HB Productions, Inc. v. Doe Defendants 1-5
Plaintiff: HB Productions, Inc.
Defendant: Doe Defendants 1-5
Case Number: 2:2019cv01849
Filed: October 18, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Presiding Judge: Andrew P Gordon
Referring Judge: Elayna J Youchah
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17 U.S.C. ยง 101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 15, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER Granting #3 Ex Parte Motion for Leave to Take Limited Discovery Prior to Rule 26(f) Conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elayna J. Youchah on 10/29/2019.(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
October 21, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Corrected Image/Document re #1 Complaint, by Plaintiff HB Productions, Inc.. (Service of corrected image is attached.) (Austin, F.)
October 21, 2019 Filing 5 STANDING ORDER. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Andrew P. Gordon. Judge Gordon's Chambers Practices, which are posted on the U.S. District Court, District of Nevada public website, may also be accessed directly via this hyperlink: #www.nvd.uscourts.gov. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
October 21, 2019 Filing 4 AO 121 - REPORT on the filing or determination of an action or appeal regarding a copyright. Mailed to the Register of Copyrights, Copyright Office. (Attachments: #1 Complaint) (MR)
October 18, 2019 Case randomly assigned to Judge Andrew P. Gordon and Magistrate Judge Elayna J. Youchah. (MR)
October 18, 2019 Filing 3 EX PARTE MOTION for Leave to Take Limited Discovery Prior to Rule 26(f) Conference by Plaintiff HB Productions, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Austin, F.)
October 18, 2019 Filing 2 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by HB Productions, Inc. that identifies all parties that have an interest in the outcome of this case. Other Affiliate Millennium Funding, Inc. for HB Productions, Inc. added. (Austin, F.)
October 18, 2019 Filing 1 View Corrected Image #6 as to COMPLAINT against Doe Defendants 1-5 (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0978-5744263) by HB Productions, Inc.. Proof of service due by 1/16/2020. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Austin, F.) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: HB Productions, Inc. v. Doe Defendants 1-5
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: HB Productions, Inc.
Represented By: F. Christopher Austin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Doe Defendants 1-5
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?