Golden Bear Insurance Company v Evanston Insurance Company, et al
Plaintiff: Golden Bear Insurance Company
Defendant: Evanston Insurance Company and StarStone Specialty Insurance Company
Case Number: 2:2020cv00027
Filed: January 7, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Presiding Judge: Richard F Boulware
Referring Judge: Elayna J Youchah
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 3, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER granting #21 Verified Petition for Permission for David Plouff to Practice Pro Hac Vice and approving Designation of Local Counsel Nicholas M Wieczorek. Signed by Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 3/3/2020. Any Attorney not yet registered with the Court's CM/ECF System shall submit a Registration Form on the Court's website #www.nvd.uscourts.gov(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
March 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER granting #20 Verified Petition for Permission for Gary A Hamblet to Practice Pro Hac Vice and approving Designation of Local Counsel Nicholas M. Wieczorek. Signed by Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 3/2/2020. Any Attorney not yet registered with the Court's CM/ECF System shall submit a Registration Form on the Court's website #www.nvd.uscourts.gov(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
March 2, 2020 Filing 21 MOTION/VERIFIED PETITION for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice by David M. Plouff and DESIGNATION of Local Counsel Nicholas M. Wieczorek (Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 0978-5910233) by Defendant Evanston Insurance Company, Counter Claimant Evanston Insurance Company. (Wieczorek, Nicholas)
March 2, 2020 Filing 20 MOTION/VERIFIED PETITION for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice by Gary A. Hamblet and DESIGNATION of Local Counsel Nicholas M. Wieczorek (Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 0978-5910212) by Defendant Evanston Insurance Company, Counter Claimant Evanston Insurance Company. (Wieczorek, Nicholas)
February 28, 2020 Filing 19 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by StarStone Specialty Insurance Company. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Ames, Byron)
February 28, 2020 Filing 18 ANSWER to #1 Complaint,, Answer filed by StarStone Specialty Insurance Company.(Ames, Byron)
February 27, 2020 Filing 17 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Evanston Insurance Company that identifies all parties that have an interest in the outcome of this case. Corporate Parent Markel Corporation for Evanston Insurance Company, Evanston Insurance Company added. (Wieczorek, Nicholas)
February 27, 2020 Filing 16 NOTICE TO COUNSEL PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE IA 11-2. Counsel Gary A Hamblet and David M Plouff to comply with completion and filing of the Verified Petition and Designation of Local Counsel. For your convenience, click on the following link to obtain the form from the Court's website - #www.nvd.uscourts.gov. Upon approval of the Verified Petition, counsel is required to register for the Court's Case Management and Electronic Case Filing (CM/ECF) system and the electronic service of documents. Please visit the Court's website www.nvd.uscourts.gov to register Attorney. Verified Petition due by 4/12/2020. (no image attached) (EDS)
February 27, 2020 Filing 15 ANSWER to #1 Complaint,, with Jury Demand , COUNTERCLAIM against Golden Bear Insurance Company StarStone Specialty Insurance Company by Evanston Insurance Company. filed by Evanston Insurance Company.(Wieczorek, Nicholas) Incorrect event selected. Modified to correct event and counter defendants on 2/27/2020 (EDS).
February 27, 2020 Filing 14 ANSWER to #1 Complaint,, with Jury Demand filed by Evanston Insurance Company. Discovery Plan/Scheduling Order due by 4/12/2020.(Wieczorek, Nicholas) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court.
February 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting #12 Motion to Extend Time; Evanston Insurance Company answer due 2/27/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elayna J. Youchah on 2/19/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
February 14, 2020 Filing 12 Joint MOTION to Extend Time (First Request) to Respond to Initial Complaint and Order Thereon re #1 Complaint,, by Defendant Evanston Insurance Company. (Wieczorek, Nicholas)
February 11, 2020 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Golden Bear Insurance Company. (McKay, Pamela)
February 11, 2020 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Golden Bear Insurance Company. StarStone Specialty Insurance Company served on 2/7/2020. (McKay, Pamela)
January 22, 2020 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Golden Bear Insurance Company. Evanston Insurance Company served on 1/17/2020. (McKay, Pamela)
January 14, 2020 Filing 8 ERRATA to #3 Certificate of Interested Parties, #1 Complaint,, by Plaintiff Golden Bear Insurance Company. (McKay, Pamela)
January 8, 2020 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (JM)
January 8, 2020 Filing 6 PROPOSED SUMMONS to be issued Defendants by Plaintiff Golden Bear Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Summons Proposed Summons) (McKay, Pamela)
January 7, 2020 Filing 5 ERROR: Filed in error. Please see #6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Golden Bear Insurance Company. (McKay, Pamela)
January 7, 2020 Filing 4 ERROR: Filed in error. Please see #6 SUMMONS Returned Unexecuted by Golden Bear Insurance Company as to Evanston Insurance Company. (McKay, Pamela)
January 7, 2020 Filing 3 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Golden Bear Insurance Company that identifies all parties that have an interest in the outcome of this case. Other Affiliate M.J. Hall & Company, Inc., Other Affiliate Delta Adjusting Company for Golden Bear Insurance Company added. (McKay, Pamela)
January 7, 2020 Filing 2 STANDING ORDER. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Judge Richard F. Boulware, II. Judge Boulware's Chambers Practices, which are posted on the U.S. District Court, District of Nevada public website, may also be accessed directly via this hyperlink: #www.nvd.uscourts.gov. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
January 7, 2020 Case randomly assigned to Judge Richard F. Boulware, II and Magistrate Judge Elayna J. Youchah. (JM)
January 7, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0978-5836200) by Golden Bear Insurance Company. Proof of service due by 4/6/2020. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Bankston Complaint, #2 Exhibit Hicks Complaint, #3 Exhibit Golden Bear Primary Policy, #4 Exhibit Golden Bear Excess Policy, #5 Exhibit Evanston Primary Policy, #6 Exhibit StarStone Excess Policy) (McKay, Pamela) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Golden Bear Insurance Company v Evanston Insurance Company, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Golden Bear Insurance Company
Represented By: Pamela A. McKay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Evanston Insurance Company
Represented By: Gary A. Hamblet
Represented By: Nicholas M Wieczorek
Represented By: David Plouff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: StarStone Specialty Insurance Company
Represented By: Byron L. Ames
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?