Gould v. Lombardo
Petitioner: Steven Eric Gould
Respondent: Joseph Lombardo
Case Number: 2:2020cv00364
Filed: February 20, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Presiding Judge: Jennifer A Dorsey
Referring Judge: Brenda Weksler
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2241
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 28, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 13, 2020 Filing 6 RESPONSE to #4 Order on Motion/Application to Proceed in forma pauperis, by Petitioner Steven Eric Gould. (DRS)
April 7, 2020 Filing 5 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus pursuant to 28 USC 2241 by Steven Eric Gould. (DRS)
April 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER granting #1 Motion/Application for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. The Clerk is directed to file the Petition. Petitioner must Show Cause by 5/7/2020 why the petition should not be dismissed for reasons stated in the Order. Signed by Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 4/7/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRS)
March 25, 2020 Filing 3 SUPPLEMENT to #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus by Petitioner Steven Eric Gould. (Note: Clerk's office forwarded first page of file stamped documents to P as requested.) (DRS)
February 21, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE from USDC advising case against Steven Eric Gould, et al., has been received and assigned case number 2:20-cv-00364-JAD-BNW. (DRS)
February 21, 2020 Filing 1 APPLICATION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Petitioner Steven Eric Gould. (Attachments: #1 Petition for Writ Habeas Corpus 28 USC 2241) (DRS)
February 20, 2020 Case randomly assigned to Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey and Magistrate Judge Brenda Weksler. (RT)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gould v. Lombardo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Steven Eric Gould
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Joseph Lombardo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?