Fuentes Reyes v. Wolf et al
Petitioner: Maria Magdalena Fuentes Reyes
Respondent: Chad F Wolf, Damon Smith, William P Barr, Thedrick Andres and Laura McNeer
Case Number: 2:2019cv02086
Filed: December 5, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Presiding Judge: Gloria M Navarro
Referring Judge: Elayna J Youchah
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus - Alien Detainee
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 8, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 30, 2020 Filing 20 REPLY to #19 Answer to Habeas Petition, by Petitioner Maria Magdalena Fuentes Reyes. (Esparza, Sylvia)
January 13, 2020 Filing 19 ANSWER to #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus, filed by Thedrick Andres, William P Barr, Laura McNeer, Damon Smith, Chad F Wolf. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K, #12 Exhibit L, #13 Exhibit M, #14 Exhibit N, #15 Exhibit O, #16 Exhibit P, #17 Exhibit Q)(Greer, Christina)
December 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER Granting #16 Stipulation to Extend Time Re: #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus. William P Barr answer due 1/13/2020; Laura McNeer answer due 1/13/2020; Chad F Wolf answer due 1/13/2020. Signed by Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 12/30/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
December 23, 2019 Filing 17 CERTIFED MAIL RETURN RECEIPT re #3 Summons Issued as to William Barr and #5 Order. (SLD)
December 23, 2019 Filing 16 STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME (First Request) to Respond re #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus, by Respondents William P Barr, Laura McNeer, Chad F Wolf. (Irvin, Brian)
December 20, 2019 Filing 15 SUMMONS Returned Unexecuted as to Thedrick Andres re #3 Summons Issued as to USA. (JQC)
December 20, 2019 Filing 14 SUMMONS Returned Executed re #3 Summons Issued as to USA. Damon Smith served on 12/16/2019, answer due 1/6/2020. (JQC)
December 18, 2019 Filing 13 CLERK'S NOTICE Regarding Local Rule IC 2-2(d). ECF No. #12 was not filed pursuant to LR IC 2-2(d). Documents must be linked to the document to which they pertain in the electronic filing system. The Clerk has modified the entry to properly establish the docket-entry relationship. Attorney is advised to properly link all further filed documents. DO NOT refile. (no image attached) (MMM)
December 17, 2019 Filing 12 MEMORANDUM in Support of #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus re #9 Order, by Petitioner Maria Magdalena Fuentes Reyes. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit Exhibit K, #12 Exhibit Exhibit L, #13 Exhibit Exhibit M, #14 Exhibit Exhibit N, #15 Exhibit Exhibit O)(Esparza, Sylvia) Modified on 12/18/2019 to add docket entry relationship(MMM).
December 16, 2019 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Unexecuted as to Laura McNeer re #3 Summons Issued as to USA. (JM)
December 14, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Christina Petersen Greer on behalf of Respondents Thedrick Andres, William P Barr, Laura McNeer, Damon Smith, Chad F Wolf. (Greer, Christina)
December 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER. IT IS ORDERED that Petitioner Maria M. Fuentes Reyes AMEND the #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus to include the memorandum of points and authorities and REFILE the supporting exhibits to comply with the Local Rules of Practice and the Court's CM/ECF filing procedures. Signed by Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 12/12/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JQC)
December 12, 2019 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed re #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus, #3 Summons Issued as to USA. William P Barr served on 12/11/2019, answer due 2/9/2020; Chad F Wolf served on 12/11/2019, answer due 2/9/2020. (ADR)
December 10, 2019 Filing 7 CERTIFIED MAIL RECEIPTS (2133 Barr, 2140 Wolfe) re #5 Order, #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus, #3 Summons Issued as to USA. (JM)
December 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER Denying without prejudice #2 Motion for Temporary Restraining Order. See Order for details. Signed by Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 12/10/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
December 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER. IT IS ORDERED: 1. The Clerk of Court shall DELIVER a copy of #1 the Petition, #3 Summons, and this order to the U.S. Marshal for expedited service. 2. The Clerk of Court shall SEND VIA REGISTERED OR CERTIFIED MAIL a copy of #1 the Petition, #3 Summons, and this order to the Hon. William Barr, Attorney General of the United States. 3. The Clerk of Court shall SEND VIA REGISTERED OR CERTIFIED MAIL a copy of #1 the Petition, #3 Summons, and this order to the Hon. Chad F. Wolfe, Acting Secretary of the United States Department of Homeland Security. Signed by Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 12/10/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - cc: USM - MR)
December 5, 2019 Filing 4 STANDING ORDER. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Judge Gloria M. Navarro. Judge Navarro's Chambers Practices, which are posted on the U.S. District Court, District of Nevada public website, may also be accessed directly via this hyperlink #www.nvd.uscourts.gov. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
December 5, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS Issued as to Thedrick Andres, William P Barr, Laura McNeer, Damon Smith, Chad F Wolf, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General re #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus. (ADR)
December 5, 2019 Case randomly assigned to Judge Gloria M. Navarro and Magistrate Judge Elayna J. Youchah. (ADR)
December 5, 2019 Filing 2 Emergency MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order re #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus, by Petitioner Maria Magdalena Fuentes Reyes. Responses due by 12/19/2019.(Esparza, Sylvia) Modified event on 12/7/2019 (MMM).
December 5, 2019 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus (Filing fee $ 5 receipt number 0978-5801304) by Maria Magdalena Fuentes Reyes. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Summons, #6 Summons)(Esparza, Sylvia)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Fuentes Reyes v. Wolf et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Chad F Wolf
Represented By: Christina Petersen Greer
Represented By: Brian W. Irvin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Damon Smith
Represented By: Christina Petersen Greer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: William P Barr
Represented By: Christina Petersen Greer
Represented By: Brian W. Irvin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Thedrick Andres
Represented By: Christina Petersen Greer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Laura McNeer
Represented By: Christina Petersen Greer
Represented By: Brian W. Irvin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Maria Magdalena Fuentes Reyes
Represented By: Sylvia L. Esparza
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?