Kiewit Infrastructure West Co. v. L.L.O. Inc. dba Acme Electric et al
Plaintiff: Kiewit Infrastructure West Co.
Defendant: Liberty Mutual Insurance Co. and L.L.O. Inc. dba Acme Electric
3Rd Party Plaintiff: Tab Contractors, Inc. and L.L.O. Inc.
3Rd Party Defendant: Travelers Casualty and Surety Company of America
Case Number: 2:2020cv00493
Filed: March 10, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Presiding Judge: Daniel J Albregts
Referring Judge: Richard F Boulware
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1330
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 29, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ERROR: Document entered in error, document terminated. Attorneys previously granted Pro Hac Vice status - see ECF #7 and #8 . NOTICE TO COUNSEL PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE IA 11-2. Counsel David F. McPherson and Rebecca S. Glos to comply with completion and filing of the Verified Petition and Designation of Local Counsel. For your convenience, click on the following link to obtain the form from the Court's website - #www.nvd.uscourts.gov. Upon approval of the Verified Petition, counsel is required to register for the Court's Case Management and Electronic Case Filing (CM/ECF) system and the electronic service of documents. Please visit the Court's website www.nvd.uscourts.gov to register Attorney. Verified Petition due by 5/14/2020. (no image attached) (SLD) Modified on 5/1/2020 (SLD).
April 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 21 CLERK'S NOTICE regarding ECF No. #20 . Document was not filed pursuant to LR IC 2-2(c) by attorney Nicole Lovelock. The wrong event was selected. The title of the docket entry does not match the title of the document. The Court has corrected and changed the event from Summons Returned Executed to Waiver of Service Executed. No further action is required at this time. (no image attached) (SLD)
April 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 20 WAIVER of Service Executed SUMMONS Returned Executed by L.L.O. Inc., Tab Contractors, Inc. re #19 Summons Issued. Travelers Casualty and Surety Company of America served on 4/30/2020. (Lovelock, Nicole) Modified on 4/30/2020 to change event (SLD).
April 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 19 Summons Issued as to Kiewit Infrastructure West Co. re #16 Third Party Complaint. (ADR)
April 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 18 CLERK'S NOTICE Regarding Local Rule IC 2-1(g). Filer's account information is different from the address information contained in the filed document, ECF No. #14 . Attorney Georlen K. Spangler is advised to review and update his/her user account information. (no image attached) (SLD)
April 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 17 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by L.L.O. Inc., Tab Contractors, Inc. that identifies all parties that have an interest in the outcome of this case. Corporate Parent New-Com, Inc. for L.L.O. Inc. and Tab Contractors, Inc. added. (Jones, Justin)
April 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand , THIRD PARTY COMPLAINT against Kiewit Infrastructure West Co., Travelers Casualty and Surety Company of America by Tab Contractors, Inc., L.L.O. Inc.., COUNTERCLAIM against Kiewit Infrastructure West Co. by Tab Contractors, Inc., L.L.O. Inc.. filed by Tab Contractors, Inc., L.L.O. Inc. (Attachments: #1 Summons Summons on a Third Party Complaint)(Jones, Justin)
April 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Liberty Mutual Insurance Co. that identifies all parties that have an interest in the outcome of this case. Corporate Parent Liberty Mutual Group, Inc., Corporate Parent Liberty Mutual Holding Company, Inc., Corporate Parent LMHC Massachusetts Holdings, Inc. for Liberty Mutual Insurance Co. added. (Jones, Justin)
April 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ANSWER to #1 Complaint filed by Liberty Mutual Insurance Co.. Discovery Plan/Scheduling Order due by 6/6/2020.(Jones, Justin) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court.
April 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 CLERK'S NOTICE regarding ECF No. #12 . Document was not filed pursuant to LR IC 2-2(c) by attorney David Johnson. The wrong event was selected. The title of the docket entry does not match the title of the document. The Court has corrected and changed the event to Acceptance of Service. No further action is required at this time. (no image attached) (SLD)
April 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ACCEPTANCE OF SERVICE by Liberty Mutual Insurance Co. on 3/24/2020 executed, SUMMONS Returned Executed filed by Kiewit Infrastructure West Co. re #1 Complaint and #11 Summons Issued. (Attachments: #1 Acceptance of Service) (Johnson, David) Modified on 4/8/2020 to change event (SLD).
March 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 Summons Issued as to All Defendants re #1 Complaint. (ADR)
March 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 PROPOSED SUMMONS to be issued by Plaintiff Kiewit Infrastructure West Co.. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons) (Johnson, David)
March 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #7 Verified Petition for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Rebecca S. Glos and approving Designation of Local Counsel David R. Johnson. Signed by Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 3/13/2020. Any Attorney not yet registered with the Court's CM/ECF System shall submit a Registration Form on the Court's website #www.nvd.uscourts.gov(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
March 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER Granting #6 Verified Petition for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice for Attorney David F McPherson and approving Designation of Local Counsel David R. Johnson. Signed by Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 3/13/2020. Any Attorney not yet registered with the Court's CM/ECF System shall submit a Registration Form on the Court's website #www.nvd.uscourts.gov(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
March 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 MOTION/VERIFIED PETITION for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice by Rebecca S. Glos and DESIGNATION of Local Counsel David R. Johnson (Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 0978-5925662) by Plaintiff Kiewit Infrastructure West Co. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Certificate of Good Standing-RSG) (Johnson, David)
March 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 MOTION/VERIFIED PETITION for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice by David F. McPherson and DESIGNATION of Local Counsel David R. Johnson (Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 0978-5925610) by Plaintiff Kiewit Infrastructure West Co. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Certificate of Good Standing-DFM) (Johnson, David)
March 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Kiewit Infrastructure West Co. that identifies all parties that have an interest in the outcome of this case. Corporate Parties Peter Kiewit & Sons, Kiewit Corporation, and Kiewit Infrastructure Group, Inc. added. (Johnson, David) Modified on 3/12/2020 to add interested parties. (SLD)
March 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 EXHIBITS A thru H to #1 Complaint by Plaintiff Kiewit Infrastructure West Co. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Index, #8 Civil Cover Sheet) (Johnson, David)
March 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 NOTICE TO COUNSEL PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE IA 11-2. Counsel David F McPherson and Rebecca S. Glos to comply with completion and filing of the Verified Petition and Designation of Local Counsel. For your convenience, click on the following link to obtain the form from the Court's website - #www.nvd.uscourts.gov. Upon approval of the Verified Petition, counsel is required to register for the Court's Case Management and Electronic Case Filing (CM/ECF) system and the electronic service of documents. Please visit the Court's website www.nvd.uscourts.gov to register Attorney. Verified Petition due by 4/25/2020. (no image attached) (ADR)
March 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 STANDING ORDER. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Judge Richard F. Boulware, II. Judge Boulware's Chambers Practices, which are posted on the U.S. District Court, District of Nevada public website, may also be accessed directly via this hyperlink: #www.nvd.uscourts.gov. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
March 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $400), filed by Kiewit Infrastructure West Co. Proof of service due by 6/8/2020. (ADR)
March 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Case randomly assigned to Judge Richard F. Boulware, II and Magistrate Judge Daniel J. Albregts. (ADR)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kiewit Infrastructure West Co. v. L.L.O. Inc. dba Acme Electric et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kiewit Infrastructure West Co.
Represented By: David F McPherson
Represented By: David R. Johnson
Represented By: Rebecca S. Glos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Liberty Mutual Insurance Co.
Represented By: Justin C. Jones
Represented By: Stephen Alex Davis
Represented By: Nicole E. Lovelock
Represented By: Georlen K Spangler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: L.L.O. Inc. dba Acme Electric
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party plaintiff: Tab Contractors, Inc.
Represented By: Justin C. Jones
Represented By: Stephen Alex Davis
Represented By: Nicole E. Lovelock
Represented By: Georlen K Spangler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party plaintiff: L.L.O. Inc.
Represented By: Justin C. Jones
Represented By: Stephen Alex Davis
Represented By: Nicole E. Lovelock
Represented By: Georlen K Spangler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: Travelers Casualty and Surety Company of America
Represented By: David R. Johnson
Represented By: Rebecca S. Glos
Represented By: David F McPherson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?