Burriola v. State of Nevada et al
Plaintiff: Anthony Burriola
Defendant: State of Nevada, A. D. Ford, Dept of NV Parole and Probation Commissioners and Williams
Case Number: 2:2019cv01936
Filed: November 1, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Presiding Judge: Richard F Boulware
Referring Judge: Nancy J Koppe
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 18, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 18, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE to the Court re #3 Order, by Anthony Burriola. (MR)
December 18, 2019 Filing 6 APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Anthony Burriola. (MR)
December 13, 2019 Filing 5 JUDGMENT in favor of Dept of NV Parole and Probation Commissioners, State of Nevada, Williams, A. D. Ford against Anthony Burriola. Re: #4 Order, Signed by Clerk of Court Debra K. Kempi on 12/13/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JQC) (Main Document 5 replaced on 12/14/2019 - nef regenerated) (MMM).
December 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER. IT IS ORDERED that this action is dismissed without prejudice based on Plaintiff's failure to file an application to proceed in forma pauperis or pay the full filing fee in compliance with this Court's 11/5/2019, order. Signed by Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 12/12/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JQC)
November 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER. IT IS ORDERED that the Clerk of the Court WILL SEND Plaintiff the approved form application to proceed in forma pauperis by a prisoner. File a fully complete application to proceed in forma pauperis or payment of filing fees due 12/5/2019. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk of the Court will retain #1 -1 the complaint but will not file it at this time. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 11/5/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - Encl.: in forma pauperis by a prisoner w/ instructions - ADR)
November 4, 2019 Filing 2 ADVISORY LETTER to litigant. (MR)
November 1, 2019 Filing 1 RECEIPT of Initiating Documents by Court on behalf of Plaintiff. No Application to Proceed IFP or Filing Fee received. (Attachments: #1 Complaint) (MR)
November 1, 2019 Case randomly assigned to Judge Richard F. Boulware, II and Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe. (RT)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Burriola v. State of Nevada et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anthony Burriola
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State of Nevada
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: A. D. Ford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dept of NV Parole and Probation Commissioners
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?