Center for Biological Diversity v. United States Bureau of Land Management
Plaintiff: Center for Biological Diversity
Defendant: United States Bureau of Land Management
Intervenor: Ioneer USA
Case Number: 2:2019cv01915
Filed: October 30, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Presiding Judge: Gloria M Navarro
Referring Judge: Elayna J Youchah
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Administrative Procedures Act/Review or Appeal of Agency Decision
Cause of Action: 05 U.S.C. ยง 551
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 23, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER Granting #30 Stipulation for Extension of Time re #10 Motion for Preliminary Injunction (Third Request). Signed by Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 12/23/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
December 20, 2019 Filing 30 STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME (Third Request) re #10 Motion for Preliminary Injunction,,,, by Plaintiff Center for Biological Diversity. (Melton, Allison)
December 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER Granting #26 Verified Petition for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Roger Flynn for Center for Biological Diversity and approving Designation of Local Counsel Christopher W. Mixson. Signed by Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 12/6/2019. Any Attorney not yet registered with the Court's CM/ECF System shall submit a Registration Form on the Court's website #www.nvd.uscourts.gov(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
December 6, 2019 Filing 28 RESPONSE to #10 Motion for Preliminary Injunction,,,, by Intervenor Ioneer USA. Replies due by 12/13/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit, #8 Exhibit, #9 Exhibit, #10 Exhibit) (Reid, Josh)
December 6, 2019 Filing 27 RESPONSE to #10 Motion for Preliminary Injunction,,,, by Defendant United States Bureau of Land Management. Replies due by 12/13/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit List, #2 Exhibit Exhibits and Attachments) (Williams, Michelle-Ann)
December 6, 2019 Filing 26 MOTION/VERIFIED PETITION for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice by Roger Flynn and DESIGNATION of Local Counsel Christopher W. Mixson (Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 0978-5801992) by Plaintiff Center for Biological Diversity. (Mixson, Christopher) Modified on 12/6/2019 to correct pro hac vice counsel and local counsel (DKJ).
December 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER Granting #24 Stipulation for Extension of Time re #10 Motion for Preliminary Injunction (Second Request). Responses due by 12/6/2019. Replies due by 12/20/2019. Signed by Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 12/3/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
December 2, 2019 Filing 24 STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME (Second Request) re #18 Stipulation by Intervenor Ioneer USA. (Reid, E.)
November 27, 2019 Filing 23 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 11/27/2019. Pending before the Court is the #11 Unopposed Motion to Intervene, filed by Proposed Intervenor Ioneer USA Corporation ("Ioneer"). For the reasons stated in the #11 Unopposed Motion to Intervene, the Court finds that Ioneer is entitled to intervene as a matter of right pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 24(a)(2). Accordingly, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the #11 Unopposed Motion to Intervene is GRANTED. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KK)
November 21, 2019 Filing 22 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Center for Biological Diversity re #1 Complaint, #5 Summons Issued as to USA. United States Bureau of Land Management served on 11/7/2019, answer due 1/6/2020. (Attachments: #1 Certified mail receipts, delivery confirmation, and return receipts)(Melton, Allison)
November 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER Granting #7 Verified Petition for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Marc D. Fink and approving Designation of Local Counsel Christopher W. Mixson Signed by Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 11/20/2019. Any Attorney not yet registered with the Court's CM/ECF System shall submit a Registration Form on the Court's website #www.nvd.uscourts.gov(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
November 19, 2019 Filing 20 NOTICE of Corrected Image/Document re #7 Motion for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice - Verified Petition, by Plaintiff Center for Biological Diversity. (Service of corrected image is attached.) (Mixson, Christopher)
November 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER Granting #18 First Stipulation for Extension of Time Re: #10 Motion for Preliminary Injunction. Responses due by 12/3/2019. Replies due by 12/17/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elayna J. Youchah on 11/18/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
November 15, 2019 Filing 18 STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME (First Request) re #13 Order on Stipulation, by Intervenor Ioneer USA. (Reid, E.)
November 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER Granting #15 Verified Petition for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Svend A Brandt-Erichsen for Ioneer USA and approving Designation of Local Counsel E. Leif Reid. Signed by Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 11/14/2019. Any Attorney not yet registered with the Court's CM/ECF System shall submit a Registration Form on the Court's website #www.nvd.uscourts.gov(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
November 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER Granting #14 Verified Petition for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Allison N. Melton for Center for Biological Diversity and approving Designation of Local Counsel Christopher W. Mixson. Signed by Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 11/14/2019. Any Attorney not yet registered with the Court's CM/ECF System shall submit a Registration Form on the Court's website #www.nvd.uscourts.gov(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
November 14, 2019 Filing 15 MOTION/VERIFIED PETITION for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice by Svend A. Brandt-Erichsen and DESIGNATION of Local Counsel E. Leif Reid (Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 0978-5776946) by Intervenor Ioneer USA. (Reid, E.)
November 14, 2019 Filing 14 MOTION/VERIFIED PETITION for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice by Allison N. Melton and DESIGNATION of Local Counsel Christopher W. Mixson (Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 0978-5775690) by Plaintiff Center for Biological Diversity. (Mixson, Christopher)
November 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER Granting #9 Stipulation re #10 Motion for Preliminary Injunction. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elayna J. Youchah on 11/6/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR) (Main Document 13 replaced on 11/6/2019) (MR).
November 5, 2019 Filing 12 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Ioneer USA that identifies all parties that have an interest in the outcome of this case. Corporate Parent Paradigm Minerals USA Corporation, Other Affiliate ioneer Holdings Nevada, Inc. for Ioneer USA added. (Reid, Josh)
November 5, 2019 Filing 11 Unopposed MOTION to Intervene re #1 Complaint, by Intervenor Ioneer USA. Responses due by 11/19/2019. (Reid, Josh)
November 5, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by Plaintiff Center for Biological Diversity. Responses due by 11/19/2019. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Patrick Donnelly, #2 Declaration of Naomi Fraga, PhD, #3 Declaration of Kieran Suckling, #4 Appendix Exhibit List, #5 Exhibit 1 - 30 Day Notice, #6 Exhibit 2 - Tiehm's Buckwheat Petiton to FWS, #7 Exhibit 3 - Petitin to NDF, #8 Exhibit 4 - Cease & Desist Letter, #9 Exhibit 5- 1995 Status Report, #10 Exhibit 6 - Nevda Rare Plant Fact Sheet, #11 Exhibit 7 - 2017 Final BLM NV Status Report, #12 Exhibit 8 - Tohopah RMP & ROD, #13 Exhibit 9 - Rhyolite Ridge Mining Project, #14 Exhibit 10 - Rhyolite Ridge Map, #15 Exhibit 11 - NS Energy Website, #16 Exhibit 12 - Tiehm Buckwheat Survey Plan, #17 Exhibit 13 - Rhyolite Ridge Exploration Project, #18 Exhibit 14 - South Infill Exploration Project, #19 Exhibit 15 - BLM Policy Manual, #20 Exhibit 16 - Sensitive Species Manual, #21 Exhibit 17 - Rhyolite PFS Section 1) (Mixson, Christopher)
November 5, 2019 Filing 9 STIPULATION re #10 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by Defendant United States Bureau of Land Management. (Williams, Michelle-Ann) Modified on 11/5/2019 to add docket entry relationship (MMM).
November 5, 2019 Filing 8 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 11/5/2019. Before the Court is the #7 Petition to Practice Pro Hac Vice, filed by Petitioner Marc D. Fink and Local Counsel Christopher W. Mixson. The #7 Petition does not include Certificates of Good Standing from the highest admitting court of every state in which Petitioner has been admitted to practice law, as required by this Districts Local Rule 11-2(b)(3). Accordingly, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the Court DEFERS ruling on the #7 Petition. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Petitioner Fink and Local Counsel Mixson shall have until November 22, 2019, to file a CORRECTED Verified Petition using the "Notice of Corrected Image/Document" event to include all applicable Certificates of Good Standing.(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KK)
November 4, 2019 Filing 7 VIEW #20 corrected image to MOTION/VERIFIED PETITION for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice by Marc D. Fink and DESIGNATION of Local Counsel Christopher W. Mixson (Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 0978-5762571) by Plaintiff Center for Biological Diversity. (Mixson, Christopher)
October 30, 2019 Filing 6 STANDING ORDER. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Judge Gloria M. Navarro. Judge Navarro's Chambers Practices, which are posted on the U.S. District Court, District of Nevada public website, may also be accessed directly via this hyperlink #www.nvd.uscourts.gov. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
October 30, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Issued as to United States Bureau of Land Management re #1 Complaint. (MR)
October 30, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE TO COUNSEL PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE IA 11-2. Counsel Allison N. Melton, Marc D Fink, and Roger Flynn to comply with completion and filing of the Verified Petition and Designation of Local Counsel. For your convenience, click on the following link to obtain the form from the Court's website - #www.nvd.uscourts.gov. Upon approval of the Verified Petition, counsel is required to register for the Court's Case Management and Electronic Case Filing (CM/ECF) system and the electronic service of documents. Please visit the Court's website www.nvd.uscourts.gov to register Attorney. Verified Petition due by 12/14/2019. (no image attached) (MR)
October 30, 2019 Filing 3 PROPOSED SUMMONS to be issued BLM by Plaintiff Center for Biological Diversity. (Mixson, Christopher)
October 30, 2019 Filing 2 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Center for Biological Diversity. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Mixson, Christopher) Other affiliates Ioneer Corporation and Paradigm Minterals USA Corporation added Modified on 10/31/2019 (MMM).
October 30, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against United States Bureau of Land Management (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0978-5757037) by Center for Biological Diversity. Proof of service due by 1/28/2020. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Mixson, Christopher) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court.
October 30, 2019 Case randomly assigned to Judge Gloria M. Navarro and Magistrate Judge Elayna J. Youchah. (MR)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Center for Biological Diversity v. United States Bureau of Land Management
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Center for Biological Diversity
Represented By: Allison N. Melton
Represented By: Roger Flynn
Represented By: Christopher W. Mixson
Represented By: Marc D Fink
Represented By: Allison Nicole Melton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Bureau of Land Management
Represented By: Michelle-Ann C. Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor: Ioneer USA
Represented By: E. Leif Reid
Represented By: Svend Brandt-Erichsen
Represented By: Josh M. Reid
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?