EB Holdings II, Inc. et al v. Illinois National Insurance Company et al
Plaintiff: EB Holdings II, Inc. and QXH II, Inc.
Defendant: Ace American Insurance Company, Freedom Specialty Insurance Company, Arch Insurance Company, Continental Casualty Company, Aspen Specialty Insurance Company, Federal Insurance Company, Axis Insurance Company, Illinois National Insurance Company, Beazley Insurance Company, Inc. and Ironshore Indemnity Inc.
Trustee: US Trustee
Case Number: 2:2020cv00491
Filed: March 4, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Presiding Judge: Kent J Dawson
Referring Judge: Brenda Weksler
Nature of Suit: Bankruptcy Withdrawl
Cause of Action: 28:0157
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 20, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER. IT IS ORDERED that #6 the parties' Stipulation to Consolidate Cases is GRANTED. Cases 2:20-cv-0461-KJD-BNW, 2:20-cv-0492-APG-NJK, and 2:20-cv-0491- KJD-BNW shall be CONSOLIDATED and reassigned to Judge Kent J. Dawson for all further proceedings. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the parties' stipulated briefing schedule is GRANTED. Signed by Judge Kent J. Dawson on 3/20/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JQC)
March 18, 2020 Filing 5 STIPULATION to Consolidate Cases re #1 Motion to Withdraw Reference by Plaintiff EB Holdings II, Inc. (Kozlowski, Talitha)
March 18, 2020 Filing 4 CLERK'S NOTICE. Attorney Action Required to ECF No. 3. Document was not filed pursuant to LR IC 2-2(b). For each type of relief requested or purpose, a separate document must be filed. Attorney needs to be in compliance with LR IC 2-2(b) and LR IC 2-2(c) by filing two separate documents for each request or purpose. Attorney Talitha Gray Kozlowski is advised to refile ECF No. 3 using the event Stipulation to Consolidate Cases using the appropriate docket entry title and link to document 1. (no image attached) (SLD)
March 17, 2020 Filing 3 STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME (First Request) to Consolidate Cases re #1 Motion to Withdraw Reference by Plaintiff EB Holdings II, Inc. (Kozlowski, Talitha) Modified on 3/18/2020 pursuant to LR IC 2-2(b) - attorney advised to refile document re: separate request for Consolidation (SLD).
March 10, 2020 Filing 2 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Judge Kent J. Dawson on 3/10/2020. This action has been received from the U.S. Bankruptcy Court for consideration of the Motion for Withdrawal of Reference. This matter has been assigned civil case number 2:20-cv-00491-KJD-BNW. All future pleadings related to the Motion to Withdraw the Reference must be filed in the U.S. District Court civil action and must bear said civil case number, the Bankruptcy case number, and the adversary case number. (BK-S-19-16364-mkn, 20-01010-mkn) (no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
March 10, 2020 Filing 1 MOTION to Withdraw Reference by Movant Illinois National Insurance Company. Responses due by 3/24/2020. (Attachments: #1 Transmittal) (MR)
March 10, 2020 Case randomly assigned to Judge Kent J. Dawson and Magistrate Judge Brenda Weksler. (MR)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: EB Holdings II, Inc. et al v. Illinois National Insurance Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: EB Holdings II, Inc.
Represented By: Gregory E Garman
Represented By: Talitha Gray Kozlowski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: QXH II, Inc.
Represented By: Gregory E Garman
Represented By: Nedda Ghandi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ace American Insurance Company
Represented By: Jeffrey D. Olster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Freedom Specialty Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Arch Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Continental Casualty Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aspen Specialty Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Federal Insurance Company
Represented By: Jeffrey D. Olster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Axis Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Illinois National Insurance Company
Represented By: Carleton R. Burch
Represented By: Janiece S. Marshall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Beazley Insurance Company, Inc.
Represented By: Stephen M. Dichter
Represented By: Martin J. Kravitz
Represented By: Gena L. Sluga
Represented By: L. Renee Green
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ironshore Indemnity Inc.
Represented By: Andrew C Green
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Trustee: US Trustee
Represented By: U.S. Trustee, Las Vegas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?