Carson v. Walmart Inc.
Plaintiff: Denise R Carson
Defendant: Walmart Inc.
Case Number: 2:2020cv00005
Filed: January 2, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Presiding Judge: Gloria M Navarro
Referring Judge: Elayna J Youchah
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 16, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 20, 2020 Filing 11 NOTICE PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE IB 2-2: In accordance with 28 USC 636(c) and FRCP 73, the parties in this action are provided with a link to the "AO 85 Notice of Availability, Consent, and Order of Reference - Exercise of Jurisdiction by a U.S. Magistrate Judge" form on the Court's website - #www.nvd.uscourts.gov. AO 85 Consent forms should NOT be electronically filed. Upon consent of all parties, counsel are advised to manually file the form with the Clerk's Office. (A copy of form AO 85 has been mailed to parties not receiving electronic service.) (no image attached) (MR)
February 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 SCHEDULING ORDER Granting #9 Discovery Plan and Scheduling Order. Discovery due by 7/28/2020. Motions due by 8/27/2020. Proposed Joint Pretrial Order due by 9/26/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elayna J. Youchah on 2/20/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
February 19, 2020 Filing 9 Stipulated Discovery Plan and Scheduling Order by Plaintiff Denise R Carson. (Ellison, Brent)
February 19, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE of Docket Correction to ECF No. #7 : Event changed by Court from Notice to Certificate of Interested Parties. Do NOT refile. (no image attached) (MMM)
February 14, 2020 Filing 7 Certificate of Interested Parties by Denise R Carson. (Ellison, Brent) Modified event on 2/19/2020 (MMM).
January 31, 2020 Filing 6 Joint STATUS REPORTRegarding Removal by Defendant Walmart Inc.. (Wessel, Megan)
January 2, 2020 Filing 5 STATEMENT REGARDING REMOVAL by Defendant Walmart Inc.. (Wessel, Megan)
January 2, 2020 Filing 4 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Walmart Inc.. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Wessel, Megan)
January 2, 2020 Filing 3 STANDING ORDER. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Judge Gloria M. Navarro. Judge Navarro's Chambers Practices, which are posted on the U.S. District Court, District of Nevada public website, may also be accessed directly via this hyperlink #www.nvd.uscourts.gov. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
January 2, 2020 Filing 2 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 1/2/2020. Statement regarding removed action is due by 1/17/2020. Joint Status Report regarding removed action is due by 2/1/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
January 2, 2020 Filing 1 PETITION FOR REMOVAL from Eight Judicial District Court, Clark County, Nevada, Case Number A-19-798606-C, (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0978-5830448) by Walmart Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C) (Wessel, Megan) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court.
January 2, 2020 Case randomly assigned to Judge Gloria M. Navarro and Magistrate Judge Elayna J. Youchah. (ADR)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Carson v. Walmart Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walmart Inc.
Represented By: Robert K. Phillips
Represented By: Megan Elizabeth Wessel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Denise R Carson
Represented By: Todd M Leventhal
Represented By: Brent Ellison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?