Potter v. Crane Co. et al
Plaintiff: Jordan J Potter
Defendant: Goodrich Corporation, Pneumo Abex, LLC, General Electric Company, United Technologies Corporation, IMO Industries, Inc., individually and as successor in interest to Adel Fasteners, Honeywell International Inc., Crane Co., northrop Grumman Corporation, EATON AEROQUIP, Old Orchard Industrial Corp, DCO, LLC, General Dynamics Corporation, IMO Industries, Inc. and Eaton Aeorquip, LLC
Case Number: 2:2020cv00276
Filed: February 7, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Presiding Judge: Richard F Boulware
Referring Judge: Cam Ferenbach
Nature of Suit: P.I. : Asbestos
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 24, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 6, 2020 Filing 46 MOTION/VERIFIED PETITION for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice by Daniel J. Kelly and DESIGNATION of Local Counsel Jay J. Schuttert (Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 0978-5954610) by Defendant Northrop Grumman Corporation. (Schuttert, Jay)
April 3, 2020 Filing 45 RESPONSE to #24 Motion to Dismiss, by Plaintiff Jordan J Potter. Replies due by 4/10/2020. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit United Technologies Overview, #3 Exhibit Pratt & Whitney - Military Engines, #4 Exhibit Affidavit of James Potter, #5 Exhibit National Museums of US Air Force - F-111f Aardvark, #6 Exhibit National Museums of US Air Force EF-111A Raven, #7 Exhibit Pratt & Whitney - Military Engines, #8 Exhibit Air Force Historical Research, #9 Exhibit Boeing Website - F-15) (Mittin, Lawrence)
April 3, 2020 Filing 44 RESPONSE to #23 Motion to Dismiss, by Plaintiff Jordan J Potter. Replies due by 4/10/2020. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Index of Exhibits, #2 Exhibit NGSC Who We Are, #3 Exhibit NGSC Jobs in Nevada, #4 Exhibit Affidavit of James Potter, #5 Exhibit NGSC A-10 Thunderbolt2, #6 Exhibit Air Force Historical Research, #7 Exhibit Nellis AFB A-10 Demonstration Team, #8 Exhibit NGSC SCA Aircraft Mechanic 2) (Mittin, Lawrence)
April 1, 2020 Filing 43 CLERK'S NOTICE of violation of Local Rules. Attorney Action Required to ECF Nos. #41 and #42 . Documents were not filed pursuant to LR IC 2-2(c). The wrong event was selected. The title of the docket entry does not match the title of the document. Also, an index of exhibits was not provided, as required by LR IA 10-3(d).Attorney Lawrence Mittin is advised to refile ECF Nos. #41 and #42 using the appropriate "Response to Motion" event, linking each to the appropriate Motion, respectively. (no image attached) (MMM)
March 31, 2020 Filing 42 ERROR: Wrong event selected. Index of exhibits not provided. Attorney advised to refile pursuant to the Local Rules. MEMORANDUM to #24 Motion to Dismiss, by Plaintiff Jordan J Potter. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit, #8 Exhibit, #9 Exhibit) (Mittin, Lawrence) Document #42 terminated as filed in error. Modified on 4/1/2020 (MMM).
March 31, 2020 Filing 41 ERROR: Wrong event selected. Index of exhibits not provided. Attorney advised to refile pursuant to the Local Rules. MEMORANDUM to #23 Motion to Dismiss, by Plaintiff Jordan J Potter. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit, #8 Exhibit) (Mittin, Lawrence) Document #41 terminated as filed in error. Modified on 4/1/2020 (MMM).
March 31, 2020 Filing 40 ERROR NOTICE to counsel re filing of #39 Certificate of Interested Parties. All interested parties were not properly entered on the docket. Attorney Michael Edwards advised that in the future, Certificates of Interested Parties filed with the District of Nevada shall be filed in accordance with FRCP 7.1 and LR 7.1-1, and shall enter on the docket all persons, associations of person, firms, partnerships or corporations (including parent corporations) which have a direct pecuniary interest in the outcome of the case. (no image attached) (MMM)
March 30, 2020 Filing 39 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Eaton Aeorquip, LLC. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Edwards, Michael) Other affiliate Eaton Corporation added Modified on 3/31/2020 (MMM).
March 30, 2020 Filing 38 ERROR NOTICE to counsel re filing of #37 Certificate of Interested Parties. All interested parties were not properly entered on the docket. Attorney James Cavanaugh advised that in the future, Certificates of Interested Parties filed with the District of Nevada shall be filed in accordance with FRCP 7.1 and LR 7.1-1, and shall enter on the docket all persons, associations of person, firms, partnerships or corporations (including parent corporations) which have a direct pecuniary interest in the outcome of the case. (no image attached) (MMM)
March 27, 2020 Filing 37 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Old Orchard Industrial Corp. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Cavanaugh, James) Corporate Parent Brunswick Corporation added Modified on 3/30/2020 (MMM).
March 27, 2020 Filing 36 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, with Jury Demand, CROSSCLAIM against Crane Co., DCO, LLC, Eaton Aeorquip, LLC, General Dynamics Corporation, General Electric Company, Goodrich Corporation, Honeywell International Inc., IMO Industries, Inc., IMO Industries, Inc.(Individually and as successor in interest to Adel Fasteners), Northrop Grumman Corporation, Pneumo Abex, LLC, United Technologies Corporation by Old Orchard Industrial Corp. filed by Old Orchard Industrial Corp.(Cavanaugh, James)
March 27, 2020 Filing 35 ERROR NOTICE to counsel re filing of #33 Certificate of Interested Parties. All interested parties were not properly entered on the docket. Attorney Jay Schuttert advised that in the future, Certificates of Interested Parties filed with the District of Nevada shall be filed in accordance with FRCP 7.1 and LR 7.1-1, and shall enter on the docket all persons, associations of person, firms, partnerships or corporations (including parent corporations) which have a direct pecuniary interest in the outcome of the case. (no image attached) (MMM)
March 27, 2020 Filing 34 MOTION to Dismiss by Defendant Goodrich Corporation. Responses due by 4/10/2020. (Schuttert, Jay)
March 27, 2020 Filing 33 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Goodrich Corporation. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Schuttert, Jay) Corporate Parent United Technologies Corporation added. Modified on 3/27/2020 (MMM).
March 27, 2020 Filing 32 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by General Electric Company. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Jorgensen, J)
March 27, 2020 Filing 31 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, filed by General Electric Company.(Jorgensen, J)
March 24, 2020 Filing 30 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by General Dynamics Corporation. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Cavanaugh, James)
March 24, 2020 Filing 29 ANSWER to #1 Complaint,with Jury Demand, CROSSCLAIM against Crane Co., DCO, LLC, Eaton Aeorquip, LLC, General Electric Company, Goodrich Corporation, Honeywell International Inc., IMO Industries, Inc., IMO Industries, Inc.(Individually and as successor in interest to Adel Fasteners), Northrop Grumman Corporation, Old Orchard Industrial Corp, Pneumo Abex, LLC, United Technologies Corporation by General Dynamics Corporation. filed by General Dynamics Corporation.(Cavanaugh, James) Modified text on 3/24/2020 (MMM).
March 20, 2020 Filing 28 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Jordan J Potter. General Electric Company served on 3/6/2020. (Mittin, Lawrence)
March 20, 2020 Filing 27 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Jordan J Potter. Goodrich Corporation served on 3/6/2020. (Mittin, Lawrence)
March 20, 2020 Filing 26 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Jordan J Potter. Honeywell International Inc. served on 3/6/2020. (Mittin, Lawrence)
March 18, 2020 Filing 25 Issued in error by Clerk's Office ERROR NOTICE to counsel re filing of #22 Certificate of Interested Parties. All interested parties were not properly entered on the docket. Attorney Jay Schuttert advised that in the future, Certificates of Interested Parties filed with the District of Nevada shall be filed in accordance with FRCP 7.1 and LR 7.1-1, and shall enter on the docket all persons, associations of person, firms, partnerships or corporations (including parent corporations) which have a direct pecuniary interest in the outcome of the case. (no image attached) (MMM) Modified on 3/18/2020 (MMM).
March 17, 2020 Filing 24 MOTION to Dismiss by Defendant United Technologies Corporation. Responses due by 3/31/2020. Discovery Plan/Scheduling Order due by 5/1/2020. (Schuttert, Jay) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court.
March 17, 2020 Filing 23 MOTION to Dismiss by Defendant Northrop Grumman Corporation. Responses due by 3/31/2020. Discovery Plan/Scheduling Order due by 5/1/2020. (Schuttert, Jay) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court.
March 17, 2020 Filing 22 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by United Technologies Corporation. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Schuttert, Jay)
March 17, 2020 Filing 21 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Northrop Grumman Corporation that identifies all parties that have an interest in the outcome of this case. Corporate Parent Northrop Grumman Corporation, Other Affiliate State Street Bank & Trust Company for Northrop Grumman Corporation added. (Schuttert, Jay)
March 16, 2020 Filing 20 ANSWER to Complaint filed by Eaton Aeorquip, LLC. Discovery Plan/Scheduling Order due by 4/30/2020.(Edwards, Michael) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court.
March 10, 2020 Filing 19 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Jordan J Potter. Pneumo Abex, LLC served on 2/25/2020. (Mittin, Lawrence)
March 10, 2020 Filing 18 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Jordan J Potter. General Dynamics Corporation served on 3/3/2020. (Mittin, Lawrence)
March 10, 2020 Filing 17 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Jordan J Potter. United Technologies Corporation served on 2/25/2020. (Mittin, Lawrence)
March 10, 2020 Filing 16 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Jordan J Potter. Old Orchard Industrial Corp served on 2/25/2020. (Mittin, Lawrence)
March 10, 2020 Filing 15 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Jordan J Potter. (Mittin, Lawrence)
March 10, 2020 Filing 14 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Jordan J Potter. IMO Industries, Inc. served on 2/25/2020. (Mittin, Lawrence)
March 10, 2020 Filing 13 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Jordan J Potter. Crane Co. served on 2/25/2020. (Mittin, Lawrence)
March 10, 2020 Filing 12 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Jordan J Potter. DCO, LLC served on 2/26/2020. (Mittin, Lawrence)
March 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER Granting #10 Verified Petition for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice Robyn R. Lundt and approving Designation of Local Counsel Lawrence E. Mittin. Signed by Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 3/5/2020. Any Attorney not yet registered with the Court's CM/ECF System shall submit a Registration Form on the Court's website #www.nvd.uscourts.gov(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JQC)
March 4, 2020 Filing 10 MOTION/VERIFIED PETITION for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice by Robyn R. Lundt and DESIGNATION of Local Counsel Lawrence E. Mittin (Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 0978-5914704) by Plaintiff Jordan J Potter. (Mittin, Lawrence)
March 2, 2020 Filing 9 Summons Issued as to General Dynamics Corporation. (JQC)
March 2, 2020 Filing 8 PROPOSED SUMMONS to be issued by Plaintiff Jordan J Potter. (Mittin, Lawrence)
February 11, 2020 Filing 7 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Plaintiff Jordan J Potter. (Mittin, Lawrence)
February 11, 2020 Filing 6 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Jordan J Potter. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Mittin, Lawrence)
February 10, 2020 Filing 5 STANDING ORDER. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Judge Richard F. Boulware, II. Judge Boulware's Chambers Practices, which are posted on the U.S. District Court, District of Nevada public website, may also be accessed directly via this hyperlink: #www.nvd.uscourts.gov. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JQC)
February 10, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE TO COUNSEL PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE IA 11-2. Counsel Robyn Lundt to comply with completion and filing of the Verified Petition and Designation of Local Counsel. For your convenience, click on the following link to obtain the form from the Court's website - #www.nvd.uscourts.gov. Upon approval of the Verified Petition, counsel is required to register for the Court's Case Management and Electronic Case Filing (CM/ECF) system and the electronic service of documents. Please visit the Court's website www.nvd.uscourts.gov to register Attorney. Verified Petition due by 3/26/2020. (no image attached) (JQC)
February 10, 2020 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to All Defendants re #1 Complaint. (JQC)
February 10, 2020 Case randomly assigned to Judge Richard F. Boulware, II and Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach. (JQC)
February 10, 2020 Filing 2 ERRATA to #1 Complaint,, by Plaintiff Jordan J Potter. (Mittin, Lawrence)
February 7, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0978-5880472) by Jordan J Potter. Proof of service due by 5/7/2020. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Summons, #6 Summons, #7 Summons, #8 Summons, #9 Summons, #10 Summons, #11 Summons, #12 Summons, #13 Summons) (Mittin, Lawrence) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Potter v. Crane Co. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Goodrich Corporation
Represented By: Jay Joseph Schuttert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pneumo Abex, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: General Electric Company
Represented By: J Christopher Jorgensen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United Technologies Corporation
Represented By: Jay Joseph Schuttert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: IMO Industries, Inc., individually and as successor in interest to Adel Fasteners
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Honeywell International Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Crane Co.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: northrop Grumman Corporation
Represented By: Jay Joseph Schuttert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: EATON AEROQUIP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Old Orchard Industrial Corp
Represented By: Robert E Schumacher
Represented By: James E Cavanaugh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DCO, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: General Dynamics Corporation
Represented By: James E Cavanaugh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: IMO Industries, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eaton Aeorquip, LLC
Represented By: Michael Edwards
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jordan J Potter
Represented By: Lawrence E. Mittin
Represented By: T. Barton French, Jr.
Represented By: Robyn R. Lundt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?