SATA GmbH & Co. KG v. Taizhou Xingye Pneumatic Tools Co., Ltd
Plaintiff: SATA GmbH & Co. KG
Defendant: Taizhou Xingye Pneumatic Tools Co., Ltd
Case Number: 2:2019cv01948
Filed: November 6, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Presiding Judge: Gloria M Navarro
Referring Judge: Brenda Weksler
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:1051
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 12, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 12, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by SATA GmbH & Co. KG re #2 Summons Issued. Taizhou Xingye Pneumatic Tools Co., Ltd served on 11/6/2019, answer due 11/27/2019. (Caloiaro, Steven)
November 7, 2019 Filing 4 STANDING ORDER. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Judge Gloria M. Navarro. Judge Navarro's Chambers Practices, which are posted on the U.S. District Court, District of Nevada public website, may also be accessed directly via this hyperlink #www.nvd.uscourts.gov. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
November 6, 2019 Filing 3 AO 120 - REPORT on the filing or determination of an action regarding a patent or trademark. E-mailed to the US Patent and Trademark Office. (Attachments: #1 Complaint) (ADR)
November 6, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Taizhou Xingye Pneumatic Tools Co., Ltd re #1 Complaint. (ADR)
November 6, 2019 Case randomly assigned to Judge Gloria M. Navarro and Magistrate Judge Brenda Weksler. (ADR)
November 6, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against TAIZHOU XINGYE PNEUMATIC TOOLS CO., LTD (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0978-5766191) by SATA GmbH & Co. KG. Proof of service due by 2/4/2020. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Civil Cover Sheet, #7 Summons)(Caloiaro, Steven) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: SATA GmbH & Co. KG v. Taizhou Xingye Pneumatic Tools Co., Ltd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Taizhou Xingye Pneumatic Tools Co., Ltd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SATA GmbH & Co. KG
Represented By: Steven Anthony Caloiaro
Represented By: Brooks Todd Westergard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?