Georgeos v. Albertson's LLC
Plaintiff: Michael Georgeos
Defendant: Albertson's LLC
Case Number: 2:2020cv00823
Filed: May 7, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Presiding Judge: Daniel J Albregts
Referring Judge: Kent J Dawson
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 2, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 2, 2020 Filing 10 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Magistrate Judge Daniel J. Albregts on 7/2/2020. ORDER denying #8 Discovery Plan and Scheduling Order. The Court denies the parties' Joint Discovery Plan and Scheduling Order without prejudice due to its failure to correctly cite to and comply with the amended Local Rules. The Local Rules of Practice for the District of Nevada were amended and adopted on April 17, 2020. The parties are directed to review the amendments to the Local Rules, specifically Local Rules 26-1 through 26-7, and re-file a compliant discovery plan. (no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KL)
June 30, 2020 Filing 9 CLERK'S NOTICE Regarding Local Rule IC 5-1(b). ECF No. #8 was not filed pursuant to LR IC 5-1(b) by attorneys Michael C. Kane and Bradley J. Myers. Please note the signatory must be the attorney or pro se party who electronically files the document. No further action is required concerning this document at this time. (no image attached) (SLD)
June 30, 2020 Filing 8 Joint Stipulated Discovery Plan and Scheduling Order by Plaintiff Michael Georgeos. (Myers, Bradley)
June 5, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE of Rule 26(f) Meeting of Counsel on 6-08-2020 by Michael Georgeos. (Kane, Michael)
June 5, 2020 Filing 6 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Michael Georgeos. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Kane, Michael)
June 4, 2020 Filing 5 Joint STATUS REPORT by Defendant Albertson's LLC. (Burden, Jack)
May 11, 2020 Filing 4 STATEMENT REGARDING REMOVAL by Defendant Albertson's LLC. (Burden, Jack)
May 8, 2020 Filing 3 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Albertson's LLC that identifies all parties that have an interest in the outcome of this case. Corporate Parent Albertson's LLC, Corporate Parent Albertson's Companies, Corporate Parent Albertson's Stores SUB LLC, Corporate Parent Albertsons Stores Sub Holdings LLC, Other Affiliate Albertson's Holdings, LLC, Other Affiliate Safeway Inc., Other Affiliate AB Acquisition LLC, Other Affiliate ABS NV-O, LLC for Albertson's LLC added. (Burden, Jack)
May 7, 2020 Filing 2 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Judge Kent J. Dawson on 5/7/2020. Statement regarding removed action is due by 5/22/2020. Joint Status Report regarding removed action is due by 6/6/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
May 7, 2020 Filing 1 PETITION FOR REMOVAL from Eighth Judicial District Court, Case Number A-20-813647-C, (Filing fee $ 400) by Albertson's LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Index of Exhibits, #3 Exhibit A, #4 Exhibit B, #5 Exhibit C, #6 Exhibit D, #7 Exhibit E, #8 Exhibit F) (ADR)
May 7, 2020 Case randomly assigned to Judge Kent J. Dawson and Magistrate Judge Daniel J. Albregts. (ADR)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Georgeos v. Albertson's LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Albertson's LLC
Represented By: Xiao Wen Jin
Represented By: Jack P. Burden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Georgeos
Represented By: Jason C. Barron
Represented By: Bradley J. Myers
Represented By: Michael C. Kane
Represented By: Adam S. Kutner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?