Pajarillo v. Yarnall et al
Appellant: Fidel H. Pajarillo
Appellee: U.S. Bank N.A. and Rick A. Yarnall
Trustee: US Trustee
Case Number: 2:2019cv02106
Filed: December 9, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Presiding Judge: Gloria M Navarro
Nature of Suit: Bankruptcy Appeal (801)
Cause of Action: 28:0158
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 27, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 27, 2020 Filing 8 OPENING BRIEF by Appellant Fidel H. Pajarillo. (MR)
January 16, 2020 Filing 7 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 1/16/2020. Pending before the Court is Appellant Fidel H. Pajarillo's ("Appellant's") #6 Motion to Extend Time to File the Opening Brief. Appellant's #6 Motion requests an additional ten days to file the Opening Brief. In light of the minimal extension requested, the request having been filed before the initial deadline expired, and Appellant's asserted difficulties in receiving notice of the briefing schedule through mail, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Appellant's #6 Motion to Extend Time to File Opening Brief is GRANTED. Appellant shall have until January 27, 2020, to file the Opening Brief. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KK)
January 15, 2020 Filing 6 MOTION to Extend Time (First Request) re 5 Minute Order Bankruptcy Briefing Schedule, filed by Appellant Fidel H. Pajarillo. (JQC)
January 3, 2020 Filing 5 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 1/3/2020. IT IS ORDERED that the appellant shall have a period of 14 days from the date of this order to file/serve an opening brief. Appellee shall have 14 days after to file/serve an answering brief. Thereafter, appellant shall have 14 days to file/serve a final reply brief. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that appellant shall file and serve excerpts of the record as an appendix to the appellant brief pursuant to Fed. R. Bankr. P. 8009(b) and LR IC 2-2. Appellee may also file/serve an appendix with appellee brief which contains required material omitted by appellant. Re: #4 Certificate Readiness Opening brief due by 1/17/2020. Answering brief due by 1/31/2020. Reply brief due by 2/14/2020. (no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
January 2, 2020 Filing 4 CERTIFICATE of Readiness. (MR) (Additional attachment(s) added on 1/9/2020: #1 Appellant Designation of Record And Statement Of Issues, #2 Appellee Designation of Record., #3 Docket sheet for 19-15590-btb) (AF).
December 9, 2019 Filing 3 STANDING ORDER. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Judge Gloria M. Navarro. Judge Navarro's Chambers Practices, which are posted on the U.S. District Court, District of Nevada public website, may also be accessed directly via this hyperlink #www.nvd.uscourts.gov. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
December 9, 2019 Filing 2 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 12/9/2019. IT IS ORDERED that the designation of reporters and recorders transcripts (if any) as required by Fed. R. Bankr. P. 8009(a) shall be filed with the clerk of bankruptcy court so the certificate of readiness may be transmitted timely to the district court. If the designation was previously filed with the clerk of BAP, counsel shall file a copy of the same with the clerk of bankruptcy court. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that all future documents filed in connection with this appeal shall bear the bankruptcy case number, adversary case number (if any) and the district court civil case number. For Bankruptcy Appeals, Attorneys are required to file Verified Petitions in accordance with LR IA 11-2. (no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
December 9, 2019 Filing 1 Notice of APPEAL FROM BANKRUPTCY COURT, Bankruptcy Court case number 19-15590-btb. (Attachments: #1 Appeal Memorandum, #2 Notice of Referral, #3 Transmittal) (MR)
December 9, 2019 Case randomly assigned to Judge Gloria M. Navarro. (MR)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Pajarillo v. Yarnall et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Fidel H. Pajarillo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: U.S. Bank N.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Rick A. Yarnall
Represented By: Daniel Riggs
Represented By: Amanda Hunt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Trustee: US Trustee
Represented By: U.S. Trustee, Las Vegas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?