Padilla v. State of Nevada et al
Plaintiff: Raymond Padilla
Defendant: State of Nevada, Robert Knickerbocker, Genevieve Craggs, Alex Ochoa, Clark County District Attorneys Office, Daryl Reitz and Elizabeth A Mercer
Case Number: 2:2020cv00066
Filed: January 9, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Presiding Judge: Kent J Dawson
Referring Judge: Cam Ferenbach
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 18, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 2, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of Change of Address by Plaintiff Raymond Padilla. Address updated to Clark County Detention Center, 330 South Casino Center, Las Vegas, Nevada 89101. (JQC)
February 19, 2020 Filing 4 Notice of Objections to #3 Order, filed by Plaintiff Raymond Padilla. (JQC) Modified text on 2/20/2020 (MMM).
February 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER. IT IS ORDERED that #1 plaintiff Padilla's application to proceed in forma pauperis is DENIED without prejudice. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that by Friday, 3/6/2020, plaintiff must either (1) file an application to proceed in forma pauperis that includes his trust account statement or (2) plaintiff must pay the full fee for filing a civil action. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that failure to timely comply with this Order will result in a recommendation that this case be dismissed with prejudice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 2/6/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JQC)
January 10, 2020 Filing 2 ADVISORY LETTER to litigant. (JQC)
January 9, 2020 Filing 1 APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, filed by Plaintiff Raymond Padilla. (Attachments: #1 Complaint, #2 Motion to Extend Prison Copywork Limit) (JQC)
January 9, 2020 Case randomly assigned to Judge Kent J. Dawson and Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach. (RT)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Padilla v. State of Nevada et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State of Nevada
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Knickerbocker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Genevieve Craggs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alex Ochoa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Clark County District Attorneys Office
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Daryl Reitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Elizabeth A Mercer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Raymond Padilla
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?