Cervoni v. Chipman Moving & Storage (Spokane), Inc.
Plaintiff: Lee Cervoni
Defendant: Chipman Moving & Storage (Spokane), Inc.
Case Number: 2:2020cv00164
Filed: January 23, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Presiding Judge: Daniel J Albregts
Referring Judge: Gloria M Navarro
Nature of Suit: Labor: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 19, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #5 Motion to Compel Arbitration. Case is stayed until further order of this court. Signed by Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 2/18/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRS)
February 14, 2020 Filing 7 NON-OPPOSITION to #5 Motion to Compel by Plaintiff Lee Cervoni. (Wiley, Jason)
February 7, 2020 Filing 6 STATEMENT REGARDING REMOVAL by Defendant Chipman Moving & Storage (Spokane), Inc.. (Cwik, Marc)
January 30, 2020 Filing 5 MOTION to Compel Arbitration re #1 Petition for Removal, by Defendant Chipman Moving & Storage (Spokane), Inc.. Responses due by 2/13/2020. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (Cwik, Marc) Modified event on 1/31/2020 (MMM).
January 23, 2020 Filing 4 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 1/23/2020. Statement regarding removed action is due by 2/7/2020. Joint Status Report regarding removed action is due by 2/22/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
January 23, 2020 Filing 3 STANDING ORDER. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Judge Gloria M. Navarro. Judge Navarro's Chambers Practices, which are posted on the U.S. District Court, District of Nevada public website, may also be accessed directly via this hyperlink #www.nvd.uscourts.gov. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
January 23, 2020 Case randomly assigned to Judge Gloria M. Navarro and Magistrate Judge Daniel J. Albregts. (SLD)
January 23, 2020 Filing 2 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Chipman Moving & Storage (Spokane), Inc.. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Cwik, Marc)
January 23, 2020 Filing 1 PETITION FOR REMOVAL from Eighth Judicial District Court of Nevada, Clark County, Case Number A-19-803293-C, (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0978-5858478) by Chipman Moving & Storage (Spokane), Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Civil Cover Sheet) (Cwik, Marc) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cervoni v. Chipman Moving & Storage (Spokane), Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chipman Moving & Storage (Spokane), Inc.
Represented By: Adam J Pernsteiner
Represented By: Marc S. Cwik
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lee Cervoni
Represented By: Ryan Scott Petersen
Represented By: Jason M. Wiley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?