Martinez-Antonio v. GEICO Casualty Company
Plaintiff: Jessica Martinez-Antonio
Defendant: GEICO Casualty Company
Case Number: 2:2020cv00635
Filed: April 2, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Presiding Judge: Daniel J Albregts
Referring Judge: Gloria M Navarro
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 20, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 20, 2020 Filing 18 NOTICE PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE IB 2-2: In accordance with 28 USC 636(c) and FRCP 73, the parties in this action are provided with a link to the "AO 85 Notice of Availability, Consent, and Order of Reference - Exercise of Jurisdiction by a U.S. Magistrate Judge" form on the Court's website - #www.nvd.uscourts.gov. AO 85 Consent forms should NOT be electronically filed. Upon consent of all parties, counsel are advised to manually file the form with the Clerk's Office. (A copy of form AO 85 has been mailed to parties not receiving electronic service.) (no image attached) (DRS)
May 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 17 SCHEDULING ORDER granting #16 Discovery Plan and Scheduling Order. Discovery due by 11/30/2020. Motions due by 12/30/2020. Proposed Joint Pretrial Order due by 1/29/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Daniel J. Albregts on 5/20/2020.(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRS)
May 19, 2020 Filing 16 Joint Proposed Discovery Plan and Scheduling Order by Plaintiff Jessica Martinez-Antonio. (Moss, Boyd)
May 19, 2020 Filing 15 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Magistrate Judge Daniel J. Albregts on 5/19/2020. ORDER denying #14 Discovery Plan and Scheduling Order. The Court denies the parties' Discovery Plan and Scheduling Order without prejudice due to its failure to comply with the Local Rules. The parties are directed to review the Local Rules, specifically LR 26-1(b)(7) and (b)(8), and re-file a compliant plan. (no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KL)
May 15, 2020 Filing 14 Joint Proposed Discovery Plan and Scheduling Order by Plaintiff Jessica Martinez-Antonio. (Moss, Boyd)
May 15, 2020 Filing 13 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Magistrate Judge Daniel J. Albregts on 5/15/2020. ORDER denying #12 Discovery Plan and Scheduling Order; The Court denies the parties' Discovery Plan and Scheduling Order without prejudice due to its failure to correctly cite to and comply with the amended Local Rules. The Local Rules of Practice for the District of Nevada were amended and adopted on April 17, 2020. The parties are directed to review the amendments to the Local Rules, specifically Local Rules 26-1 through 26-7, and re-file a compliant plan.(no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KB)
May 14, 2020 Filing 12 Joint Proposed Discovery Plan and Scheduling Order by Plaintiff Jessica Martinez-Antonio. (Moss, Boyd)
May 12, 2020 Filing 11 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Magistrate Judge Daniel J. Albregts on 5/12/2020. ORDER denying #10 Discovery Plan and Scheduling Order. The Court denies the parties' Proposed Joint Discovery Plan and Scheduling Order without prejudice due to its failure to cite to and comply with the amended Local Rules. The Local Rules of Practice for the District of Nevada were amended and adopted on April 17, 2020. The parties are directed to review the amendments to the Local Rules, specifically Local Rules 26-1 through 26-7, and re-file a compliant stipulation. (no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KL)
May 11, 2020 Filing 10 Joint Proposed Discovery Plan and Scheduling Order by Plaintiff Jessica Martinez-Antonio. (Moss, Boyd)
May 4, 2020 Filing 9 Joint STATUS REPORT re Removal by Plaintiff Jessica Martinez-Antonio. (Moss, Boyd)
April 20, 2020 Filing 8 STATEMENT REGARDING REMOVAL by Defendant GEICO Casualty Company. (Goldstein, Steven)
April 20, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE of OF INITIAL DISCLOSURE CONFERENCE PURSUANT TO LR 26-1 AND F.R.C.P. 26(f) by Jessica Martinez-Antonio. (Moss, Boyd)
April 10, 2020 Filing 6 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Jessica Martinez-Antonio. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Moss, Boyd)
April 3, 2020 Filing 5 STANDING ORDER. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Judge Gloria M. Navarro. Judge Navarro's Chambers Practices, which are posted on the U.S. District Court, District of Nevada public website, may also be accessed directly via this hyperlink #www.nvd.uscourts.gov. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
April 3, 2020 Filing 4 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 4/3/2020. Statement regarding removed action is due by 4/18/2020. Joint Status Report regarding removed action is due by 5/3/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
April 2, 2020 Case randomly assigned to Judge Gloria M. Navarro and Magistrate Judge Daniel J. Albregts. (MR)
April 2, 2020 Filing 3 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by GEICO Casualty Company. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Silvestri, James)
April 2, 2020 Filing 2 ERRATA to #1 Petition for Removal, by Defendant GEICO Casualty Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (Silvestri, James)
April 2, 2020 Filing 1 PETITION FOR REMOVAL from District Court, Clark County, Case Number A-20-811336-C, (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0978-5952143) by GEICO Casualty Company. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Silvestri, James) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Martinez-Antonio v. GEICO Casualty Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jessica Martinez-Antonio
Represented By: Marcus A. Berg
Represented By: Boyd B Moss, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GEICO Casualty Company
Represented By: James P Silvestri
Represented By: Steven M. Goldstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?