McGovern v. Wilson et al
Plaintiff: Arlo Kristian McGovern
Defendant: Arrey, Wilson, Brian E Williams, Nevada and James Dzurenda
Case Number: 2:2019cv01977
Filed: November 8, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Presiding Judge: Daniel J Albregts
Referring Judge: Richard F Boulware
2 Judge: Elayna J Youchah
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 11, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #6 Motion; within forty-five (45) days from the date of this order, Plaintiff will either: (1) file an inmate account statement for the past six months and a properly executed financial certificate; or (2) pay the full $400 fee. Signed by Magistrate Judge Daniel J. Albregts on 12/11/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF, cc: IFP to P - JM)
December 4, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION/APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Arlo Kristian McGovern. (JM)
December 4, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION for Extension of Time re #3 Order by Plaintiff Arlo Kristian McGovern. Responses due by 12/18/2019. (JM) Modified event on 12/10/2019 (EDS).
November 25, 2019 Filing 5 CLERK'S NOTICE that this case is randomly reassigned to Magistrate Judge Daniel J. Albregts for all further proceedings. All further documents must bear the correct case number 2:19-cv-01977-RFB-DJA. (no image attached) (EDS)
November 25, 2019 Filing 4 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Magistrate Judge Elayna J. Youchah on 11/25/2019. By Judicial Assistant: E. Santiago.With good cause appearing, the Honorable Magistrate Judge Elayna J. Youchah recuses herself in this action. IT IS ORDERED that this action is referred to the Clerk for random reassignment of this case for all further proceedings. (no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ES)
November 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER Payment of filing fees or IFP due within 30 days from date of this order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elayna J. Youchah on 11/18/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF, cc: IFP to P - JM)
November 13, 2019 Filing 2 ADVISORY LETTER to litigant. (JM)
November 8, 2019 Filing 1 RECEIPT of Initiating Documents by Court on behalf of Plaintiff. No Application to Proceed IFP or Filing Fee received. (Attachments: #1 Complaint) (JM)
November 8, 2019 Case randomly assigned to Judge Richard F. Boulware, II and Magistrate Judge Elayna J. Youchah. (RT)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: McGovern v. Wilson et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Arrey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brian E Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nevada
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Dzurenda
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Arlo Kristian McGovern
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?