Bonner v. Howell et al
Petitioner: John Arthur Bonner
Respondent: OMD, Jerry Howell, TLVCC, James Dzurenda, Hernandez and Dwayne Deal
Case Number: 2:2019cv01918
Filed: October 30, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Presiding Judge: Jennifer A Dorsey
Referring Judge: Cam Ferenbach
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 28:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 8, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER. IT IS ORDERED that the Clerk of the Court WILL SEND Plaintiff the approved form application to proceed in forma pauperis by a prisoner. Fully complete application to proceed in forma pauperis or payment of filing fees due within 60 days. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk of the Court will retain #1 -1 the complaint but will not file it at this time. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 11/5/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - Encl.: application to proceed in forma pauperis by a prisoner w/ instructions - ADR)
October 31, 2019 Filing 2 ADVISORY LETTER to litigant. (ADR)
October 30, 2019 Filing 1 RECEIPT of Initiating Documents by Court on behalf of Plaintiff. No Application to Proceed IFP or Filing Fee received. (Attachments: #1 Complaint) (ADR)
October 30, 2019 Case randomly assigned to Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey and Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach. (RT)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bonner v. Howell et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: OMD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Jerry Howell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: TLVCC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: James Dzurenda
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Hernandez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Dwayne Deal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: John Arthur Bonner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?