Wilmington Savings Fund Society, FSB v. North American Title Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Wilmington Savings Fund Society, FSB
Defendant: North American Title Insurance Company
Case Number: 2:2019cv02209
Filed: December 23, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Presiding Judge: Andrew P Gordon
Referring Judge: Elayna J Youchah
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 18, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER Granting #6 Stipulation to Stay Case. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 2/18/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
February 14, 2020 Filing 6 STIPULATION and Proposed Order to Stay Case Pending Appeal and Extending Deadline to Respond to Complaint by Defendant North American Title Insurance Company. (Lau, Sophia)
February 10, 2020 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Wilmington Savings Fund Society, FSB re #1 Complaint,,, #4 Summons Issued. North American Title Insurance Company served on 1/31/2020. (Robbins, Lindsay)
December 23, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to North American Title Insurance Company re #1 Complaint. (SLD)
December 23, 2019 Filing 3 STANDING ORDER. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Andrew P. Gordon. Judge Gordon's Chambers Practices, which are posted on the U.S. District Court, District of Nevada public website, may also be accessed directly via this hyperlink: #www.nvd.uscourts.gov. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
December 23, 2019 Case randomly assigned to Judge Andrew P. Gordon and Magistrate Judge Elayna J. Youchah. (SLD)
December 23, 2019 Filing 2 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Wilmington Savings Fund Society, FSB. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Robbins, Lindsay)
December 23, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against North American Title Insurance Company (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0978-5821286) by Wilmington Savings Fund Society, FSB. Proof of service due by 3/22/2020. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit 7, #9 Exhibit 8, #10 Exhibit 9, #11 Exhibit 10, #12 Exhibit 11, #13 Exhibit 12, #14 Exhibit 13, #15 Exhibit 14, #16 Summons)(Robbins, Lindsay) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wilmington Savings Fund Society, FSB v. North American Title Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: North American Title Insurance Company
Represented By: Sophia Shunwan Lau
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wilmington Savings Fund Society, FSB
Represented By: Christina Miller
Represented By: Lindsay Robbins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?