Loya Insurance Company v. Vuelvas et al
Plaintiff: Loya Insurance Company
Defendant: Alfredo Perez-Mata, Jorge Antonio Chavez Vuelvas and Jess Lopez
Case Number: 2:2019cv01976
Filed: November 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Presiding Judge: Cam Ferenbach
Referring Judge: Gloria M Navarro
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 10, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 10, 2020 Filing 13 CLERK'S NOTICE of violation of Local Rules. ECF No. #12 was not filed pursuant to LR IA 10-3. Copies of pleadings or other documents filed in the pending matter must not be attached as exhibits or made part of an appendix.Attorney Walter Cannon is advised in the future to file documents pursuant to the Local Rules. No further action is required concerning this document at this time. Do NOT refile. (no image attached) (MMM)
January 10, 2020 Filing 12 MOTION for Entry of Clerks Default by Plaintiff Loya Insurance Company. (Cannon, Walter)
January 9, 2020 Filing 11 CLERK'S NOTICE Regarding Local Rule IC 2-1(g). Filer's account information is different from the address information contained in the filed document, ECF No. #10 Notice of Change of Firm Name. Attorney Walter Cannon is advised to review and update his user account information. (no image attached) (EDS)
January 9, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE OF CHANGE OF FIRM NAME by Loya Insurance Company. (Cannon, Walter)
December 10, 2019 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Loya Insurance Company re #1 Complaint. Jorge Antonio Chavez Vuelvas served on 11/26/2019, answer due 12/17/2019. (Cannon, Walter) Modified on 12/11/2019 to reflect correct party served. (MMM).
December 10, 2019 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Loya Insurance Company re #1 Complaint. Loya Insurance Company Alfredo Perez-Mata served on 11/26/2019, answer due 12/17/2019. (Cannon, Walter) Modified on 12/11/2019 to reflect correct party served (MMM).
November 18, 2019 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (JM)
November 18, 2019 Filing 6 PROPOSED SUMMONS to be issued to Jorge Antonio Chavez Vuelvas by Plaintiff Loya Insurance Company. (Cannon, Walter)
November 18, 2019 Filing 5 PROPOSED SUMMONS to be issued to Alfredo Perez-Mata by Plaintiff Loya Insurance Company. (Cannon, Walter)
November 18, 2019 Filing 4 PROPOSED SUMMONS to be issued to Jess Lopez by Plaintiff Loya Insurance Company. (Cannon, Walter)
November 14, 2019 Filing 3 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Loya Insurance Company. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Cannon, Walter)
November 12, 2019 Filing 2 STANDING ORDER. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Judge Gloria M. Navarro. Judge Navarro's Chambers Practices, which are posted on the U.S. District Court, District of Nevada public website, may also be accessed directly via this hyperlink #www.nvd.uscourts.gov. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
November 12, 2019 Case randomly assigned to Judge Gloria M. Navarro and Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach. (MR)
November 12, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Jess Lopez, Alfredo Perez-Mata, Jorge Antonio Chavez Vuelvas (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0978-5771751) by LOYA INSURANCE COMPANY. Proof of service due by 2/10/2020. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Cannon, Walter) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Loya Insurance Company v. Vuelvas et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alfredo Perez-Mata
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jorge Antonio Chavez Vuelvas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jess Lopez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Loya Insurance Company
Represented By: Walter R. Cannon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?