Rodriguez Sandoval v. Saul
Plaintiff: Jesus E. Rodriguez Sandoval
Defendant: Andrew Saul
Case Number: 2:2020cv00065
Filed: January 9, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Presiding Judge: Daniel J Albregts
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XVI
Cause of Action: 42:205
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 18, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 21, 2020 Filing 10 Certified Mail Return Receipt re #5 Complaint and #6 Summons Issued as to Office of the Regional Chief Counsel. (JQC) Modified docket text on 1/23/2020 (MMM).
January 16, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Allison Jaime Cheung on behalf of Defendant Andrew Saul. (Cheung, Allison)
January 15, 2020 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed re #6 Summons Issued as to USA. AUSA served on 1/14/2020. (MR)
January 10, 2020 Filing 7 Certified Mail Receipts 7018 2290 0001 8797 0106 and 7018 2290 0001 8797 0090 for #6 Summons Issued as to USA re #5 Complaint. (MR)
January 10, 2020 Filing 6 SUMMONS Issued as to Andrew Saul, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General re #5 Complaint. (cc: AUSA summons, #5 Complaint, & #4 Order to USM - MR)
January 10, 2020 Filing 5 COMPLAINT against Andrew Saul by Jesus E. Rodriguez Sandoval. Proof of service due by 4/9/2020. (MR)
January 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER Granting #1 Application for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. The Clerk of Court shall file #1 -1 the Complaint. The Clerk of Court shall serve the Commissioner of the Social Security Administration by sending a copy of the summons and Complaint by certified mail. The Clerk of Court shall issue summons to the United States Attorney for the District of Nevada and deliver the summons and Complaint to the U.S. Marshal for service. Signed by Magistrate Judge Daniel J. Albregts on 1/10/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
January 10, 2020 Case randomly assigned to Magistrate Judge Daniel J. Albregts. (MMM)
January 10, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE to Clerk of Court Regarding Assignment of Social Security Cases. (Document restricted under General Order 2019-08.) (MMM)
January 9, 2020 Filing 2 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Jesus E. Rodriguez Sandoval. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Safa, Cyrus)
January 9, 2020 Filing 1 MOTION/APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Jesus E. Rodriguez Sandoval. (Attachments: #1 Complaint, #2 Summons, #3 Civil Cover Sheet) (Safa, Cyrus) Modified on 1/10/2020 (MMM).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rodriguez Sandoval v. Saul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew Saul
Represented By: Allison Jaime Cheung
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jesus E. Rodriguez Sandoval
Represented By: Cyrus Safa
Represented By: Leonard Stone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?