Sharif-Pour v. United States of America
Plaintiff: Nanda Sharif-Pour
Defendant: United States of America and United States Postal Service
Case Number: 2:2019cv01924
Filed: October 31, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Presiding Judge: Gloria M Navarro
Referring Judge: Brenda Weksler
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1391
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 21, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 19, 2019 Filing 6 AFFIDAVIT of Service of Postal Service re #1 Complaint, by Plaintiff Nanda Sharif-Pour. (Moss, Boyd)
November 1, 2019 Filing 5 CLERK'S NOTICE Regarding Local Rule IC 2-1. Attorney Drue R. Solomon is in violation of Local Rule IC 2-1(a) and 2-1(d). You are required to register to file documents electronically in the Court's electronic filing system (CM/ECF) and the electronic service of pleadings and other papers. Please visit the Court's website to complete the registration for CM/ECF. (no image attached) (DKJ)
November 1, 2019 Filing 4 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Nanda Sharif-Pour. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Moss, Boyd)
November 1, 2019 Filing 3 STANDING ORDER. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Judge Gloria M. Navarro. Judge Navarro's Chambers Practices, which are posted on the U.S. District Court, District of Nevada public website, may also be accessed directly via this hyperlink #www.nvd.uscourts.gov. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
November 1, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to United States Postal Service re #1 Complaint. (SLD)
October 31, 2019 Case randomly assigned to Judge Gloria M. Navarro and Magistrate Judge Brenda Weksler. (SLD)
October 31, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Nanda Sharif-Pour (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0978-5759644) by Nanda Sharif-Pour. Proof of service due by 1/29/2020. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(Moss, Boyd) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sharif-Pour v. United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nanda Sharif-Pour
Represented By: Boyd B Moss, III
Represented By: John C. Funk
Represented By: Drue Solomon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Postal Service
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?