Waveseer of Nevada, LLC v. United Food and Commercial Workers, Local 711
Plaintiff: Waveseer of Nevada, LLC
Defendant: United Food and Commercial Workers, Local 711
Case Number: 2:2019cv02188
Filed: December 20, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Presiding Judge: Cam Ferenbach
Referring Judge: Andrew P Gordon
Nature of Suit: Labor: Other
Cause of Action: 29:185
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 20, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 14, 2020 Filing 14 MEMORANDUM to #11 Motion for Hearing Before District Judge by Plaintiff Waveseer of Nevada, LLC, Counter Defendant Waveseer of Nevada, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Declaration of David Rosen) (Forbush, Deanna)
January 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER Granting #12 Stipulation to Extend Time Re: #11 Motion for Hearing Before District Judge and to respond to #10 Defendant's Answer. See Order for deadlines. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 1/30/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
January 30, 2020 Filing 12 First STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME (First Request) re #11 Motion for Hearing Before District Judge, #10 Answer to Complaint,,, Counterclaim,, by Plaintiff Waveseer of Nevada, LLC, Counter Defendant Waveseer of Nevada, LLC. (Forbush, Deanna)
January 17, 2020 Filing 11 MOTION for Hearing Before District Judge by Counter Claimant United Food and Commercial Workers, Local 711, Defendant United Food and Commercial Workers, Local 711. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Kimberley C. Weber) (Weber, Kimberley)
January 17, 2020 Filing 10 ANSWER to Complaint (, Discovery Plan/Scheduling Order due by 3/2/2020.), COUNTERCLAIM against Waveseer of Nevada, LLC by United Food and Commercial Workers, Local 711. filed by United Food and Commercial Workers, Local 711.(Weber, Kimberley) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court.
January 17, 2020 Filing 9 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by United Food and Commercial Workers, Local 711. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Weber, Kimberley)
January 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER Granting #5 Stipulation; Re: #1 Petition for Judicial Review. United Food and Commercial Workers, Local 711 answer due 1/20/2020. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 1/6/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
January 3, 2020 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Waveseer of Nevada, LLC re #1 Petition for Judicial Review. (Forbush, Deanna)
January 3, 2020 Filing 6 STANDING ORDER. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Andrew P. Gordon. Judge Gordon's Chambers Practices, which are posted on the U.S. District Court, District of Nevada public website, may also be accessed directly via this hyperlink: #www.nvd.uscourts.gov. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - EDS)
January 2, 2020 Filing 5 STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME (First Request) to File Response and Proposed Order re #1 Petition for Judicial Review by Defendant United Food and Commercial Workers, Local 711. (Weber, Kimberley)
December 20, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to United Food and Commercial Workers, Local 711 re #1 Petition for Judicial Review. (ADR)
December 20, 2019 Case randomly assigned to Judge Andrew P. Gordon and Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach. (ADR)
December 20, 2019 Filing 3 PROPOSED SUMMONS to be issued by Plaintiff Waveseer of Nevada, LLC d/b/a Jenny's Dispensary. (Forbush, Deanna)
December 20, 2019 Filing 2 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Waveseer of Nevada, LLC d/b/a Jenny's Dispensary. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Forbush, Deanna)
December 20, 2019 Filing 1 PETITION for Judicial Review (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0978-5819668) by Defendant United Food and Commercial Workers, Local 711. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Forbush, Deanna)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Waveseer of Nevada, LLC v. United Food and Commercial Workers, Local 711
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Waveseer of Nevada, LLC
Represented By: Colleen E McCarty
Represented By: Deanna L Forbush
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United Food and Commercial Workers, Local 711
Represented By: Kimberley C Weber
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?