Breeling v. Hartford Life and Accident Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Cynthia Breeling
Defendant: Hartford Life and Accident Insurance Company
Case Number: 2:2020cv00727
Filed: April 22, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Presiding Judge: Jennifer A Dorsey
Referring Judge: Brenda Weksler
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1132
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 27, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 27, 2020 Filing 7 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Cynthia Breeling. Hartford Life and Accident Insurance Company waiver sent on 5/26/2020, answer due 7/25/2020. (Marcek, Cliff)
May 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting #5 Verified Petition for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Madison Tate Donaldson for Cynthia Breeling and approving Designation of Local Counsel Cliff W. Marcek. Signed by Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 5/11/2020. Any Attorney not yet registered with the Court's CM/ECF System shall submit a Registration Form on the Court's website #www.nvd.uscourts.gov(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
May 11, 2020 Filing 5 MOTION/VERIFIED PETITION for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice by Madison Tate Donaldson and DESIGNATION of Local Counsel Cliff W. Marcek (Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 0978-5999460) by Plaintiff Cynthia Breeling. (Marcek, Cliff)
May 11, 2020 Filing 4 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Cynthia Breeling. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Marcek, Cliff)
April 28, 2020 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Hartford Life and Accident Insurance Company. (JM)
April 28, 2020 Filing 2 PROPOSED SUMMONS to be issued by Plaintiff Cynthia Breeling. (Marcek, Cliff)
April 22, 2020 Case randomly assigned to Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey and Magistrate Judge Brenda Weksler. (JM)
April 22, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Cynthia Breeling (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0978-5976957) by Cynthia Breeling. Proof of service due by 7/21/2020. (Marcek, Cliff) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Breeling v. Hartford Life and Accident Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hartford Life and Accident Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cynthia Breeling
Represented By: Cliff W. Marcek
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?