Grandison v. Chilton et al
Plaintiff: Kara Grandison
Defendant: Lechele Chilton, GEICO Advantage Insurance Company and GEICO Casualty Company
Case Number: 2:2019cv01880
Filed: October 23, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Presiding Judge: Cam Ferenbach
Referring Judge: Andrew P Gordon
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 26, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 18, 2019 Filing 15 RESPONSE to #12 Motion to Dismiss by Plaintiff Kara Grandison. Replies due by 12/25/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1) (Ganier, Ashley)
December 6, 2019 Filing 14 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment by Defendant GEICO Casualty Company. Responses due by 12/27/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Plaintiff's Complaint, #2 Exhibit B - Plaintiff's Demand Letter Dated 2/11/18, #3 Exhibit C - Correspondence dated 2/15/18, #4 Exhibit D - Correspondence dated 2/19/18, #5 Exhibit E - Correspondence dated 3/2/18, #6 Exhibit F - Correspondence dated 5/3/18, #7 Exhibit G - Correspondence dated 5/28/18, #8 Exhibit H - Correspondence dated 6/26/18, #9 Exhibit I - Correspondence dated 6/27/18, #10 Exhibit J - Correspondence dated 7/17/18, #11 Exhibit K - Correspondence dated 10/10/18, #12 Exhibit L - Plaintiff's Second Demand Letter dated 11/16/18, #13 Exhibit M - Correspondence dated 11/28/18, #14 Exhibit N - Correspondence dated 12/3/18, #15 Exhibit O - Correspondence dated 12/6/18, #16 Exhibit P - Correspondence dated 12/6/18, #17 Exhibit Q - Correspondence dated 12/7/18, #18 Exhibit R - Correspondence dated 1/9/19, #19 Exhibit S - Correspondence dated 1/10/19, #20 Exhibit T - Correspondence dated 2/7/19, #21 Exhibit U - Correspondence dated 2/8/19, #22 Exhibit V - Correspondence dated 2/12/19, #23 Exhibit W - Correspondence dated 2/19/19, #24 Exhibit X - Correspondence dated 6/3/19, #25 Exhibit Y - Correspondence dated 7/2/19, #26 Exhibit Z - Correspondence dated 8/2/19) (Lorelli, Caitlin) Modified event on 12/9/2019 (DKJ).
December 5, 2019 Filing 13 AFFIDAVIT of Service re #8 Status Report by Plaintiff Kara Grandison. (Ganier, Ashley)
December 5, 2019 Filing 12 MOTION to Dismiss by Defendant GEICO Casualty Company. Responses due by 12/19/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Plaintiff's District Court Complaint) (Lorelli, Caitlin)
November 27, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE IB 2-2: In accordance with 28 USC 636(c) and FRCP 73, the parties in this action are provided with a link to the "AO 85 Notice of Availability, Consent, and Order of Reference - Exercise of Jurisdiction by a U.S. Magistrate Judge" form on the Court's website - #www.nvd.uscourts.gov. AO 85 Consent forms should NOT be electronically filed. Upon consent of all parties, counsel are advised to manually file the form with the Clerk's Office. (A copy of form AO 85 has been mailed to parties not receiving electronic service.) (no image attached) (MR)
November 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 SCHEDULING ORDER Granting #9 Discovery Plan and Scheduling Order. Discovery due by 4/20/2020. Motions due by 5/20/2020. Proposed Joint Pretrial Order due by 6/19/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 11/27/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
November 27, 2019 Filing 9 Joint Stipulated Discovery Plan and Scheduling Order by Plaintiff Kara Grandison. (Ganier, Ashley)
November 22, 2019 Filing 8 Joint STATUS REPORT by Plaintiff Kara Grandison. (Ganier, Ashley)
October 28, 2019 Filing 7 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Kara Grandison. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Ganier, Ashley)
October 24, 2019 Filing 6 STATEMENT REGARDING REMOVAL by Defendant GEICO Casualty Company. (Lorelli, Caitlin)
October 24, 2019 Filing 5 STANDING ORDER. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Andrew P. Gordon. Judge Gordon's Chambers Practices, which are posted on the U.S. District Court, District of Nevada public website, may also be accessed directly via this hyperlink: #www.nvd.uscourts.gov. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
October 24, 2019 Filing 4 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 10/24/2019. Statement regarding removed action is due by 11/8/2019. Joint Status Report regarding removed action is due by 11/23/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
October 23, 2019 Case randomly assigned to Judge Andrew P. Gordon and Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach. (MR)
October 23, 2019 Filing 3 Defendant GEICO Advantage Insurance Company's ANSWER re #1 Petition for Removal, to Plaintiff's Complaint filed by GEICO Advantage Insurance Company. Discovery Plan/Scheduling Order due by 12/7/2019.(Lorelli, Caitlin) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court.
October 23, 2019 Filing 2 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by GEICO Advantage Insurance Company. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Lorelli, Caitlin)
October 23, 2019 Filing 1 PETITION FOR REMOVAL from Eighth Judicial District Court, Case Number A-19-801725-C, (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0978-5749394) by GEICO Advantage Insurance Company. Proof of service due by 12/10/2019. (Lorelli, Caitlin) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Grandison v. Chilton et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lechele Chilton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GEICO Advantage Insurance Company
Represented By: Caitlin J Lorelli
Represented By: Thomas E. Winner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GEICO Casualty Company
Represented By: Caitlin J Lorelli
Represented By: Thomas E. Winner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kara Grandison
Represented By: Bradley S. Mainor
Represented By: Ashley Marie Ganier
Represented By: Joseph J. Wirth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?