ServFaces GmbH v. Truong
Plaintiff: ServFaces GmbH
Defendant: Ted Truong
Case Number: 2:2019cv01906
Filed: October 29, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Presiding Judge: Daniel J Albregts
Referring Judge: Andrew P Gordon
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:1114
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 21, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 4, 2019 Filing 8 Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Ted Truong re #7 Motion for Entry of Clerks Default. (MR)
December 3, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION for Entry of Clerks Default re #1 Complaint, by Plaintiff ServFaces GmbH. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Mark Borghese, #2 Summons Returned Exectued, #3 Proposed Order) (Borghese, Mark)
November 11, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by ServFaces GmbH re #1 Complaint, #3 Summons Issued. All Defendants. (Borghese, Mark)
October 30, 2019 Filing 5 STANDING ORDER. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Andrew P. Gordon. Judge Gordon's Chambers Practices, which are posted on the U.S. District Court, District of Nevada public website, may also be accessed directly via this hyperlink: #www.nvd.uscourts.gov. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
October 29, 2019 Filing 4 AO 120 - REPORT on the filing or determination of an action regarding a patent or trademark. E-mailed to the US Patent and Trademark Office. (Attachments: #1 Complaint) (SLD)
October 29, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Ted Truong re #1 Complaint. (SLD) (Main Document 3 replaced on 10/29/2019) (SLD).
October 29, 2019 Case randomly assigned to Judge Andrew P. Gordon and Magistrate Judge Daniel J. Albregts. (SLD)
October 29, 2019 Filing 2 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by ServFaces GmbH that identifies all parties that have an interest in the outcome of this case. Other Affiliate servFaces Holding GmbH & Co. KG, Other Affiliate servFaces Entwicklungen GmbH & Co. KG, Other Affiliate Jorg Reents for ServFaces GmbH added. (Borghese, Mark)
October 29, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0978-5755700) by ServFaces GmbH. Proof of service due by 1/27/2020. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(Borghese, Mark) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: ServFaces GmbH v. Truong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ted Truong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ServFaces GmbH
Represented By: Mark R. Borghese
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?