Kohli v. Dayal et al
Plaintiff: Eric Kohli
Defendant: Quantified Investment Group LLC, Quantified Capital Group, LLC, Ajay G Dayal, Miss Elegant Expo and Pacific Bay Lending Group
Case Number: 2:2020cv00538
Filed: March 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Presiding Judge: Cam Ferenbach
Referring Judge: Nancy J Koppe
2 Judge: Gloria M Navarro
3 Judge: Cristina D Silva
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2201 Constitutionality of State Statute(s)
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 14, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 14, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 121 First MOTION for Sanctions for noncompliance with discovery by Plaintiff Eric Kohli. (discovery) Responses due by 3/28/2023. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Plaintiff's Affidavit (Ex 1), #2 Exhibit Exh 2, #3 Exhibit Exh 3, #4 Exhibit Exh 4, #5 Exhibit Exh 5, #6 Exhibit Exh 6, #7 Exhibit Exh 7, #8 Exhibit Exh 8, #9 Exhibit Exh 9, #10 Exhibit Exh 10, #11 Exhibit Exh 11, #12 Exhibit Exh 12, #13 Exhibit Exh 13, #14 Exhibit Exh 14, #15 Certificate of Service Cert of Service)(Kohli, Eric)
March 7, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 120 ORDER Re: #118 Order to Show Cause. Show Cause Response due by 3/24/2023. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 3/7/2023. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - HAM)
March 6, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 119 LETTER from Jessica Parra to Judge Koppe. (HAM)
February 17, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 118 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. Show Cause Response due by 3/3/2023. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 2/17/2023. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - HAM)
February 17, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 117 ORDER. The Clerk's Office is INSTRUCTED to update the docket to reflect Defendant Dayal's address as stated at Docket No. #116 . Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 2/17/2023. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - address updated to 2300 W. Sahara Ave., Ste. 800 Las Vegas, NV 89102 - HAM) (Main Document 117 replaced on 2/17/2023) (LOE). Modified on 2/17/2023 (Updated Corrected Order - LOE).
February 16, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 116 LETTER from Ajay Dayal. (HAM)
January 27, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 115 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings, 73 Status Conference, held on 11/05/2021, before Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach. Court Reporter: Paige Christian, Paige_Christian@nvd.uscourts.gov. Any Redaction Request is due by 2/17/2023. Redacted Transcript Deadline is set for 2/27/2023. Release of the Transcript Restriction is set for 4/27/2023. Before release date, the transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the reporter. Transcript Order form is available on court website. After that date it may be obtained through the court reporter or PACER. (PMC)
January 26, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 114 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings, 59 Order on Motion to Compel, Motion Hearing, held on 07/01/2021, before Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach. Court Reporter: Paige Christian, Paige_Christian@nvd.uscourts.gov. Any Redaction Request is due by 2/16/2023. Redacted Transcript Deadline is set for 2/26/2023. Release of the Transcript Restriction is set for 4/26/2023. Before release date, the transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the reporter. Transcript Order form is available on court website. After that date it may be obtained through the court reporter or PACER. (PMC)
January 26, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 113 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings, 56 Order on Motion for Order to Show Cause, Order on Motion to Take Deposition, Motion Hearing, held on 04/19/2021, before Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach. Court Reporter: Paige Christian, Paige_Christian@nvd.uscourts.gov. Any Redaction Request is due by 2/16/2023. Redacted Transcript Deadline is set for 2/26/2023. Release of the Transcript Restriction is set for 4/26/2023. Before release date, the transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the reporter. Transcript Order form is available on court website. After that date it may be obtained through the court reporter or PACER. (PMC)
January 24, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 112 Mail Returned as Undeliverable re 107 Order addressed to Ajay Dayal. RTS, unable to forward. (HAM)
January 24, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 111 Mail Returned as Undeliverable re #108 Order addressed to Ajay Dayal. RTS, unable to forward. (HAM)
January 23, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 110 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings, 49 Order on Motion to Extend/Shorten Time, Motion Hearing, Show Cause Hearing, held on 03/04/2021, before Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach. Court Reporter: Paige Christian, Paige_Christian@nvd.uscourts.gov. Any Redaction Request is due by 2/13/2023. Redacted Transcript Deadline is set for 2/23/2023. Release of the Transcript Restriction is set for 4/23/2023. Before release date, the transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the reporter. Transcript Order form is available on court website. After that date it may be obtained through the court reporter or PACER. (PMC)
January 23, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 109 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings, 39 Order on Motion for Protective Order, Order on Motion for Sanctions, Order on Motion to Dismiss, Order on Motion to Compel, Order on Motion for Order to Show Cause, Order on Motion to Stay Discovery, Motion Hearing, held on 12/21/2020, before Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach. Court Reporter: Paige Christian, Paige_Christian@nvd.uscourts.gov. Any Redaction Request is due by 2/13/2023. Redacted Transcript Deadline is set for 2/23/2023. Release of the Transcript Restriction is set for 4/23/2023. Before release date, the transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the reporter. Transcript Order form is available on court website. After that date it may be obtained through the court reporter or PACER. (PMC) (Main Document 109 replaced on 1/23/2023) (PMC).
January 17, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 108 ORDER Admonishing Defendants. IT IS ORDERED that the Clerk's Office is INSTRUCTED to send this order to Defendants at both of the physical addresses on the docket, as well as at the email address provided for Defendant Dayal. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 1/17/2023. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - by mail and email to Defendants - HAM) Modified text on 1/17/2023 (AC).
January 17, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 107 MINUTES OF PROCEEDINGS - Motion Hearing re #96 Motion to Withdraw as Defendants' Counsel of Record held on 1/17/2023 before Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe. Crtrm Administrator: A. Caytuero; Pla Counsel: Eric Kohli, Pro Se; Def Counsel: Brandon Phillips, Esq.; Time of Hearing: 2:03 PM - 2:17 PM; Electronic Court Recorder Operator: Liberty/ CRD; Recording start and end times: 2:03:15 - 2:17:55; Courtroom: 3C; Plaintiff and Defendants' counsel are present. The Court makes preliminary statements and notes that Defendant/ Defendant Representatives are not present. The Court hears the representations of Defense counsel as to Defendant/ Defendant Representatives failure to appear at this hearing. The Court hears further representations of counsel as to #96 Motion to Withdraw as Defendants' Counsel of Record. For the reasons stated on the record, IT IS ORDERED that #96 Motion to Withdraw as Defendants' Counsel of Record is GRANTED. Attorney Brandon Phillips withdrawn from this case. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk's Office shall add Defendants last known addresses and email to the docket. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Defendant Ajay G. Dayal will have until Friday, February 17, 2023, to either retain new counsel, who must file a Notice of Appearance in accordance with the Local Rules of Practice, or file a Notice of Intent to Proceed Pro Se with the Court. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Corporate Defendants Quantified Investment Group LLC, Quantified Capital Group, LLC, Pacific Bay Lending Group, and Miss Elegant Expo will have until Friday, February 17, 2023, to retain new counsel, who must file a Notice of Appearance in accordance with the Local Rules of Practice. Court adjourns. (no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - cc: Defendant at both addresses via USPS and email - AC)
January 17, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 106 ORDER granting #105 Motion to Extend Time. The deadline to file the renewed motion for sanctions is EXTENDED to March 14, 2023. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 1/17/2023. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - HAM)
January 16, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 105 First MOTION to Extend Time (First Request) for filing a renewed motion re #103 Order on Motion for Sanctions,,,, Set/Reset Deadlines & Hearings, by Plaintiff Eric Kohli. Responses due by 1/30/2023. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 2, #3 Proposed Order Proposed Order for the Court, #4 Certificate of Service Cert if Service)(Kohli, Eric) (referral)
December 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 104 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE for #102 Order,, Set/Reset Deadlines & Hearings, by Defendants Ajay G Dayal, Miss Elegant Expo, Pacific Bay Lending Group, Quantified Capital Group, LLC, Quantified Investment Group LLC.. (Phillips, Brandon)
December 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 103 ORDER denying #94 Motion for Sanctions; Plaintiff will be permitted one final opportunity to seek this relief. Any renewed motion must be filed by February 14, 2023. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 12/14/2022. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - HAM)
December 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 102 ORDER Re: #96 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Motion Hearing set for 1/17/2023 at 02:00 PM in LV Courtroom 3C before Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 12/14/2022. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - HAM)
September 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 101 REPLY to Response to #94 Motion for Sanctions, by Plaintiff Eric Kohli. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1, #2 Certificate of Service Cert of Service)(Kohli, Eric)
September 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 100 REPLY to Response to #96 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney, #94 Motion for Sanctions, by Defendants Ajay G Dayal, Miss Elegant Expo, Pacific Bay Lending Group, Quantified Capital Group, LLC, Quantified Investment Group LLC. (Phillips, Brandon)
September 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 99 RESPONSE to #94 Motion for Sanctions, by Defendants Ajay G Dayal, Miss Elegant Expo, Pacific Bay Lending Group, Quantified Capital Group, LLC, Quantified Investment Group LLC. Replies due by 9/16/2022. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A-E)(Phillips, Brandon)
September 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 98 RESPONSE to #96 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney, by Plaintiff Eric Kohli. Replies due by 9/14/2022. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1, #2 Certificate of Service Certificate of Service)(Kohli, Eric)
September 6, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 97 ORDER Re: #94 Motion for Sanctions, Responses due by 9/9/2022. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 9/6/2022. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - HAM)
September 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 96 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Brandon L. Phillips for Defendants Ajay G Dayal, Miss Elegant Expo, Pacific Bay Lending Group, Quantified Capital Group, LLC, Quantified Investment Group LLC. Responses due by 9/16/2022. (Phillips, Brandon)
August 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 95 ORDER Denying #70 Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff's request for Rule 11 sanctions is DENIED. Signed by Judge Cristina D. Silva on 8/22/2022. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DXS)
August 19, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 94 Second MOTION for Sanctions Based on Non-Compliance by Plaintiff Eric Kohli. (discovery) Responses due by 9/2/2022. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit Exhibit 8, #9 Certificate of Service Cert. of Service)(Kohli, Eric)
August 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 93 MINUTES OF PROCEEDINGS - Motion Hearing held on 8/8/2022 before Judge Cristina D. Silva. Crtrm Administrator: D. Saavedra; Pla Counsel: Eric Kohli, Pro Se; Def Counsel: Brandon Phillips by video conference; Court Reporter: Samantha McNett; Time of Hearing: 10:47 a.m. - 11:30 a.m.; Courtroom: 6B; Parties are present in person and via zoom. The Court makes preliminary remarks and hears representations of counsel as to #61 Motion for Entry of Clerks Default, #70 Counter motion for summary judgment re # 67 QC notice, and #76 Motion for leave to file surreply re # 75. Accordingly, as stated on the record the Court DENIES ECF #61 and #76 . Further, the Court takes under advisement (ECF #70) and will render decision within 14 days.The transcript of this hearing will serve as the Court's findings of fact and conclusion of law. (no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DXS)
July 27, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 92 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Judge Cristina D. Silva on 7/27/2022. NOTICE SETTING HEARING on #61 Motion for Entry of Clerk's Default filed by Plaintiff Eric Kohli; #70 Counter-Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Defendants Ajay G Dayal, Miss Elegant Expo, Pacific Bay Lending Group, Quantified Capital Group, LLC, Quantified Investment Group LLC; and #76 First Motion for Leave to File a Surreply filed by Plaintiff Eric Kohli. Motions Hearing set for August 8, 2022 at 10:30 AM in LV Courtroom 6B before Judge Cristina D. Silva. The hearing may be attended in person or Zoom video conference. If attending via video, the parties are kindly directed to contact Courtroom Administrator Denise Saavedra at denise_saavedra@nvd.uscourts.gov for the Zoom link information.(no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JLB)
July 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 91 ORDER denying without prejudice #78 Motion for Sanctions. Any renewed motion must be filed by 8/19/2022. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 7/22/2022. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - HAM)
April 26, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 90 ORDER. IT IS ORDERED that this matter is referred to the Clerk of Court for random reassignment to another Magistrate Judge. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 4/26/2022. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - HAM)
April 26, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 89 MINUTES OF PROCEEDINGS - Settlement Conference held on 4/26/2022 before Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach. Pla Counsel: Eric Kohli; Def Counsel: Brandon Phillips, Esq.; Defendant Ajay G. Dayal; Time of Hearing: 11:00 AM - 12:30 PM; (no image attached) The court met and conferred with the parties and counsel. A settlement agreement was not reached. Accordingly, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the case returns to the normal litigation track.(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MT)
April 26, 2022 Opinion or Order Case randomly assigned to Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe. (HAM)
April 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 88 MINUTES OF PROCEEDINGS - Settlement Conference held on 4/13/2022 before Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach. Pla Counsel: Eric Kohli; Def Counsel: Brandon Phillips, Esq.; Defendant Ajay G. Dayal; Time of Hearing: 10:00 AM - 11:30 AM; (no image attached) The court met and conferred with the parties and counsel. Accordingly, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the settlement conference is CONTINUED to 11:00 AM, April 26, 2022, in Courtroom 3D, before Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the parties must appear in-person for the settlement conference.(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MT)
April 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 87 CLERK'S NOTICE that in order to create a caseload for U.S. District Judge Cristina D. Silva, this case is reassigned to Judge Cristina D. Silva for all further proceedings. All further documents must bear the correct case number 2:20-cv-00538-CDS-VCF. (no image attached) (LOE)
March 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 86 RECEIPT of Payment: $ 1000, receipt number NVLAS080349 re 85 Minute Order (HAM)
March 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 85 MINUTES OF PROCEEDINGS - Status Conference held on 3/25/2022 before Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach. Crtrm Administrator: J. Ries; Def Counsel: Brandon Phillips; Recording start and end times: 10:05 - 10:16; Courtroom: 3D; The Plaintiff, Eric Kohli is present. The court canvasses and hears representations from the parties as it pertains to the settlement conference previously set for today. ORDERED settlement conference is reset for April 13, 2022, at 10:00 a.m. and order #83 will continue to govern the specifics of this settlement conference. Settlement conference statements are due by April 6, 2022, at 4:00 p.m., see order #83 . FURTHER ORDERED Mr. Brandon Phillips is given a monetary sanction in the amount of $1000.00 to be paid to the crime victims fund. Mr. Phillips will have until April 1, 2022, by 4:00 p.m. to pay the clerk of court. (no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JAR)
March 23, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 84 ORDER. The settlement conference set for 10:00 AM, March 25, 2022, is VACATED. An in-person status hearing is scheduled for 10:00 AM, March 25, 2022. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 3/23/2022. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - HAM)
February 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 83 ORDER setting Settlement Conference. Settlement Conference set for 3/25/2022 at 10:00 AM by videoconference before Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 2/11/2022. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - HAM)
February 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 82 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 2/11/2022. By Deputy Clerk: NEV. Pursuant to LR 16-5, this case is REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach for a settlement conference.(no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - NEV)
December 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 81 REPLY to Response to #78 Motion for Sanctions, by Plaintiff Eric Kohli. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Certificate of Service) (Kohli, Eric)
December 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 80 ERRATA to #79 Response to #78 Motion for Sanctions by Defendants Ajay G Dayal, Miss Elegant Expo, Pacific Bay Lending Group, Quantified Capital Group, LLC, Quantified Investment Group LLC. (Phillips, Brandon) Modified on 12/27/2021 (EDS).
December 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 79 RESPONSE to #78 Motion for Sanctions, by Defendants Ajay G Dayal, Miss Elegant Expo, Pacific Bay Lending Group, Quantified Capital Group, LLC, Quantified Investment Group LLC. Replies due by 12/28/2021. (Phillips, Brandon)
December 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 78 First MOTION for Sanctions Based on Non-Compliance by Plaintiff Eric Kohli. Responses due by 12/21/2021. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit Exhibit 6, #7 Certificate of Service Certificate of Service) (Kohli, Eric)
December 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 77 RESPONSE to #76 Motion for Leave to File Document, by Defendants Ajay G Dayal, Miss Elegant Expo, Pacific Bay Lending Group, Quantified Capital Group, LLC, Quantified Investment Group LLC. Replies due by 12/10/2021. (Phillips, Brandon)
December 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 76 First MOTION for Leave to File a Surreply re #75 Reply to Response to #70 Motion for Summary Judgment by Plaintiff Eric Kohli. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1, #2 Certificate of Service Cert of Service) (Kohli, Eric) Modified on 12/3/2021 (EDS).
December 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 75 REPLY to Response to #70 Motion for Summary Judgment, by Defendants Ajay G Dayal, Miss Elegant Expo, Pacific Bay Lending Group, Quantified Capital Group, LLC, Quantified Investment Group LLC. (Phillips, Brandon)
November 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 74 RESPONSE to #70 Motion for Summary Judgment, by Plaintiff Eric Kohli. Replies due by 12/2/2021. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 3, #4 Certificate of Service Certificate of Service) (Kohli, Eric)
November 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 73 MINUTES OF PROCEEDINGS - Status Conference held on 11/5/2021 before Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach. Crtrm Administrator: T. Renfro; Pla Counsel: Eric Kohli, Pro Se; Def Counsel: Brandon Phillips; Recording start and end times: 11:02 - 11:09 am; Courtroom: 3D; All parties appeared via video conference. The Court makes preliminary remarks and hears representations of counsel. ORDERED that the parties are to meet and confer. Mr. Kohli has until December 7, 2021, to file any Motion for Sanctions. FURTHER ORDERED that Discovery is due by 1/7/2022; Dispositive Motions due by 2/7/2022; and Proposed Joint Pretrial Order due by 3/9/2022. If dispositive motions are filed, the deadline for filing the joint pretrial order will be suspended until 30 days after decision on the dispositive motions or further court order.(no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - TR)
October 31, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 72 REPLY to Response to #61 Motion for Entry of Clerks Default by Plaintiff Eric Kohli. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 2, #3 Certificate of Service Certificate of Service) (Kohli, Eric)
October 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 71 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 10/29/2021. Regarding the Requirements of Klingele v. Eikenberry and Rand v. Rowland as to #70 Motion for Summary Judgment,. Opposition due 21 days from the date of this Minute Order, and reply due 14 days after the filing of the opposition. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DKJ)
October 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 70 Counter MOTION for Summary Judgment re 67 QC Notice, #66 Response by Defendants Ajay G Dayal, Miss Elegant Expo, Pacific Bay Lending Group, Quantified Capital Group, LLC, Quantified Investment Group LLC. Responses due by 11/19/2021. (Phillips, Brandon)
October 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 69 RESPONSE to #61 Motion for Entry of Clerks Default by Defendants Ajay G Dayal, Miss Elegant Expo, Pacific Bay Lending Group, Quantified Capital Group, LLC, Quantified Investment Group LLC. Replies due by 11/5/2021. (Phillips, Brandon)
October 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 68 REPLY to Response to #61 Motion for Entry of Clerks Default by Plaintiff Eric Kohli. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 2, #3 Certificate of Service Certificate of Service) (Kohli, Eric)
October 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 67 CLERK'S NOTICE. Attorney Action Required to ECF No. #66 Response. Document was not filed pursuant to LR IC 2-2(b). For each type of relief requested or purpose, a separate document must be filed. Counsel is advised to refile the Countermotion for Summary Judgment contained in ECF No. #66 and be in compliance with LR IC 2-2(b) and LR IC 2-2(c) by filing two separate documents for each request or purpose. (no image attached) (EDS)
October 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 66 RESPONSE to #61 Motion for Entry of Clerks Default by Defendants Ajay G Dayal, Miss Elegant Expo, Pacific Bay Lending Group, Quantified Capital Group, LLC, Quantified Investment Group LLC. Replies due by 10/28/2021. (Phillips, Brandon)
October 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 65 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Ajay G Dayal, Miss Elegant Expo, Pacific Bay Lending Group, Quantified Capital Group, LLC, Quantified Investment Group LLC. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Phillips, Brandon)
October 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 64 ANSWER to #1 Complaint filed by Ajay G Dayal, Miss Elegant Expo, Pacific Bay Lending Group, Quantified Capital Group, LLC, Quantified Investment Group LLC.(Phillips, Brandon)
October 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 63 CLERK'S NOTICE. Attorney Action Required to ECF No. #62 Answer. ERROR: Document contains a Certificate of Interested Parties which should be filed as its own document. Counsel is advised to correct the document, refile as a Notice of Corrected Image/Document, link to #62 , and file a separate Certificate of Interested Parties. (no image attached) (EDS)
October 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 62 ANSWER to #17 Amended Complaint, filed by Ajay G Dayal, Miss Elegant Expo, Pacific Bay Lending Group, Quantified Capital Group, LLC, Quantified Investment Group LLC.(Phillips, Brandon)
October 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 61 MOTION for Entry of Clerk's Default by Plaintiff Eric Kohli. Responses due by 10/21/2021. (Attachments: #1 Motion) (HAM)
September 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 60 ORDER denying #40 Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 9/20/2021. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - HAM)
July 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 59 MINUTES OF PROCEEDINGS - Motion Hearing held on 7/1/2021 before Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach. Crtrm Administrator: T. Renfro; Pla Counsel: Eric Kohli, Pro Se; Def Counsel: Brandon Phillips; Recording start and end times: 12:59 - 1:14 pm; Courtroom: 3D; The Court makes preliminary remarks and hears representations of the parties. ORDERED that #57 Motion to Compel is GRANTED. The deposition of Ajay Dayal will continue for 3 more hours in person on July 12, 2021, at 10:00 am at Litigation Services, 3960 Howard Hughes Parkway, Suite 700, Las Vegas, Nevada 89169. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - TR)
June 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 58 ORDER Setting Hearing on #57 First MOTION to Compel. Motion Hearing set for 7/1/2021 at 01:00 PM in LV Courtroom 3D. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 6/22/2021. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - HAM)
June 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 57 First MOTION to Compel Defendant Dayal's Deposition re 56 Order on Motion for Order to Show Cause,,,,, Order on Motion to Take Deposition,,,,, Motion Hearing,,,, by Plaintiff Eric Kohli. Responses due by 6/16/2021. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Certificate of Service CoS) (Kohli, Eric)
April 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 56 MINUTES OF PROCEEDINGS - Motion Hearing held on 4/19/2021 before Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach. Crtrm Administrator: T. Renfro; Pla Counsel: Eric Kohli, Pro Se; Def Counsel: Brandon Phillips; Recording start and end times: 9:58 - 10:20 am; Courtroom: 3D; All parties appeared via video conference. The Court makes preliminary remarks and hears representations of the parties. ORDERED that the Order to Show Cause is DISCHARGED. FURTHER ORDERED that #51 Motion to Take Deposition from Ajay Dayal is GRANTED. The deposition of Mr. Dayal will continue for 3 more hours, include 8-10 exhibits of no more than 25 pages, and is to be taken before July 16, 2021. The testimony of the first 3 hour session deposition of Mr. Dayal was for both himself and the corporation. All discovery is STAYED until the #40 Motion to Dismiss has been ruled on.A Status Conference is scheduled for November 5, 2021 at 11:00 am in LV Courtroom 3D before Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - TR)
April 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 55 ORDER. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that a video conference hearing is scheduled for 10:00 AM, April 19, 2021, on the Motion for Order to Show Cause (ECF No. #42 ) and Motion for Leave of Court to Complete Defendant Dayal's Deposition (ECF No. #51 ). IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that counsel/the parties must email Courtroom Administrator, Tawnee Renfro at Tawnee_Renfro@nvd.uscourts.gov, with an email address to be used for the video conference hearing by noon, April 16, 2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 4/9/2021. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - HAM)
March 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 54 REPLY to #52 Response to #42 Motion for Order to Show Cause by Plaintiff Eric Kohli. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 2, #3 Certificate of Service) (Kohli, Eric) Modified to link to underlying motion on 3/26/2021 (EDS).
March 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 53 SUBPOENAS Issued. (HAM)
March 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 52 RESPONSE to #42 Motion for Order to Show Cause by Defendant Ajay G Dayal. (Phillips, Brandon) Modified to link to underlying motion on 3/16/2021 (EDS).
March 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 51 First MOTION to Take Deposition from Ajay G. Dayal re 39 Order on Motion for Protective Order,,,,,, Order on Motion for Sanctions,,,,,, Order on Motion to Dismiss,,,,,, Order on Motion to Compel,,,,,, Order on Motion for Order to Show Cause,,,,,, Order on Motion to Stay Discovery,,,,,, Motion Hearing,,,,, by Plaintiff Eric Kohli. Responses due by 3/26/2021. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service) (Kohli, Eric)
March 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 50 NOTICE of Payment of Sanctions by Ajay G Dayal, Miss Elegant Expo, Pacific Bay Lending Group, Quantified Capital Group, LLC, Quantified Investment Group LLC. (Phillips, Brandon)
March 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 49 MINUTES OF PROCEEDINGS - Show Cause Hearing held on 3/4/2021 before Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach. Crtrm Administrator: T. Renfro; Pla Counsel: Eric Kohli, Pro Se; Def Counsel: Brandon Phillips; Recording start and end times: 2:03 - 2:20 PM; Courtroom: 3D; All parties appear via video conference. The Court makes preliminary remarks and hears representations of counsel and plaintiff regarding the Order to Show Cause. Mr. Phillips makes an oral request to extend the time to file a Response to #42 Second Motion for Order to Show Cause, which is GRANTED. ORDERED that the Response is due March 15, 2021. The Reply is due 10 days after the Response is filed. The Court canvasses Mr. Phillips and defendant Ajay G. Dayal regarding the $500.00 sanction that was ordered to be paid by January 8, 2021. The defendant will mail a check for the sanctions immediately to the court. The #47 Motion to Extend Time for Discovery is DENIED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - TR)
February 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ORDER Setting Hearing on #47 First MOTION to Extend Time (First Request) for Discovery re #24 Order on Discovery Plan and Scheduling Order, by Plaintiff Eric Kohli. Motion Hearing set for 3/4/2021 at 02:00 PM in LV Courtroom 3D by videoconference before Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that counsel/the parties must email Courtroom Administrator Tawnee Renfro at Tawnee_Renfro@nvd.uscourts.gov, with an email address(es) to be used for the video conference hearing by noon, March 3, 2021. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Video Conference Instructions to the scheduled hearings will be sent via email 30 minutes prior to the hearing to the participants email provided to the Court. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 2/26/2021. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - HAM)
February 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 47 First MOTION to Extend Time (First Request) for Discovery re #24 Order on Discovery Plan and Scheduling Order, by Plaintiff Eric Kohli. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service) (Kohli, Eric)
February 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 46 ORDER granting #45 Motion to Continue Hearing; Show Cause Hearing set for 3/4/2021 at 02:00 PM by videoconference. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that defendants Ajay G Dayal, and representatives of Quantified Investment Group LLC, Quantified Capital Group, LLC, Pacific Bay Lending Group, Miss Elegant Expo, must also appear at the video hearing. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that counsel/the parties must email Courtroom Administrator Tawnee Renfro at Tawnee_Renfro@nvd.uscourts.gov, with an email address(es) to be used for the video conference hearing by noon, March 3, 2021. Instructions to the scheduled hearings will be sent via email thirty (30) minutes prior to the hearing to the participants email provided to the Court. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 2/17/2021. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - HAM)
February 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 45 First MOTION to Continue Hearing re #44 Order on Motion for Order to Show Cause,,,,,, Set/Reset Deadlines & Hearings,, by Plaintiff Eric Kohli. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service) (Kohli, Eric)
February 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDER granting in part and denying in part #42 Motion for Order to Show Cause; Show Cause Hearing set for 2/22/2021 at 10:00 AM by videoconference before Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach. Show Cause Response due by 2/16/2021. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that counsel/the parties must email Courtroom Administrator Tawnee Renfro at Tawnee_Renfro@nvd.uscourts.gov, with an email address(es) to be used for the video conference hearing by noon, 2/19/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 2/2/2021. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - HAM)
January 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 43 RESPONSE to #40 Motion to Dismiss by Plaintiff Eric Kohli. Replies due by 1/28/2021. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service) (Kohli, Eric)
January 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 42 Second MOTION for Order to Show Cause by Plaintiff Eric Kohli. Responses due by 1/27/2021. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 3, #4 Certificate of Service Cert of Service) (Kohli, Eric)
January 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 41 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 1/8/2021. Regarding the Requirements of Klingele v. Eikenberry and Rand v. Rowland as to #40 Motion to Dismiss. Opposition due 14 days from the date of this Minute Order, and reply due seven 7 days after the filing of the opposition. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - EDS)
January 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 40 MOTION to Dismiss #17 Amended Complaint, by Defendants Ajay G Dayal, Miss Elegant Expo, Pacific Bay Lending Group, Quantified Capital Group, LLC, Quantified Investment Group LLC. Responses due by 1/22/2021. (Phillips, Brandon)
December 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 39 MINUTES OF PROCEEDINGS - Motion Hearing held on 12/21/2020 before Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach. Crtrm Administrator: T. Renfro; Pla Counsel: Eric Kohli, Pro Se; Def Counsel: Brandon Phillips; Recording start and end times: 1:00 - 1:25 PM; Courtroom: 3D; All parties appeared via video conference. The Court makes preliminary remarks and hears representations of counsel. For reasons stated on the record, IT IS ORDERED that #15 Motion to Dismiss is DENIED as MOOT, the deadline to respond to the Amended Complaint is January 8, 2021. FURTHER ORDERED that #28 Motion to Compel is GRANTED, the deadline to serve complete responses to all the discovery is January 8, 2021. FURTHER ORDERED that #29 Motion for Order to Show Cause and #30 Motion to Stay Discovery are DENIED. FURTHER ORDERED #32 Motion for Protective Order is GRANTED in PART. All depositions must be videotaped on the date set by the parties. #35 Motion for Sanctions is GRANTED. Defendant is sanctioned in the amount of $500.00 to be paid to the Clerk of the Court by 4:00 p.m. on January 8, 2021. The funds will go to the Crime Victims Assistance Fund. A check or money order made payable to the Clerk of the Court can be mailed to the United States District Court, 333 Las Vegas Blvd. South, Las Vegas, NV 89101. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - TR)
November 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that a video conference hearing on the #28 Motion to Compel, #29 Motion for Order to Show Cause, #30 Motion to Stay Discovery, #32 Motion for Protective Order, and #35 Countermotion for Attorney Discipline and Sanctions, is scheduled for 1:00 PM, December 21, 2020, in Courtroom 3D.IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that counsel/the parties must email Courtroom Administrator,Tawnee Renfro at Tawnee_Renfro@nvd.uscourts.gov, with an email address to be used for the videoconference hearing by noon, December 18, 2020.IT IS ORDERED that the Video Conference Instructions will be adhered to: See Order for details. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 11/12/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - HAM)
November 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 37 REPLY to #36 Response to #35 Motion for Sanctions, by Plaintiff Eric Kohli. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit Exhibit 6, #7 Certificate of Service Certificate of Service) (Kohli, Eric) Modified to link to underlying motion on 11/5/2020 (EDS).
October 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 36 RESPONSE to #35 Motion for Sanctions, by Defendants Ajay G Dayal, Miss Elegant Expo, Pacific Bay Lending Group, Quantified Capital Group, LLC, Quantified Investment Group LLC. Replies due by 11/4/2020. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (Phillips, Brandon)
October 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 35 Countermotion for Attorney Discipline and Sanctions by Plaintiff Eric Kohli. Replies due by 10/20/2020. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 4, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 5, #3 Certificate of Service Certificate of Service) (Kohli, Eric) Filed incorrectly. Modified by Clerk's Office to reflect entry is a motion for sanctions and not a response on 10/14/2020 (EDS).
October 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 34 CLERK'S NOTICE. Action Required to ECF No. #33 Response to Motion. Document was not filed pursuant to LR IC 2-2(b). For each type of relief requested or purpose, a separate document must be filed. Plaintiff is advised to refile the Countermotion in ECF No. #33 as a separate entry, using the appropriate event. (no image attached) (EDS)
October 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 33 RESPONSE to #32 Motion for Protective Order by Plaintiff Eric Kohli. Replies due by 10/18/2020. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit Exhibit 5, #6 Certificate of Service Certificate of Service) (Kohli, Eric)
October 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 32 MOTION for Protective Order by Defendants Ajay G Dayal, Miss Elegant Expo, Pacific Bay Lending Group, Quantified Capital Group, LLC, Quantified Investment Group LLC. (Phillips, Brandon)
October 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 31 RESPONSE to #30 Motion to Stay Discovery by Plaintiff Eric Kohli. Replies due by 10/14/2020. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service) (Kohli, Eric)
October 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 30 MOTION to Stay Discovery re #15 Motion to Dismiss by Defendants Ajay G Dayal, Miss Elegant Expo, Pacific Bay Lending Group, Quantified Capital Group, LLC, Quantified Investment Group LLC. (Phillips, Brandon)
October 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 29 MOTION for Order to Show Cause by Plaintiff Eric Kohli. Responses due by 10/18/2020. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service Certificate of Service) (Kohli, Eric)
September 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 28 MOTION to Compel by Plaintiff Eric Kohli. Responses due by 10/2/2020. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Certificate of Service) (HAM)
September 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER granting #26 Motion to Compel Discovery. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that on or before September 29, 2020, Defendants must 1. comply with the provisions of Rule 26 and produce proper disclosures, 2. fully respond to Plaintiff's First Request to the Production discussed above, 3. fully respond to Plaintiff's First Set of Interrogatories discussed above, and, 4. fully respond to Plaintiff's First Set of Requests to Admit discussed above. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 9/14/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - HAM)
August 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 26 First MOTION to Compel discovery by Plaintiff Eric Kohli. Responses due by 9/3/2020. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit Exhibit 4, #5 Certificate of Service Certif of Serv.) (Kohli, Eric)
June 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 25 NOTICE PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE IB 2-2: In accordance with 28 USC 636(c) and FRCP 73, the parties in this action are provided with a link to the "AO 85 Notice of Availability, Consent, and Order of Reference - Exercise of Jurisdiction by a U.S. Magistrate Judge" form on the Court's website - #www.nvd.uscourts.gov. AO 85 Consent forms should NOT be electronically filed. Upon consent of all parties, counsel are advised to manually file the form with the Clerk's Office. (A copy of form AO 85 has been mailed to parties not receiving electronic service.) (no image attached) (ADR)
June 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 24 SCHEDULING ORDER Granting #23 Discovery Plan and Scheduling Order. Discovery due by 4/30/2021. Motions due by 6/1/2021. Proposed Joint Pretrial Order due by 6/29/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 6/17/2020.(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
June 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 23 Stipulated Discovery Plan and Scheduling Order re #22 Order by Plaintiff Eric Kohli. (Kohli, Eric)
June 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER. IT IS ORDERED that the parties must a proposed discovery plan and scheduling order on or before 6/25/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 6/11/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
May 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 21 REPLY to Response to #15 Motion to Dismiss by Defendants Ajay G Dayal, Miss Elegant Expo, Pacific Bay Lending Group, Quantified Capital Group, LLC, Quantified Investment Group LLC. (Phillips, Brandon)
May 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 20 RESPONSE to #15 Motion to Dismiss by Plaintiff Eric Kohli. Replies due by 5/12/2020. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service Cert of Service) (Kohli, Eric)
May 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 19 CLERK'S NOTICE. Action Required to ECF No. #18 Non-Opposition. Document was not filed pursuant to LR IC 2-2(c). The wrong event was selected. Plaintiff is advised to refile ECF No. #18 using the appropriate docket entry event, "Response," and correctly following the prompts. (no image attached) (EDS)
May 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ERROR: Incorrect event used. Plaintiff advised to refile. NON-OPPOSITION to #15 Motion to Dismiss by Plaintiff Eric Kohli. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service Cert of Service for Opposition) (Kohli, Eric)
May 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 17 First AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against All Defendants by Eric Kohli. No changes to parties. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibits for Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint, #2 Certificate of Service Cert of Service) (Kohli, Eric)
April 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 16 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 4/30/2020. Regarding the Requirements of Klingele v. Eikenberry and Rand v. Rowland as to #15 Motion to Dismiss. Opposition due 14 days from the date of this Minute Order, and reply due seven 7 days after the filing of the opposition. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - EDS)
April 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 MOTION to Dismiss by Defendant Ajay G Dayal. Responses due by 5/13/2020. (Phillips, Brandon)
April 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 MINUTES OF PROCEEDINGS - Telephonic Motion Hearing held on 4/15/2020 before Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach. Crtrm Administrator: T. Renfro; Pla Counsel: Eric Kohli, Pro Se; Def Counsel: Brandon Phillips; Recording start and end times: 10:03 - 10:13 a.m.; Courtroom: 3D; All parties appeared telephonically. The Court makes preliminary remarks and admonishes Mr. Phillips for joining the telephonic conference late. ORDERED that #11 Motion to Extend Time is GRANTED in Part and DENIED in Part. Defendants have until 4/29/2020 to Answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint #1 . (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - TR)
April 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 4/9/2020. Before the Court is Defendants Motion for Extension of Time (ECF No. 11) and Plaintiffs Opposition (ECF No. 12). Accordingly,IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that a telephonic hearing on Defendants Motion for Extension of Time (ECF No. 11) is scheduled for 10:00 AM, April 15, 2020.The call-in telephone number is (888)273-3658, access code: 3912597. The call must be made five minutes prior to the hearing time. The court will join the call and convene the proceedings. To improve sound quality, the parties should use a land line, at all possible. The use of a speaker phone during the proceedings is prohibited.The Public may access and listen to the hearing using the telephone number and access code as provided above. The public may not speak during the hearing and must put their phone on mute. The public may not record the hearing. (no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MT)
April 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 RESPONSE to #11 Motion to Extend/Shorten Time by Plaintiff Eric Kohli. Replies due by 4/15/2020. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service, #2 Exhibit) (Kohli, Eric)
April 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 First MOTION to Extend Time (First Request) re #1 Complaint by Defendant Ajay G Dayal. (Phillips, Brandon)
March 31, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 CERTIFICATION of Completion of CM/ECF Tutorial, filed by Eric Kohli. (ADR) (Additional attachment(s) added on 4/6/2020: #1 registration form) (EDS).
March 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER Granting #7 Motion for Pro Se Litigant to File Electronically. On or before 4/6/20, Plaintiff must provide certification that he has completed the CM/ECF tutorial. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 3/23/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
March 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed re #1 Complaint. Pacific Bay Lending Group served on 3/17/2020. (ADR)
March 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 MOTION for Pro Se Litigant to File Electronically, filed by Plaintiff Eric Kohli. (ADR)
March 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed re #1 Complaint. Ajay G Dayal served on 3/17/2020; Miss Elegant Expo served on 3/17/2020; Quantified Capital Group, LLC served on 3/17/2020; Quantified Investment Group LLC served on 3/17/2020. (ADR)
March 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 STANDING ORDER. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Judge Gloria M. Navarro. Judge Navarro's Chambers Practices, which are posted on the U.S. District Court, District of Nevada public website, may also be accessed directly via this hyperlink #www.nvd.uscourts.gov. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - EDS)
March 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ADVISORY LETTER to litigant. (ADR)
March 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Summons Issued as to All Defendants re #1 Complaint. (ADR)
March 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Eric Kohli. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (ADR)
March 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $400), filed by Eric Kohli. Proof of service due by 6/15/2020. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Receipt no. NVLAS069266) (ADR)
March 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Case randomly assigned to Judge Gloria M. Navarro and Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach. (RT)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kohli v. Dayal et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Quantified Investment Group LLC
Represented By: Brandon Phillips
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Quantified Capital Group, LLC
Represented By: Brandon Phillips
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ajay G Dayal
Represented By: Brandon Phillips
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Miss Elegant Expo
Represented By: Brandon Phillips
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pacific Bay Lending Group
Represented By: Brandon Phillips
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eric Kohli
Represented By: Eric Kohli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?