Wall v. NSB East Bonanza
Plaintiff: Esler Wall
Defendant: NSB EAST BONANZA LLC d/b/a TACO BELL 31880 and NSB East Bonanza LLC
Case Number: 2:2020cv00391
Filed: February 25, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Presiding Judge: Daniel J Albregts
Referring Judge: Richard F Boulware
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1442
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 17, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER. IT IS ORDERED that the Early Neutral Evaluation scheduled for 4/8/2020, is VACATED and will be RESCHEDULED at a later date. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 3/20/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JQC)
March 12, 2020 Filing 11 STATEMENT REGARDING REMOVAL by Defendant NSB East Bonanza LLC. (Guelker, Gary)
March 10, 2020 Filing 10 LETTER from Plaintiff Esler Wall. (JQC)
March 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER setting Early Neutral Evaluation session. Early Neutral Evaluation at 10:00 a.m., 4/8/2020, in the chambers of the undersigned U.S. Magistrate Judge, Cam Ferenbach, located on the third floor of the Lloyd D. George U.S. Courthouse, 333 Las Vegas Boulevard South, Suite 3005, Las Vegas, Nevada 89101. The written evaluation statements must be delivered directly to my chambers, U.S. Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach, in a sealed envelope-MARKED CONFIDENTIAL AND DO NOT FILE, not later than 4:00 p.m., 4/1/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 3/4/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JQC)
March 4, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE: Pursuant to Local Rule 16-6 this case has been assigned to the Early Neutral Evaluation Program. Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach will be the evaluating judge in this case. (no image attached) (JQC)
March 4, 2020 Filing 7 ERROR NOTICE to counsel re filing of #6 Certificate of Interested Parties,. All interested parties were not properly entered on the docket. Attorney Gary Guelker advised that in the future, Certificates of Interested Parties filed with the District of Nevada shall be filed in accordance with FRCP 7.1 and LR 7.1-1, and shall enter on the docket all persons, associations of person, firms, partnerships or corporations (including parent corporations) which have a direct pecuniary interest in the outcome of the case. (no image attached) (DKJ)
March 4, 2020 Filing 6 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by NSB East Bonanza LLC. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case Corporate Parent and other affiliates, Diversified Restaurant Group, LLC, Silver State Bell, LLC and Nickle State Bell, LLC added (Guelker, Gary) Modified on 3/4/2020 to add corporate parents and other affiliates (DKJ).
March 3, 2020 Filing 5 ANSWER with Jury Demand re #1 Petition for Removal, filed by NSB East Bonanza LLC. Discovery Plan/Scheduling Order due by 4/17/2020.(Guelker, Gary) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court.
February 26, 2020 Filing 4 STANDING ORDER. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Judge Richard F. Boulware, II. Judge Boulware's Chambers Practices, which are posted on the U.S. District Court, District of Nevada public website, may also be accessed directly via this hyperlink: #www.nvd.uscourts.gov. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JQC)
February 26, 2020 Filing 3 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 2/26/2020. Statement regarding removed action is due by 3/12/2020. Joint Status Report regarding removed action is due by 3/27/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JQC)
February 26, 2020 Case randomly assigned to Judge Richard F. Boulware, II and Magistrate Judge Daniel J. Albregts. (JQC)
February 25, 2020 Filing 2 EXHIBIT to #1 Petition for Removal, by Defendant NSB EAST BONANZA LLC d/b/a TACO BELL 31880. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-Complaint, #2 Exhibit B-Summons) (Ang, Joshua)
February 25, 2020 Filing 1 PETITION FOR REMOVAL from Eighth District Court, County of Clark, NV, Case Number A-19-806110-C, (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0978-5903261) by NSB EAST BONANZA LLC d/b/a TACO BELL 31880. (Ang, Joshua) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wall v. NSB East Bonanza
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NSB EAST BONANZA LLC d/b/a TACO BELL 31880
Represented By: Gary R Guelker
Represented By: Joshua Y. Ang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NSB East Bonanza LLC
Represented By: Gary R Guelker
Represented By: Joshua Y. Ang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Esler Wall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?