A&A Global Imports, Inc. v. CBJ Distributing LLC et al
Plaintiff: A&A Global Imports, Inc.
Defendant: THC Label Solutions and CBJ Distributing LLC
Case Number: 2:2019cv02005
Filed: November 19, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Presiding Judge: Jennifer A Dorsey
Referring Judge: Nancy J Koppe
2 Judge: Gloria M Navarro
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:271
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 14, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 30, 2019 Party THC Label Solutions terminated pursuant to #15 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal. (MMM)
December 30, 2019 Filing 15 NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL without Prejudice, by A&A Global Imports, Inc.. (Zhong, Meng) Modified on 12/31/2019 (MMM).
December 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER Granting #13 Motion to Extend Time re #1 Complaint (First Request). CBJ Distributing LLC answer due 1/2/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 12/12/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
December 11, 2019 Filing 13 Unopposed MOTION to Extend Time (First Request) re #1 Complaint, #6 Summons Returned Executed by Plaintiff A&A Global Imports, Inc.. (Zhong, Meng)
December 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER Granting #10 Verified Petition for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Mark B. Mizrahi for A&A Global Imports, Inc. and approving Designation of Local Counsel Meng Zhong. Signed by Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 12/3/2019. Any Attorney not yet registered with the Court's CM/ECF System shall submit a Registration Form on the Court's website #www.nvd.uscourts.gov(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
December 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER Granting #9 Verified Petition for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Arash Beral for A&A Global Imports, Inc. and approving Designation of Local Counsel Meng Zhong. Signed by Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 12/3/2019. Any Attorney not yet registered with the Court's CM/ECF System shall submit a Registration Form on the Court's website #www.nvd.uscourts.gov (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
December 2, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION/VERIFIED PETITION for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice by Mark B. Mizrahi and DESIGNATION of Local Counsel Meng Zhong (Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 0978-5794944) by Plaintiff A&A Global Imports, Inc.. (Zhong, Meng)
December 2, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION/VERIFIED PETITION for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice by Arash Beral and DESIGNATION of Local Counsel Meng Zhong (Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 0978-5794941) by Plaintiff A&A Global Imports, Inc.. (Zhong, Meng)
November 25, 2019 Filing 8 CLERK'S NOTICE that this case is reassigned to Judge Gloria M. Navarro for all further proceedings. All further documents must bear the correct case number 2:19-cv-02005-GMN-NJK. (no image attached) (EDS)
November 25, 2019 Filing 7 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 11/25/2019. The Honorable Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey is no longer assigned to this case. Pursuant to General Order No. 2011-03, IT IS ORDERED that this action is referred to the Clerk for random reassignment to one of the designated patent pilot program judges for all further proceedings. (no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - CS)
November 20, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by A&A Global Imports, Inc. re #1 Complaint,, #5 Summons Issued. CBJ Distributing LLC served on 11/20/2019, answer due 12/11/2019. (Zhong, Meng)
November 19, 2019 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to All Defendants re #1 Complaint. (MR)
November 19, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE TO COUNSEL PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE IA 11-2. Counsel Mark B. Mizrahi and Arash Beral to comply with completion and filing of the Verified Petition and Designation of Local Counsel. For your convenience, click on the following link to obtain the form from the Court's website - #www.nvd.uscourts.gov. Upon approval of the Verified Petition, counsel is required to register for the Court's Case Management and Electronic Case Filing (CM/ECF) system and the electronic service of documents. Please visit the Court's website www.nvd.uscourts.gov to register Attorney. Verified Petition due by 1/3/2020. (no image attached) (MR)
November 19, 2019 Filing 3 AO 120 - REPORT on the filing or determination of an action regarding a patent or trademark. E-mailed to the US Patent and Trademark Office. (Attachments: #1 Complaint) (MR)
November 19, 2019 Case randomly assigned to Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey and Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe. Nature of Suit: 830 Patent Case (MR)
November 19, 2019 Filing 2 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by A&A Global Imports, Inc.. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Zhong, Meng)
November 19, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0978-5782210) by A&A Global Imports, Inc.. Proof of service due by 2/17/2020. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Civil Cover Sheet, #5 Summons, #6 Summons)(Zhong, Meng) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: A&A Global Imports, Inc. v. CBJ Distributing LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: A&A Global Imports, Inc.
Represented By: Meng Zhong
Represented By: Michael J. McCue
Represented By: Arash Beral
Represented By: Mark B. Mizrahi
Represented By: Mark Brian Mizrahi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: THC Label Solutions
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CBJ Distributing LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?