Topa Insurance Company v. AmTrust Insurance Company of Kansas, Inc.
Plaintiff: Topa Insurance Company
Defendant: AmTrust Insurance Company of Kansas, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2019cv01973
Filed: November 11, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Presiding Judge: Richard F Boulware
Referring Judge: Brenda Weksler
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 17, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER Granting #6 Verified Petition for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Stephen M Bigham for Topa Insurance Company and approving Designation of Local Counsel Byron L. Ames. Signed by Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 12/17/2019. Any Attorney not yet registered with the Court's CM/ECF System shall submit a Registration Form on the Court's website #www.nvd.uscourts.gov(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
December 17, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION/VERIFIED PETITION for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice by Stephen M. Bigham and DESIGNATION of Local Counsel Byron L. Ames (Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 0978-5814409) by Plaintiff Topa Insurance Company. (Ames, Byron)
December 4, 2019 Filing 5 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Topa Insurance Company. AmTrust Insurance Company of Kansas, Inc. waiver sent on 11/12/2019, answer due 1/11/2020. (Ames, Byron)
November 13, 2019 Filing 4 STANDING ORDER. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Judge Richard F. Boulware, II. Judge Boulware's Chambers Practices, which are posted on the U.S. District Court, District of Nevada public website, may also be accessed directly via this hyperlink: #www.nvd.uscourts.gov. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - EDS)
November 12, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to AmTrust Insurance Company of Kansas, Inc. re #1 Complaint. (ADR)
November 11, 2019 Case randomly assigned to Judge Richard F. Boulware, II and Magistrate Judge Brenda Weksler. (ADR)
November 11, 2019 Filing 2 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Topa Insurance Company. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Ames, Byron)
November 11, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0978-5770709) by Topa Insurance Company. Proof of service due by 2/9/2020. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(Ames, Byron) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Topa Insurance Company v. AmTrust Insurance Company of Kansas, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AmTrust Insurance Company of Kansas, Inc.
Represented By: James C Nielsen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Topa Insurance Company
Represented By: Byron L. Ames
Represented By: Stephen Michael Bigham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?