Charles v. State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Quiara Charles
Defendant: State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company
Case Number: 2:2020cv00962
Filed: May 28, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Presiding Judge: Gloria M Navarro
Referring Judge: Elayna J Youchah
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 20, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 20, 2020 Filing 12 NOTICE PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE IB 2-2: In accordance with 28 USC 636(c) and FRCP 73, the parties in this action are provided with a link to the "AO 85 Notice of Availability, Consent, and Order of Reference - Exercise of Jurisdiction by a U.S. Magistrate Judge" form on the Court's website - #www.nvd.uscourts.gov. AO 85 Consent forms should NOT be electronically filed. Upon consent of all parties, counsel are advised to manually file the form with the Clerk's Office. (A copy of form AO 85 has been mailed to parties not receiving electronic service.) (no image attached) (DRS)
July 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 SCHEDULING ORDER granting #10 Discovery Plan and Scheduling Order Discovery due by 2/22/2021. Motions due by 3/24/2021. Proposed Joint Pretrial Order due by 4/23/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elayna J. Youchah on 7/17/2020.(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRS)
July 17, 2020 Filing 10 Joint Stipulated Discovery Plan and Scheduling Order by Plaintiff Quiara Charles. (Gazda, Lewis)
July 17, 2020 Filing 9 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Quiara Charles. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Gazda, Lewis)
June 25, 2020 Filing 8 Joint STATUS REPORT REGARDING REMOVED ACTION by Defendant State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company. (Grames, Cheryl)
June 12, 2020 Filing 7 STATEMENT REGARDING REMOVAL by Defendant State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company. (Grames, Cheryl)
June 4, 2020 Filing 6 ANSWER to Complaint filed by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company. Discovery Plan/Scheduling Order due by 7/19/2020.(Grames, Cheryl) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court.
May 28, 2020 Filing 5 STANDING ORDER. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Judge Gloria M. Navarro. Judge Navarro's Chambers Practices, which are posted on the U.S. District Court, District of Nevada public website, may also be accessed directly via this hyperlink #www.nvd.uscourts.gov. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
May 28, 2020 Filing 4 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 5/28/2020. Statement regarding removed action is due by 6/12/2020. Joint Status Report regarding removed action is due by 6/27/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
May 28, 2020 Case randomly assigned to Judge Gloria M. Navarro and Magistrate Judge Elayna J. Youchah. (JM)
May 28, 2020 Filing 3 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Defendant State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company. (Grames, Cheryl)
May 28, 2020 Filing 2 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Grames, Cheryl)
May 28, 2020 Filing 1 PETITION FOR REMOVAL from District Court, Clark County, Nevada, Case Number A-20-812633-C, (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0978-6021213) by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet) (Grames, Cheryl) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Charles v. State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company
Represented By: Pamela L. McGaha
Represented By: Robert W Freeman, Jr.
Represented By: Cheryl A. Grames
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Quiara Charles
Represented By: Afshin Tadayon
Represented By: Lewis Gazda
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?