Shetty v. U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services et al
Plaintiff: M.D., F.A.C.P. Kartika Shetty
Defendant: Kenneth Cuccinelli, U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services, Associate Director Tracy Renaud and Director Loren Miller
Case Number: 2:2020cv00909
Filed: May 20, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Presiding Judge: Kent J Dawson
Referring Judge: Brenda Weksler
Nature of Suit: Other Immigration Actions
Cause of Action: 08:1329
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 17, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER granting #15 Stipulation for extension of time (First Response) to Answer or otherwise plead to #1 Complaint. Answers are due 10/26/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Brenda Weksler on 7/16/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRS)
July 13, 2020 Filing 17 NOTICE of Corrected Image/Document re #15 Stipulation by Defendants Kenneth Cuccinelli, Loren Miller, Tracy Renaud, U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services. (Service of corrected image is attached.) (Addington, Gregory)
July 13, 2020 Filing 16 CLERK'S NOTICE. Attorney Action Required to ECF No. #15 Stipulation. ERROR: Incorrect case number on pleading. Counsel is advised to file a Notice of Corrected Image/Document and link to #15 . (no image attached) (EDS)
July 13, 2020 Filing 15 View Corrected Image #17 as to STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME (First Request) re #1 Complaint,, by Defendants Kenneth Cuccinelli, Loren Miller, Tracy Renaud, U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services. (Addington, Gregory) Modified on 7/13/2020 (EDS).
June 11, 2020 Filing 14 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Kartika Shetty re #1 Complaint,, #3 Summons Issued as to USA. U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services served on 5/27/2020. (Pierce, Daniel)
June 11, 2020 Filing 13 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Kartika Shetty re #1 Complaint,, #3 Summons Issued as to USA. Tracy Renaud served on 5/27/2020. (Pierce, Daniel)
June 11, 2020 Filing 12 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Kartika Shetty re #1 Complaint,, #3 Summons Issued as to USA. Loren Miller served on 5/29/2020. (Pierce, Daniel)
June 11, 2020 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Kartika Shetty re #1 Complaint,, #3 Summons Issued as to USA. Kenneth Cuccinelli served on 5/27/2020. (Pierce, Daniel)
May 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #7 First MOTION/VERIFIED PETITION for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice by Carl Hampe and DESIGNATION of Local Counsel Michael Lee (Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 0978-6018876) by Plaintiff Kartika Shetty. Signed by Judge Kent J. Dawson on 5/29/2020. Any Attorney not yet registered with the Court's CM/ECF System shall submit a Registration Form on the Court's website #www.nvd.uscourts.gov(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRS)
May 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #8 First MOTION/VERIFIED PETITION for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice by Daniel Pierce and DESIGNATION of Local Counsel Michael Lee Signed by Judge Kent J. Dawson on 5/29/2020. Any Attorney not yet registered with the Court's CM/ECF System shall submit a Registration Form on the Court's website #www.nvd.uscourts.gov(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRS)
May 27, 2020 Filing 8 First MOTION/VERIFIED PETITION for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice by Daniel Pierce and DESIGNATION of Local Counsel Michael Lee (Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 0978-6018889) by Plaintiff Kartika Shetty. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing) (Lee, Michael)
May 27, 2020 Filing 7 First MOTION/VERIFIED PETITION for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice by Carl Hampe and DESIGNATION of Local Counsel Michael Lee (Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 0978-6018876) by Plaintiff Kartika Shetty. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing) (Lee, Michael)
May 21, 2020 Filing 6 CIVIL COVER SHEET to #1 Complaint,, by Plaintiff Kartika Shetty. (Lee, Michael)
May 21, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE TO COUNSEL PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE IA 11-2. Counsel Carl W. Hampe and Daniel P. Pierce to comply with completion and filing of the Verified Petition and Designation of Local Counsel. For your convenience, click on the following link to obtain the form from the Court's website - #www.nvd.uscourts.gov. Upon approval of the Verified Petition, counsel is required to register for the Court's Case Management and Electronic Case Filing (CM/ECF) system and the electronic service of documents. Please visit the Court's website www.nvd.uscourts.gov to register Attorney. Verified Petition due by 6/4/2020. (no image attached) (EDS)
May 21, 2020 Filing 4 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Kartika Shetty. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Lee, Michael)
May 20, 2020 Filing 3 SUMMONS Issued as to All Defendants, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General re #1 Complaint. (Re-docketed due to clerical error in previous docketing, no substantive change to the actual summonses. DRS)
May 20, 2020 Filing 2 ERROR: Incorrect event used. Refiled by the Clerk's OfficeSummons Issued as to All Defendants re #1 Complaint. (DRS)
May 20, 2020 Case randomly assigned to Judge Kent J. Dawson and Magistrate Judge Brenda Weksler. (DRS)
May 20, 2020 Filing 1 First COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0978-6012213) by Kartika Shetty. Proof of service due by 8/18/2020. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Summons, #6 Summons, #7 Summons) (Lee, Michael) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Shetty v. U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kenneth Cuccinelli
Represented By: Gregory W. Addington
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services
Represented By: Gregory W. Addington
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Associate Director Tracy Renaud
Represented By: Gregory W. Addington
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Director Loren Miller
Represented By: Gregory W. Addington
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: M.D., F.A.C.P. Kartika Shetty
Represented By: Daniel P Pierce
Represented By: Michael B. Lee
Represented By: Carl W Hampe
Represented By: Daniel Paul Pierce
Represented By: Carl Walter Hampe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?