Colucchi-Coulthard Family Trust v. United States of America
Plaintiff: Colucchi-Coulthard Family Trust and Colucci-Coulthard Family Trust
Defendant: United States of America
Case Number: 2:2020cv00530
Filed: March 13, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Presiding Judge: Daniel J Albregts
Referring Judge: James C Mahan
Nature of Suit: Tax Suits: IRS-Third Party
Cause of Action: 26:7426
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 30, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 30, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE: Attorney Action Required to #5 Notice of Appearance. ERROR: Attorney Kaczmarek has named Attorney Var Lordahl as local counsel pursuant to LR 11-1(b)(1). However, Attorney Var Lorhahl is not a member of this court. Attorney Kaczmarek is advised to designate local counsel that is a member of this court and file an amended designation of attorney for local service. (no image attached) (DKJ)
April 30, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Derek W Kaczmarek on behalf of Plaintiff Colucchi-Coulthard Family Trust. Local Rule 11-1(b) Designation (Kaczmarek, Derek)
March 17, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE TO COUNSEL PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE IA 11-1(b). Counsel Derek W. Kaczmarek to comply with LR IA 11-1(b) regarding Association or Designation for Service. Upon filing any pleadings or other papers in this court, an attorney who is subject to this rule must either (i) associate a licensed Nevada attorney maintaining an office in Nevada or (ii) designate a licensed Nevada attorney maintaining an office in Nevada for service of papers, process, or pleadings required to be served on the attorney, including service by hand delivery or facsimile transmission. (no image attached) (MMM)
March 16, 2020 Filing 3 SUMMONS Issued as to United States of America, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General re #1 Complaint. (MR)
March 16, 2020 Case randomly assigned to Judge James C. Mahan and Magistrate Judge Daniel J. Albregts. (MR)
March 16, 2020 Filing 2 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Colucchi-Coulthard Family Trust that identifies all parties that have an interest in the outcome of this case. Other Affiliate Bank of Nevada, Other Affiliate James Coulthard, Other Affiliate Margaret Colucci-Coulthard for Colucchi-Coulthard Family Trust added. (Kaczmarek, Derek)
March 16, 2020 Filing 1 First COMPLAINT against All Plaintiffs (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0978-5928462) by Colucchi-Coulthard Family Trust. Proof of service due by 6/14/2020. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit Exhibit A IRS Transcripts, #3 Exhibit Exhibit B Notice of Levy, #4 Summons Summons to US Attorney, #5 Summons Summons to DOJ, #6 Index Index of Exhibits) (Kaczmarek, Derek) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Colucchi-Coulthard Family Trust v. United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Colucchi-Coulthard Family Trust
Represented By: Derek W Kaczmarek
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Colucci-Coulthard Family Trust
Represented By: Derek W Kaczmarek
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?