Actioncoach North America, LLC et al v. Dunn
Plaintiff: Actioncoach Oneco, LLC and Actioncoach North America, LLC
Defendant: Allison Dunn
Case Number: 2:2019cv02244
Filed: December 31, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Presiding Judge: Daniel J Albregts
Referring Judge: Kent J Dawson
2 Judge: Andrew P Gordon
Nature of Suit: Contract: Franchise
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 31, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 13, 2020 Filing 16 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 2/13/2020. Judge Gordon will hear oral arguments on the plaintiffs' motion for preliminary injunction #3 on Wednesday, March 4, 2020 at 10:00 a.m. in Las Vegas Courtroom 6C. No witness testimony will be taken at that time. The parties should be prepared to discuss whether an evidentiary hearing is needed, and when it would be scheduled. Judge Gordon strongly encourages litigants to permit more junior members of the litigation team to conduct oral argument. Where the more junior attorney presents the argument, Judge Gordon will entertain reasonable requests for a more senior attorney to supplement any argument that is made. (no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - CS)
February 11, 2020 Filing 15 REPLY to Response to #3 Motion for Preliminary Injunction by Plaintiffs Actioncoach North America, LLC, Actioncoach Oneco, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Ken Zelazny, #2 Exhibit A - List of ActionCOACH Awards and Survey Rankings, #3 Exhibit B - ActionCOACH NPS Information for May to June 2018 for North America, #4 Exhibit C - ActionCOACH NPS Information for August to September 2019 for the United States, #5 Exhibit D - ActionCOACH's Executive Coaching Marketing Materials) (Fountain, Jonathan)
February 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER granting #13 Stipulation; Re: #3 Motion for Preliminary Injunction. Replies due by 2/11/2020. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 2/4/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
February 4, 2020 Filing 13 STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME (First Request) re #11 Response to #3 Motion for Preliminary Injunction by Plaintiffs Actioncoach North America, LLC, Actioncoach Oneco, LLC. (Fountain, Jonathan)
February 4, 2020 Filing 12 Joint STATUS REPORT by Plaintiffs Actioncoach North America, LLC, Actioncoach Oneco, LLC. (Fountain, Jonathan)
January 28, 2020 Filing 11 RESPONSE to #3 Motion for Preliminary Injunction by Defendant Allison Dunn. Replies due by 2/4/2020. (Attachments: #1 Declaration ) (Splaine, Shannon)
January 28, 2020 Filing 10 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand filed by Allison Dunn. Discovery Plan/Scheduling Order due by 3/13/2020.(Splaine, Shannon) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court.
January 16, 2020 Filing 9 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE for #1 Petition for Removal re Summons, Notice of Reassignment, Preliminary Injunction and other State Court filed Pleadings by Plaintiffs Actioncoach North America, LLC, Actioncoach Oneco, LLC. (Fountain, Jonathan) Modified text on 1/16/2020 (JM).
January 16, 2020 Filing 8 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Actioncoach North America, LLC, Actioncoach Oneco, LLC that identifies all parties that have an interest in the outcome of this case. Corporate Parent ActionCOACH America, Inc., Other Affiliate Brad Sugars for Actioncoach Oneco, LLC; Corporate Parent Brad Sugars, Inc., Other Affiliate Brad Sugars for Actioncoach North America, LLC added. (Fountain, Jonathan)
January 15, 2020 Filing 7 STATEMENT REGARDING REMOVAL by Defendant Allison Dunn. (Splaine, Shannon)
January 10, 2020 Filing 6 STANDING ORDER. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Andrew P. Gordon. Judge Gordon's Chambers Practices, which are posted on the U.S. District Court, District of Nevada public website, may also be accessed directly via this hyperlink: #www.nvd.uscourts.gov. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MAJ)
January 8, 2020 Filing 5 CLERK'S NOTICE that this case is randomly reassigned to Judge Andrew P. Gordon for all further proceedings. All further documents must bear the correct case number 2:19-cv-02244-APG-DJA. (no image attached) (MMM)
January 8, 2020 Filing 4 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Judge Kent J. Dawson on 1/8/2020. By Deputy Clerk: D. Saavedra. With good cause appearing, the Honorable Judge Kent J. Dawson recuses himself in this action. IT IS ORDERED that this action is referred to the Clerk for random reassignment of this case for all further proceedings. (no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DXS)
January 6, 2020 Filing 3 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by Plaintiffs Actioncoach North America, LLC, Actioncoach Oneco, LLC. Responses due by 1/20/2020. (Fountain, Jonathan)
December 31, 2019 Filing 2 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Judge Kent J. Dawson on 12/31/2019. Statement regarding removed action is due by 1/15/2020. Joint Status Report regarding removed action is due by 1/30/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
December 31, 2019 Case randomly assigned to Judge Kent J. Dawson and Magistrate Judge Daniel J. Albregts. (SLD)
December 31, 2019 Filing 1 PETITION FOR REMOVAL from Eighth Judicial District Court, Case Number A-19-806548-C, (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0978-5828701) by Allison Dunn. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Part 1, #2 Exhibit A - Part 2, #3 Exhibit A - Part 3, #4 Exhibit A - Part 4, #5 Exhibit B, #6 Exhibit C, #7 Exhibit D, #8 Exhibit E, #9 Civil Cover Sheet, #10 Appendix Notice of Financial Party, #11 Appendix Demand for Jury Trial, #12 Certificate of Service)(Splaine, Shannon) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court. .

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Actioncoach North America, LLC et al v. Dunn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Actioncoach Oneco, LLC
Represented By: Jonathan W Fountain
Represented By: Jennifer R. Lloyd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Actioncoach North America, LLC
Represented By: Jonathan W Fountain
Represented By: Jennifer R. Lloyd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allison Dunn
Represented By: Shannon G. Splaine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?