JoshCo Tech, LLC v. MJJ&L Holdings, LLC et al
Plaintiff: JoshCo Tech, LLC
Defendant: Javier Lujan, MJJ&L Holdings, LLC, Zeplin Global Group, LLC and Michael Zuccarello
Case Number: 2:2020cv00428
Filed: February 28, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Presiding Judge: Andrew P Gordon
Referring Judge: Nancy J Koppe
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17 U.S.C. ยง 101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 3, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 28, 2020 Filing 19 RESPONSE to #16 Motion to Dismiss,, by Plaintiff JoshCo Tech, LLC. Replies due by 5/5/2020. (Zhong, Meng)
April 14, 2020 Filing 18 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by MJJ&L Holdings, LLC. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Gile, Ryan)
April 14, 2020 Filing 17 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Javier Lujan, Zeplin Global Group, LLC, Michael Zuccarello. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Borghese, Mark)
April 14, 2020 Filing 16 Joint MOTION to Dismiss by Defendants Javier Lujan, MJJ&L Holdings, LLC, Zeplin Global Group, LLC, Michael Zuccarello. Responses due by 4/28/2020. Discovery Plan/Scheduling Order due by 5/29/2020. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Zuccarello Declaration, #2 Exhibit 2 - Lujan Declaration, #3 Exhibit 3 - NVSOS printout) (Borghese, Mark) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court.
April 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER Granting #14 Verified Petition for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Jeffrey A. Feasby and approving Designation of Local Counsel Meng Zhong. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 4/13/2020. Any Attorney not yet registered with the Court's CM/ECF System shall submit a Registration Form on the Court's website #www.nvd.uscourts.gov(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
April 10, 2020 Filing 14 MOTION/VERIFIED PETITION for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice by Jeffrey Alan Feasby and DESIGNATION of Local Counsel Meng Zhong (Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 0978-5962730) by Plaintiff JoshCo Tech, LLC. (Zhong, Meng)
March 26, 2020 Filing 13 SUMMONS Returned Executed by JoshCo Tech, LLC re #2 Certificate of Interested Parties, #1 Complaint,, #7 Summons Issued, 3 Standing Order, #4 AO 121 Copyright Report. Zeplin Global Group, LLC served on 3/12/2020. (Zhong, Meng)
March 25, 2020 Filing 12 SUMMONS Returned Executed by JoshCo Tech, LLC re #2 Certificate of Interested Parties, #1 Complaint,, #7 Summons Issued, 3 Standing Order, #4 AO 121 Copyright Report. Javier Lujan served on 3/7/2020. (Zhong, Meng)
March 25, 2020 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed by JoshCo Tech, LLC re #2 Certificate of Interested Parties, #1 Complaint,, #7 Summons Issued, 3 Standing Order, #4 AO 121 Copyright Report. MJJ&L Holdings, LLC served on 3/7/2020. (Zhong, Meng)
March 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER Granting #8 Stipulation to Extend Time Re: #1 Complaint. Javier Lujan, MJJ&L Holdings, LLC, Zeplin Global Group, LLC and Michael Zuccarello answer due 4/17/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 3/19/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
March 18, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Ryan Gile on behalf of Defendant MJJ&L Holdings, LLC. (Gile, Ryan)
March 18, 2020 Filing 8 STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME (First Request) re #1 Complaint,, by Defendants Javier Lujan, Zeplin Global Group, LLC, Michael Zuccarello. (Borghese, Mark)
March 5, 2020 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to All Defendants re #1 Complaint. (ADR)
March 5, 2020 Filing 6 PROPOSED SUMMONS to be issued by Plaintiff JoshCo Tech, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons) (Zhong, Meng)
March 2, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE TO COUNSEL PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE IA 11-2. Counsel Jeffrey A. Feasby to comply with completion and filing of the Verified Petition and Designation of Local Counsel. For your convenience, click on the following link to obtain the form from the Court's website - #www.nvd.uscourts.gov. Upon approval of the Verified Petition, counsel is required to register for the Court's Case Management and Electronic Case Filing (CM/ECF) system and the electronic service of documents. Please visit the Court's website www.nvd.uscourts.gov to register Attorney. Verified Petition due by 4/16/2020. (no image attached) (ADR)
March 2, 2020 Filing 4 AO 121 - REPORT on the filing or determination of an action or appeal regarding a copyright. Mailed to the Register of Copyrights, Copyright Office. (Attachments: #1 Complaint) (ADR)
March 2, 2020 Filing 3 STANDING ORDER. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Andrew P. Gordon. Judge Gordon's Chambers Practices, which are posted on the U.S. District Court, District of Nevada public website, may also be accessed directly via this hyperlink: #www.nvd.uscourts.gov. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
February 28, 2020 Case randomly assigned to Judge Andrew P. Gordon and Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe. (ADR)
February 28, 2020 Filing 2 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by JoshCo Tech, LLC that identifies all parties that have an interest in the outcome of this case. Corporate Parent JoshCo Group, LLC for JoshCo Tech, LLC added. (Zhong, Meng)
February 28, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0978-5908937) by JoshCo Tech, LLC. Proof of service due by 5/28/2020. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - US Copyright Certificate of Registration, #2 Civil Cover Sheet) (Zhong, Meng) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: JoshCo Tech, LLC v. MJJ&L Holdings, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Javier Lujan
Represented By: Mark R. Borghese
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MJJ&L Holdings, LLC
Represented By: Ryan Gile
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Zeplin Global Group, LLC
Represented By: Mark R. Borghese
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Zuccarello
Represented By: Mark R. Borghese
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JoshCo Tech, LLC
Represented By: Brian Douglas Blakley
Represented By: Meng Zhong
Represented By: Jeffrey A. Feasby
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?