Allstate Insurance Company v. Brasscraft Manufacturing Company
Plaintiff: Allstate Insurance Company
Defendant: Brasscraft Manufacturing Company
Case Number: 2:2019cv02242
Filed: December 31, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Presiding Judge: Daniel J Albregts
Referring Judge: Andrew P Gordon
Nature of Suit: Prop. Damage Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 10, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 10, 2020 Filing 16 NOTICE PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE IB 2-2: In accordance with 28 USC 636(c) and FRCP 73, the parties in this action are provided with a link to the "AO 85 Notice of Availability, Consent, and Order of Reference - Exercise of Jurisdiction by a U.S. Magistrate Judge" form on the Court's website - #www.nvd.uscourts.gov. AO 85 Consent forms should NOT be electronically filed. Upon consent of all parties, counsel are advised to manually file the form with the Clerk's Office. (A copy of form AO 85 has been mailed to parties not receiving electronic service.) (no image attached) (JM)
February 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 SCHEDULING ORDER granting #11 Discovery Plan and Scheduling Order. Discovery due by 7/6/2020. Motions due by 8/5/2020. Proposed Joint Pretrial Order due by 9/4/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Daniel J. Albregts on 2/10/2020.(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
February 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER granting #12 Verified Petition for Permission for Christopher Duke Baucom to Practice Pro Hac Vice and approving Designation of Local Counsel Michelle Alarie. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 2/7/2020. Any Attorney not yet registered with the Court's CM/ECF System shall submit a Registration Form on the Court's website #www.nvd.uscourts.gov(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
February 7, 2020 Filing 13 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE for #12 Motion for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice - Verified Petition by Defendant Brasscraft Manufacturing Company. (Alarie, Michelle)
February 7, 2020 Filing 12 MOTION/VERIFIED PETITION for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice by Christopher D. Baucom and DESIGNATION of Local Counsel Michelle D. Alarie by Defendant Brasscraft Manufacturing Company. (JM)
February 7, 2020 Filing 11 First Stipulated Discovery Plan and Scheduling Order by Plaintiff Allstate Insurance Company. (Emerson, Phillip)
January 27, 2020 Filing 10 Joint STATUS REPORT Pursuant to ECF No. 3 by Defendant Brasscraft Manufacturing Company. (Alarie, Michelle)
January 8, 2020 Filing 9 STATEMENT REGARDING REMOVAL by Defendant Brasscraft Manufacturing Company. (Alarie, Michelle)
January 7, 2020 Filing 8 ANSWER with Jury Demand re #1 Petition for Removal,, filed by Brasscraft Manufacturing Company. Discovery Plan/Scheduling Order due by 2/21/2020.(Alarie, Michelle) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court.
January 3, 2020 Filing 7 CLERK'S NOTICE of violation of Local Rules. ECF No. #6 was not filed pursuant to LR IA 10-3(b). Copies of pleadings or other documents filed in the pending matter must not be attached as exhibits.No further action is required concerning this document at this time. Do NOT refile. (no image attached) (MMM)
January 3, 2020 Filing 6 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE for #3 Minute Order Removal Case, by Defendant Brasscraft Manufacturing Company. (Alarie, Michelle)
December 31, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE TO COUNSEL PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE IA 11-2. Counsel Christopher D. Baucom to comply with completion and filing of the Verified Petition and Designation of Local Counsel. For your convenience, click on the following link to obtain the form from the Court's website - #www.nvd.uscourts.gov. Upon approval of the Verified Petition, counsel is required to register for the Court's Case Management and Electronic Case Filing (CM/ECF) system and the electronic service of documents. Please visit the Court's website www.nvd.uscourts.gov to register Attorney. Verified Petition due by 2/14/2020. (no image attached) (DKJ)
December 31, 2019 Filing 4 STANDING ORDER. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Andrew P. Gordon. Judge Gordon's Chambers Practices, which are posted on the U.S. District Court, District of Nevada public website, may also be accessed directly via this hyperlink: #www.nvd.uscourts.gov. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
December 31, 2019 Filing 3 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 12/31/2019. Statement regarding removed action is due by 1/15/2020. Joint Status Report regarding removed action is due by 1/30/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
December 31, 2019 Case randomly assigned to Judge Andrew P. Gordon and Magistrate Judge Daniel J. Albregts. (JM)
December 31, 2019 Filing 2 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Brasscraft Manufacturing Company that identifies all parties that have an interest in the outcome of this case. Corporate Parent Masco Corporation for Brasscraft Manufacturing Company added. (Alarie, Michelle)
December 31, 2019 Filing 1 PETITION FOR REMOVAL from District Court, Clark County, Nevada, Case Number A-19-804578-C, (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0978-5828610) by Brasscraft Manufacturing Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Alarie, Michelle) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Allstate Insurance Company v. Brasscraft Manufacturing Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Allstate Insurance Company
Represented By: Phillip R Emerson
Represented By: Sean Harmon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brasscraft Manufacturing Company
Represented By: Christopher Duke Baucom
Represented By: Michelle D Alarie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?