Grantz v. Fashion Show Mall, LLC
Appellant: Joshua Michael Grantz
Trustee: US Trustee
Appellee: Fashion Show Mall, LLC
Case Number: 2:2020cv00043
Filed: January 8, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Presiding Judge: Jennifer A Dorsey
Nature of Suit: Bankruptcy Appeal (801)
Cause of Action: 28:0158
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 2, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 21, 2020 Filing 8 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 2/21/2020. Re #6 Stipulation to Continue Briefing Deadlines. The parties have stipulated to extend briefing deadlines #6 . LR IA 6-1 requires the parties to state the reasons for the extension requested. This stipulation lacks this information. Accordingly, the stipulation #6 is DENIED without prejudice to the filing of a new stipulation that complies with the rules of this court and explains the reason that the extension is needed so that the court can determine if good cause exists to approve the stipulation.(no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - CS)
February 21, 2020 Filing 7 Submission of PROPOSED ORDER re #6 Stipulation by Appellant Joshua Michael Grantz. (Beck, Corey)
February 21, 2020 Filing 6 STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME (First Request) to Continue Deadlines Regarding Opening Brief by Appellant Joshua Michael Grantz. (Beck, Corey)
February 7, 2020 Filing 5 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 2/7/2020. IT IS ORDERED that the appellant shall have a period of 14 days from the date of this order to file/serve an opening brief. Appellee shall have 14 days after to file/serve an answering brief. Thereafter, appellant shall have 14 days to file/serve a final reply brief. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that appellant shall file and serve excerpts of the record as an appendix to the appellant brief pursuant to Fed. R. Bankr. P. 8009(b) and LR IC 2-2. Appellee may also file/serve an appendix with appellee brief which contains required material omitted by appellant. Opening brief due by 2/21/2020. Answering brief due by 3/6/2020. Reply brief due by 3/20/2020. (no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
February 7, 2020 Filing 4 CERTIFICATE of Readiness. (JM)
January 8, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Louis Martin Bubala, III on behalf of Appellee Fashion Show Mall, LLC. (Bubala, Louis)
January 8, 2020 Filing 2 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 1/8/2020. IT IS ORDERED that the designation of reporters and recorders transcripts (if any) as required by Fed. R. Bankr. P. 8009(a) shall be filed with the clerk of bankruptcy court so the certificate of readiness may be transmitted timely to the district court. If the designation was previously filed with the clerk of BAP, counsel shall file a copy of the same with the clerk of bankruptcy court. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that all future documents filed in connection with this appeal shall bear the bankruptcy case number, adversary case number (if any) and the district court civil case number. For Bankruptcy Appeals, Attorneys are required to file Verified Petitions in accordance with LR IA 11-2. (no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
January 8, 2020 Filing 1 Notice of APPEAL FROM BANKRUPTCY COURT, Bankruptcy Court case number 09-22832-abl. (Attachments: #1 Memo, #2 Referral, #3 Transmittal) (JM)
January 8, 2020 Case randomly assigned to Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey. (JM)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Grantz v. Fashion Show Mall, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Joshua Michael Grantz
Represented By: Corey B Beck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Trustee: US Trustee
Represented By: US Trustee Las Vegas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Fashion Show Mall, LLC
Represented By: Louis Martin Bubala, III
Represented By: Bryan Viellion
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?