Simpson v. Baker et al
Defendant: Renee Baker
Petitioner: Derrick Simpson
Respondent: Attorney General of the State of Nevada and Humboldt Conservation Camp
Case Number: 2:2019cv01943
Filed: November 4, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Presiding Judge: Richard F Boulware
Referring Judge: Cam Ferenbach
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 25, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 23, 2019 Filing 9 Mail Returned as Undeliverable re #7 Order, addressed to Derrick Simpson. Envelope marked "Return to Sender"; clerk updated address to: P.O. Box 1490, Suzie Creek RoadCarlin, NV 89822. Clerk re-mailed ECF no. 7. (ADR)
December 17, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Erin L Bittick on behalf of Respondent Attorney General of the State of Nevada, Defendant Renee Baker. (Bittick, Erin)
December 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER. IT IS ORDERED that, pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 25(d), the Clerk of Court shall substitute Renee Baker for Humboldt Conservation Camp as the respondent warden. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Respondents will have thirty (30) days from the date of this Order to appear in this action and ninety (90) days from the date of this Order to answer or otherwise respond to the habeas Petition. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that #2 Petitioner's Motion for Leave to File and #3 Motion for Leave to File Additional Pages are DENIED as moot. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that #6 Petitioner's Motion for Appointment of Counsel is DENIED. See Order for further specifications. Signed by Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 12/13/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - cc: Nevada Attorney General w/ #1 Petition - ADR)
November 21, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION for Appointment of Counsel, filed by Petitioner Derrick Simpson. (ADR)
November 21, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Change of Address by Petitioner Derrick Simpson. Address updated to: Carlin Conservation Camp, P.O. Box 490, Carlin, NV 89822. (ADR)
November 5, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE from USDC advising case against Humboldt Conservation Camp, et al., has been received and assigned case number 2:19-cv-01943-RFB-VCF. (ADR)
November 4, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to File Additional Pages, filed by Petitioner Derrick Simpson. (ADR)
November 4, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to File Petition, filed by Petitioner Derrick Simpson. (ADR)
November 4, 2019 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus (Filing fee $ 5), filed by Derrick Simpson. (Attachments: #1 Receipt No. NVLAS066940)(ADR)
November 4, 2019 Case randomly assigned to Judge Richard F. Boulware, II and Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach. (RT)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Simpson v. Baker et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Derrick Simpson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Attorney General of the State of Nevada
Represented By: Erin L Bittick
Represented By: Aaron D. Ford-AG
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Humboldt Conservation Camp
Represented By: Aaron D. Ford-AG
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Renee Baker
Represented By: Erin L Bittick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?