Hryronak v. Walgreens Company et al
Plaintiff: Stephen Hryronak
Defendant: Walgreens Company, Apotex Corp., Walgreen Co and Apotex, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2020cv00963
Filed: May 28, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Presiding Judge: Richard F Boulware
Referring Judge: Brenda Weksler
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 18, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 18, 2020 Filing 6 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 6/18/2020. In light of the facts stipulated to by the parties in #5 Stipulation and Order to Remand to Eighth Judicial District Court, the Court finds that it lacks subject matter jurisdiction over this action, as the case was removed on the basis of diversity jurisdiction pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1332, but the stipulated amount in controversy does not satisfy the jurisdictional threshold. IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED that this action is remanded back to the Eighth Judicial District Court (Case No.: A-20-810450-C). The Clerk of Court is instructed to close this case. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - CVL)
June 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 STIPULATION and Order to Remand to Eighth Judicial District Court by Plaintiff Stephen Hryronak. (Ryan, Daniel)
May 29, 2020 Filing 4 STANDING ORDER. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Judge Richard F. Boulware, II. Judge Boulware's Chambers Practices, which are posted on the U.S. District Court, District of Nevada public website, may also be accessed directly via this hyperlink: #www.nvd.uscourts.gov. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
May 28, 2020 Filing 3 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Apotex Corp., Apotex, Inc.. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Daehnke, Patricia)
May 28, 2020 Filing 2 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 5/28/2020. Statement regarding removed action is due by 6/12/2020. Joint Status Report regarding removed action is due by 6/27/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
May 28, 2020 Case randomly assigned to Judge Richard F. Boulware, II and Magistrate Judge Brenda Weksler. (ADR)
May 28, 2020 Filing 1 PETITION FOR REMOVAL from District Court of Clark County, Nevada, Case Number A-20-810450-C, (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0978-6021219) by Apotex, Inc., Apotex Corp.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Daehnke, Patricia) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hryronak v. Walgreens Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walgreens Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Apotex Corp.
Represented By: Patricia E. Daehnke
Represented By: Linda K Rurangirwa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walgreen Co
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Apotex, Inc.
Represented By: Patricia E. Daehnke
Represented By: Linda K Rurangirwa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stephen Hryronak
Represented By: Robert W. Cottle
Represented By: Daniel M Ryan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?