Flores De Paz v. of America et al
Defendant: Chad Wolf, William Barr, Kerri Ann Quihuis, United States of America and Jeanne M. Kent
Petitioner: JOSE MOISES FLORES DE PAZ
Case Number: 2:2020cv00781
Filed: April 30, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 25, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 25, 2020 Filing 11 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Jose Moises Flores De Paz. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Gonzales, Xavier)
June 22, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE of Manual Filing by Defendants William Barr, Jeanne M. Kent, Kerri Ann Quihuis, Chad Wolf, United States of America re #9 Motion to Dismiss,,. Object: Disc, Volume(s): 1, Description: Audio of Bond Hearing - Exhibit C, manually filed with the Clerk's Office. (Smith, Brianna)
June 22, 2020 Filing 9 MOTION to Dismiss #1 Complaint,, by Defendants William Barr, Jeanne M. Kent, Kerri Ann Quihuis, Chad Wolf, United States of America. Responses due by 7/6/2020. Discovery Plan/Scheduling Order due by 8/6/2020. (Attachments: #1 Index, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D) (Smith, Brianna) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court.
June 12, 2020 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Unexecuted as to Jeanne M. Kent re #6 Summons Issued. (JQC)
June 12, 2020 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed re #6 Summons Issued United States of America served on 6/1/2020. (JQC)
May 29, 2020 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to William Barr, Jeanne M. Kent, Kerri Ann Quihuis, Chad Wolf, United States of America re #1 Complaint. (cc: USM - JQC)
May 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER. IT IS ORDERED the respondents will have 21 days from the date of service to file and serve an answer orotherwise respond to the petition. If the respondents file an answer to the petition, petitioner Jose Moises Flores De Paz willhave 14 days to file a reply to the answer. The respondents must file all exhibits relevant to their response, including the record ofthe bond proceedings, in chronological order. See Order for Details. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 5/29/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF -cc: USM - JQC)
May 4, 2020 Filing 4 STANDING ORDER. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Andrew P. Gordon. Judge Gordon's Chambers Practices, which are posted on the U.S. District Court, District of Nevada public website, may also be accessed directly via this hyperlink: #www.nvd.uscourts.gov. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JQC)
May 4, 2020 Filing 3 SUMMONS Issued as to William Barr, Jeanne M. Kent, Kerri Ann Quihuis, Chad Wolf, United States of America, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General re #1 Complaint. (JQC)
May 4, 2020 Case randomly assigned to Judge Andrew P. Gordon and Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe. (JQC)
May 1, 2020 Filing 2 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by JOSE MOISES FLORES DE PAZ. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Gonzales, Xavier)
May 1, 2020 Filing 1 First Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0978-5988986) by JOSE MOISES FLORES DE PAZ. Proof of service due by 7/30/2020. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons) (Gonzales, Xavier) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court. Modified on 5/1/2020 to reflect correct event (DKJ).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Flores De Paz v. of America et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chad Wolf
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William Barr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kerri Ann Quihuis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeanne M. Kent
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: JOSE MOISES FLORES DE PAZ
Represented By: Xavier Gonzales
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?