Counter Defendant T1 Payments LLC. (Kennedy, Dennis)
October 22, 2020 Filing 58 REPLY to RESPONSE to #42 Motion for Leave to File Document by Defendant New U Life Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Index, #2 Declaration of Brianna Dahlberg, #3 Exhibit A) (Premsrirut, Puoy) Modified text on 10/22/2020 (MMM).
October 19, 2020 Filing 57 RESPONSE to #49 Motion to Compel,, by Defendant New U Life Corporation. Replies due by 10/26/2020. (Attachments: #1 Index, #2 Exhibit A) (Premsrirut, Puoy)
October 19, 2020 Filing 56 REPLY to Response to #47 Motion to Vacate,, by Plaintiff T1 Payments LLC, Counter Defendant T1 Payments LLC. (Kaplan, Kory)
October 16, 2020 Filing 55 RESPONSE to #47 Motion to Vacate,, by Counter Claimants New U Life Corporation, New U Life Corporation, Defendant New U Life Corporation. Replies due by 10/23/2020. (Dahlberg, Brianna)
October 15, 2020 Filing 54 RESPONSE to #52 Response/Objection to #51 Notice of Related Cases by Counter Claimants New U Life Corporation, New U Life Corporation, Defendant New U Life Corporation. (Dahlberg, Brianna) Modified on 10/16/2020 to add document link (MMM).
October 15, 2020 Filing 53 RESPONSE to #42 Motion for Leave to File Document by Plaintiff T1 Payments LLC, Counter Defendant T1 Payments LLC. Replies due by 10/22/2020. (Attachments: #1 Index Index of Exhibits to T1 Payments LLC'S Opposition to New U Life Corporation's Motion for Leave to File First Amended Counterclaim, #2 Exhibit Motion for Leave, #3 Exhibit Screenshots of LegitScript- Somaderm, #4 Exhibit October 7, 2020, Letter from Puoy Premsrirut, #5 Exhibit FTC Complaint in FTC v. APEX CAPITAL GROUP, LLC, #6 Exhibit FTC Complaint in FTC v. E.M. SYSTEMS & SERVICES, LLC, et al, #7 Exhibit Declaration of Andrea Strachan in Opposition to New U Life Corporation's Motio for Leave to File First Amended Counterclaim, #8 Exhibit Sample of Chargeback Notices from T1 Payments to New U Life) (Kaplan, Kory)
October 15, 2020 Filing 52 RESPONSE to #51 Notice of Related Cases by Plaintiff T1 Payments LLC, Counter Defendant T1 Payments LLC. (Kaplan, Kory)
October 14, 2020 Filing 51 NOTICE OF RELATED CASES 2:20-cv-01816-APG-DJA, 2:20-cv-00411-KJD-VCF and 2:20-cv-01405-JCM-VCF by Defendant New U Life Corporation. (Premsrirut, Puoy)
October 9, 2020 Filing 50 MOTION to Extend Time (Fourth Request) re #39 Order on Stipulation,, Scheduling Order, by Counter Claimants New U Life Corporation, New U Life Corporation, Defendant New U Life Corporation. (Dahlberg, Brianna)
October 5, 2020 Filing 49 MOTION to Compel by Plaintiff T1 Payments LLC, Counter Defendant T1 Payments LLC. Responses due by 10/19/2020. (Attachments: #1 Index Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit Requests to be Compelled, #3 Exhibit Amari Research Emails, #4 Exhibit Declaration of A. Rothman, #5 Exhibit Email correspondence April 21, #6 Exhibit Email correspondence August 18, #7 Exhibit Email correspondence September 17, #8 Exhibit T1's First RFP's to NUL, #9 Exhibit Email with written response April 29, #10 Exhibit Email correspondence May 2, #11 Exhibit Nonresponsive documents, #12 Exhibit Kasdon Hutka texts, #13 Exhibit September 4 Letter, #14 Exhibit Legitscript Screenshots) (Kaplan, Kory)
October 2, 2020 Filing 48 CLERK'S NOTICE of violation of Local Rules. ECF No. #47 was not filed pursuant to LR IA 10-3(d). An index of exhibits was not provided.Attorney Kory Kaplan is advised in the future to file documents pursuant to the Local Rules. No further action is required concerning this document at this time. Do NOT refile. (no image attached) (MMM)
October 2, 2020 Filing 47 MOTION to Vacate #39 Order on Stipulation,, Scheduling Order, by Plaintiff T1 Payments LLC, Counter Defendant T1 Payments LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Email correspondence, #2 Exhibit Email correspondence, #3 Exhibit Email correspondence, #4 Exhibit Email correspondence, #5 Exhibit Email correspondence, #6 Exhibit Email correspondence, #7 Exhibit Stipulation and Order to Extend Discovery Deadlines (Third Request), #8 Exhibit Revised Stipulation and Order to Extend Discovery Deadlines (Third Request), #9 Exhibit Email Correspondence, #10 Exhibit Email correspondence) (Kaplan, Kory)
October 2, 2020 Filing 46 (1st Notice) Pursuant to Local Rule IC 2-1: that Jane B. Baber is in violation of Local Rule IC 2-1. Participation in the electronic filing system became mandatory for all attorneys effective January 1, 2006. You are required to register to file documents electronically in the Court's electronic filing system (CM/ECF) and the electronic service of pleadings and other papers. Please visit the Court's website to complete the registration for CM/ECF. (no image attached) (MMM)
October 2, 2020 Filing 45 CLERK'S NOTICE Regarding Local Rule IC 2-2(d). ECF No. #44 was not filed pursuant to LR IC 2-2(d). Documents must be linked to the document to which they pertain in the electronic filing system. The Clerk has modified the entry to properly establish the docket-entry relationship. Attorney Puoy K. Premsrirut is advised to properly link all further filed documents. Do NOT refile. (no image attached) (MMM)
October 1, 2020 Filing 44 Proposed COUNTERCLAIM against All Plaintiffs by New U Life Corporation re #42 Motion for Leave to File First Amended Counterclaim. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Notice of Lodging, #2 Index, #3 Exhibit A, #4 Exhibit B, #5 Exhibit C, #6 Exhibit D) (Premsrirut, Puoy) Modified on 10/2/2020 to add document link (MMM).
October 1, 2020 Filing 43 DECLARATION of Bradley O. Cebeci re #42 Motion for Leave to File Document by Defendant New U Life Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Index, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit 7) (Premsrirut, Puoy)
October 1, 2020 Filing 42 MOTION for Leave to File First Amended Counterclaim; Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof by Defendant New U Life Corporation. (Premsrirut, Puoy)
September 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER Granting #40 Verified Petition for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Jane Bronwyn Baber for T1 Payments LLC and approving Designation of Local Counsel Kory Logan Kaplan. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 9/18/2020. Any Attorney not yet registered with the Court's CM/ECF System shall submit a Registration Form on the Court's website #www.nvd.uscourts.gov(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JQC)
September 18, 2020 Filing 40 MOTION/VERIFIED PETITION for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice by Jane Bronwyn Baber and DESIGNATION of Local Counsel Kory L. Kaplan (Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 0978-6176482) by Plaintiff T1 Payments LLC, Counter Defendant T1 Payments LLC. (Kaplan, Kory)
September 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER Granting #38 Stipulation for Extension of Time. Proposed Joint Pretrial Order due by 4/19/2021. Motions due by 3/18/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Daniel J. Albregts on 9/17/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JQC) Modified on 9/17/2020 to reflect correct JPTO due date (MMM). (Main Document 39 replaced on 9/17/2020 - nef regenerated) (MMM).
September 15, 2020 Filing 38 STIPULATION for Extension of Time re Discovery (Third Request) re #24 Order , by Defendant New U Life Corporation. (Premsrirut, Puoy) Modified event on 9/16/2020 pursuant to LR IC 2-2 (MMM).
September 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER Granting #36 Verified Petition for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Bradley Omer Cebeci for New U Life Corporation and approving Designation of Local Counsel Puoy K. Premsrirut. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 9/15/2020. Any Attorney not yet registered with the Court's CM/ECF System shall submit a Registration Form on the Court's website #www.nvd.uscourts.gov(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JQC)
September 15, 2020 Filing 36 MOTION/VERIFIED PETITION for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice by Bradley O. Cebeci and DESIGNATION of Local Counsel Puoy K. Premsrirut (Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 0978-6170394) by Defendant New U Life Corporation. (Premsrirut, Puoy)
September 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER Granting #30 Motion to Remove Attorney from Electronic Service List. Signed by Magistrate Judge Daniel J. Albregts on 9/14/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JQC)
September 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER Granting #32 Verified Petition for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Brianna Dahlberg for New U Life Corporation and approving Designation of Local Counsel Puoy K. Premsrirut. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 9/14/2020. Any Attorney not yet registered with the Court's CM/ECF System shall submit a Registration Form on the Court's website #www.nvd.uscourts.gov(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JQC)
September 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER Granting #31 Verified Petition for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Eugene Rome for New U Life Corporation and approving Designation of Local Counsel Puoy K. Premsrirut. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 9/14/2020. Any Attorney not yet registered with the Court's CM/ECF System shall submit a Registration Form on the Court's website #www.nvd.uscourts.gov(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JQC)
September 11, 2020 Filing 32 MOTION/VERIFIED PETITION for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice by Brianna Dahlberg and DESIGNATION of Local Counsel Puoy K. Premsrirut (Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 0978-6166970) by Defendant New U Life Corporation. (Premsrirut, Puoy)
September 11, 2020 Filing 31 MOTION/VERIFIED PETITION for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice by Eugene Rome and DESIGNATION of Local Counsel Puoy K. Premsrirut (Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 0978-6166929) by Defendant New U Life Corporation. (Premsrirut, Puoy)
September 10, 2020 Filing 30 MOTION to remove attorney Amanda Patanaphan from the Electronic Service List in this case by Defendant New U Life Corporation. (Premsrirut, Puoy)
September 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER granting #26 Verified Petition for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Ari Rothman for T1 Payments LLC,Ari Rothman for T1 Payments LLC and approving Kory Kaplan Designation of Local Counsel. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 9/10/2020. Any Attorney not yet registered with the Court's CM/ECF System shall submit a Registration Form on the Court's website #www.nvd.uscourts.gov(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRS)
September 9, 2020 Filing 28 CLERK'S NOTICE. Attorney Action Required to ECF No. #27 . Incorrect event selected by attorney. Document was not filed pursuant to LR IA 11-6(b), which states: No attorney may withdraw after appearing in a case except by leave of the court after notice has been served on the affected client and opposing counsel. Counsel is advised to refile ECF No. #27 using the appropriate Motion/Stipulation pursuant to LR IA 11-6(b). Document #27 terminated. (no image attached) (DKJ)
September 9, 2020 Filing 27 ERROR: Document not filed per LR IA 11-6 and LR IC 2-2(c) by attorney . CORRECTION: Attorney advised to refile document using the correct event in accordance with the local rules. Document #27 terminated as filed in error, pursuant to LR IC 7-1. NOTICE Disassociation of Counsel re Amanda Patanaphan by New U Life Corporation. (Premsrirut, Puoy)
September 8, 2020 Filing 26 MOTION/VERIFIED PETITION for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice by Ari Nicholas Rothman and DESIGNATION of Local Counsel Kory L. Kaplan (Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 0978-6160556) by Plaintiff T1 Payments LLC. (Kaplan, Kory)
May 13, 2020 Filing 25 NOTICE of Change of Firm by T1 Payments LLC. (Kaplan, Kory)
May 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER Granting #23 Motion to Extend Time. Discovery due by 10/31/2020. Proposed Joint Pretrial Order due by 12/3/2020. Motions due by 12/18/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Daniel J. Albregts on 5/13/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JQC)
May 12, 2020 Filing 23 Joint MOTION to Extend Time (Second Request) re #17 Order on Motion to Extend/Shorten Time, Scheduling Order by Plaintiff T1 Payments LLC, Counter Defendant T1 Payments LLC. (Kaplan, Kory)
May 11, 2020 Filing 22 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Magistrate Judge Daniel J. Albregts on 5/11/2020. ORDER denying #21 Motion to Extend Time. The Court denies the parties' Joint Motion to Extend Deadlines without prejudice due to its failure to comply with the amended Local Rules. The Local Rules of Practice for the District of Nevada were amended and adopted on April 17, 2020. The parties are directed to review the amendments to the Local Rules, specifically Local Rules 26-1 through 26-7, and re-file a compliant motion. (no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KL)
May 7, 2020 Filing 21 Joint MOTION to Extend Time (Second Request) re #17 Order on Motion to Extend/Shorten Time, Scheduling Order by Plaintiff T1 Payments LLC. (Kaplan, Kory)
April 20, 2020 Filing 20 Interim STATUS REPORT PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE 26-3 by Plaintiff T1 Payments LLC. (Kaplan, Kory)
March 10, 2020 Filing 19 CLERK'S NOTICE of violation of Local Rules. ECF No. #18 was not filed pursuant to LR IA 10-3(b). Copies of pleadings or other documents filed in the pending matter must not be attached as exhibits or made part of an appendix.Attorney Kory Kaplan is advised in the future to file documents pursuant to the Local Rules. No further action is required concerning this document at this time. DO NOT refile. (no image attached) (MMM)
March 9, 2020 Filing 18 NOTICE of Entry of Order Re T1 Payments LLC's Unopposed Motion to Extend Deadlines by T1 Payments LLC re #17 Order on Motion to Extend/Shorten Time, Scheduling Order. (Kaplan, Kory)
March 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER Granting #16 Motion to Extend Time. Discovery due by 7/31/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Daniel J. Albregts on 3/6/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JQC)
February 25, 2020 Filing 16 Unopposed MOTION to Extend Time (First Request) re #14 Order on Discovery Plan and Scheduling Order, by Plaintiff T1 Payments LLC. (Kaplan, Kory)
January 6, 2020 Filing 15 NOTICE PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE IB 2-2: In accordance with 28 USC 636(c) and FRCP 73, the parties in this action are provided with a link to the "AO 85 Notice of Availability, Consent, and Order of Reference - Exercise of Jurisdiction by a U.S. Magistrate Judge" form on the Court's website - #www.nvd.uscourts.gov. AO 85 Consent forms should NOT be electronically filed. Upon consent of all parties, counsel are advised to manually file the form with the Clerk's Office. (A copy of form AO 85 has been mailed to parties not receiving electronic service.) (no image attached) (JM)
January 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 SCHEDULING ORDER granting #13 Discovery Plan and Scheduling Order. Discovery due by 6/18/2020. Motions due by 7/17/2020. Proposed Joint Pretrial Order due by 9/3/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Daniel J. Albregts on 1/6/2020.(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
January 3, 2020 Filing 13 Joint Stipulated Discovery Plan and Scheduling Order by Plaintiff T1 Payments LLC. (Kaplan, Kory)
December 11, 2019 Filing 12 ANSWER to #8 Answer to Complaint,, Counterclaim, filed by T1 Payments LLC.(Kaplan, Kory)
December 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER Granting #10 Stipulation for Extension of Time re #8 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim (First Request). Signed by Magistrate Judge Daniel J. Albregts on 12/10/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
November 20, 2019 Filing 10 First STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME (First Request) re #8 Answer to Complaint,, Counterclaim, by Counter Claimant New U Life Corporation, Defendant New U Life Corporation.. (Premsrirut, Puoy)
November 20, 2019 Filing 9 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by New U Life Corporation that identifies all parties that have an interest in the outcome of this case. Other Affiliate New U Life Limited for New U Life Corporation, New U Life Corporation Alexy Goldstein added. (Premsrirut, Puoy) Modified on 11/21/2019 (MMM).
November 20, 2019 Filing 8 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, (, Discovery Plan/Scheduling Order due by 1/4/2020.), First COUNTERCLAIM against All Plaintiffs by New U Life Corporation. filed by New U Life Corporation.(Premsrirut, Puoy) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court.
October 29, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by T1 Payments LLC re #5 Summons Issued. New U Life Corporation served on 10/20/2019, answer due 11/10/2019. (Kaplan, Kory)
October 17, 2019 Filing 6 STANDING ORDER. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Andrew P. Gordon. Judge Gordon's Chambers Practices, which are posted on the U.S. District Court, District of Nevada public website, may also be accessed directly via this hyperlink: #www.nvd.uscourts.gov. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - EDS)
October 17, 2019 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to New U Life Corporation re #1 Complaint. (ADR)
October 17, 2019 Filing 4 PROPOSED SUMMONS to be issued by Plaintiff T1 Payments LLC. (Kaplan, Kory)
October 17, 2019 Filing 3 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by T1 Payments LLC. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Kaplan, Kory)
October 17, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET to #1 Complaint, by Plaintiff T1 Payments LLC. (Kaplan, Kory)
October 17, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against New U LIfe Corporation (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0978-5741678) by T1 Payments LLC. Proof of service due by 1/15/2020.(Kaplan, Kory) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court.
October 17, 2019 Case randomly assigned to Judge Andrew P. Gordon and Magistrate Judge Daniel J. Albregts. (ADR)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: T1 Payments LLC v. New U Life Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: New U Life Corporation
Represented By: Puoy K. Premsrirut
Represented By: Amanda Patanaphan
Represented By: Bradley Omer Cebeci
Represented By: Eugene Rome
Represented By: Brianna Dahlberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: T1 Payments LLC
Represented By: Kory Logan Kaplan
Represented By: Ari Rothman
Represented By: Joshua P. Gilmore
Represented By: Jane Bronwyn Baber
Represented By: Kelly B Stout
Represented By: Dennis L. Kennedy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Rome & Associates, A.P.C.
Represented By: Jordan T. Smith
Represented By: Emily Allen-Wiles Buchwald
Represented By: Todd L. Bice
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Bradley O Cebeci
Represented By: Jordan T. Smith
Represented By: Emily Allen-Wiles Buchwald
Represented By: Todd L. Bice
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?