Cochrane v. Nevada Department et al
Plaintiff: Terry R. Cochrane
Defendant: Dwayne Wilson, Warden Brian Williams, M Miweu, Charles Daniels, Nevada Department, Monique Pickett and Senior Clayton
Case Number: 2:2020cv00208
Filed: January 30, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Presiding Judge: Kent J Dawson
Referring Judge: Brenda Weksler
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 20, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 23, 2020 Filing 9 APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Terry R. Cochrane. (MR)
March 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER Granting #6 Motion to Extend Time. File a fully complete application to proceed in forma pauperis for non-prisoners or Payment of filing fees due within 60 days. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brenda Weksler on 3/17/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - Encl.: in forma pauperis by a non-prisoner w/ instructions - ADR)
March 11, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE of Change of Address, filed by Plaintiff Terry R. Cochrane. Address updated to: c/o Samaritan House, 1001 North 4th St Las Vegas, NV 89101. (ADR)
March 11, 2020 Filing 6 MOTION to Extend Time (First Request) re #3 Order on Application to Proceed in forma pauperis, filed by Plaintiff Terry R. Cochrane. (ADR)
February 10, 2020 Filing 5 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Magistrate Judge Brenda Weksler on 2/10/2020. Attached are file stamped courtesy copies of ECF nos. 1 and 4 as requested. (Attachments: #1 Letter to Clerk)(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
February 10, 2020 Filing 4 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order, filed by Plaintiff Terry R. Cochrane. (ADR)
February 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER Denying #1 Application for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. File a fully complete application to proceed in forma pauperis or Payment of filing fees due within 45 days. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brenda Weksler on 2/5/2020.(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - Encl.: application to proceed in forma pauperis by a prisoner - ADR)
January 30, 2020 Filing 2 ADVISORY LETTER to litigant. (ADR)
January 30, 2020 Filing 1 APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, filed by Plaintiff Terry R. Cochrane. (Attachments: #1 Complaint) (ADR)
January 30, 2020 Case randomly assigned to Judge Kent J. Dawson and Magistrate Judge Brenda Weksler. (RT)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cochrane v. Nevada Department et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dwayne Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Warden Brian Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M Miweu
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Charles Daniels
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nevada Department
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Monique Pickett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Senior Clayton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Terry R. Cochrane
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?