LV Restoration & Plumbing, Inc. v. Las Vegas Restoration LLC et al
Plaintiff: LV Restoration & Plumbing, Inc.
Defendant: Las Vegas Restoration LLC, Lilit Ter Barseghyan, Arpineh Ebrahimian, Armen Harutyunyan and Nubar Lusikyan
Case Number: 2:2020cv00531
Filed: March 13, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Presiding Judge: Gloria M Navarro
Referring Judge: Elayna J Youchah
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:1125
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 15, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 15, 2020 Filing 11 Joint STATUS REPORT by Defendants Lilit Ter Barseghyan, Arpineh Ebrahimian, Armen Harutyunyan, Las Vegas Restoration LLC, Nubar Lusikyan. (Lynch, Michael)
April 3, 2020 Filing 10 ANSWER re #1 Petition for Removal,, filed by Lilit Ter Barseghyan, Arpineh Ebrahimian, Armen Harutyunyan, Las Vegas Restoration LLC, Nubar Lusikyan. Discovery Plan/Scheduling Order due by 5/18/2020.(Lynch, Michael) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court.
March 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #6 Stipulation; Re: #1 Petition for Removal. Defendants answer due 4/3/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elayna J. Youchah on 3/19/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JQC)
March 19, 2020 Filing 8 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE for #7 Statement in Removal Case, #3 Minute Order Removal Case, by Defendants Lilit Ter Barseghyan, Arpineh Ebrahimian, Armen Harutyunyan, Las Vegas Restoration LLC, Nubar Lusikyan. (Lynch, Michael)
March 19, 2020 Filing 7 STATEMENT REGARDING REMOVAL by Defendants Lilit Ter Barseghyan, Arpineh Ebrahimian, Armen Harutyunyan, Las Vegas Restoration LLC, Nubar Lusikyan. (Lynch, Michael)
March 18, 2020 Filing 6 STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME (First Request) to Respond to the Complaint re #1 Petition for Removal, by Defendants Lilit Ter Barseghyan, Arpineh Ebrahimian, Armen Harutyunyan, Las Vegas Restoration LLC, Nubar Lusikyan. (Lynch, Michael)
March 17, 2020 Filing 5 STANDING ORDER. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Judge Gloria M. Navarro. Judge Navarro's Chambers Practices, which are posted on the U.S. District Court, District of Nevada public website, may also be accessed directly via this hyperlink #www.nvd.uscourts.gov. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
March 16, 2020 Filing 4 AO 120 - REPORT on the filing or determination of an action regarding a patent or trademark. E-mailed to the US Patent and Trademark Office. (Attachments: #1 Complaint) (JQC)
March 16, 2020 Filing 3 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 3/16/2020. Statement regarding removed action is due by 3/31/2020. Joint Status Report regarding removed action is due by 4/15/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JQC)
March 16, 2020 Case randomly assigned to Judge Gloria M. Navarro and Magistrate Judge Elayna J. Youchah. (JQC)
March 13, 2020 Filing 2 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Lilit Ter Barseghyan, Arpineh Ebrahimian, Armen Harutyunyan, Las Vegas Restoration LLC, Nubar Lusikyan. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Lynch, Michael)
March 13, 2020 Filing 1 PETITION FOR REMOVAL from Eighth Judicial District Court, in and for Clark County,, Case Number A-20-810480-C, (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0978-5927663) by Lilit Ter Barseghyan, Armen Harutyunyan, Arpineh Ebrahimian, Las Vegas Restoration LLC, Nubar Lusikyan. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Civil Cover Sheet) (Lynch, Michael) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: LV Restoration & Plumbing, Inc. v. Las Vegas Restoration LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Las Vegas Restoration LLC
Represented By: Michael F Lynch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lilit Ter Barseghyan
Represented By: Michael F Lynch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Arpineh Ebrahimian
Represented By: Michael F Lynch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Armen Harutyunyan
Represented By: Michael F Lynch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nubar Lusikyan
Represented By: Michael F Lynch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LV Restoration & Plumbing, Inc.
Represented By: Jakub P Medrala
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?