SP Plus Corporation v. General Teamsters, Airline, Aerospace, and Allied Employees, Warehousemen, Drivers, Construction, Rock and Sand, Local Union No. 986
Plaintiff: SP Plus Corporation
Defendant: General Teamsters, Airline, Aerospace, and Allied Employees, Warehousemen, Drivers, Construction, Rock and Sand, Local Union No. 986
Case Number: 2:2020cv00966
Filed: May 28, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Presiding Judge: Daniel J Albregts
Referring Judge: Jennifer A Dorsey
Nature of Suit: Labor: Labor/Mgt. Relations
Cause of Action: 29:185
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 23, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 23, 2020 Filing 7 ANSWER to #3 Answer to Complaint,,,, Counterclaim,,, filed by SP Plus Corporation.(Trimmer, Paul)
July 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER Granting #5 Verified Petition for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice Edward M. Gleason, Jr and approving Designation of Local Counsel Nathan R. Ring. Signed by Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 7/9/2020. Any Attorney not yet registered with the Court's CM/ECF System shall submit a Registration Form on the Court's website #www.nvd.uscourts.gov(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JQC)
July 9, 2020 Filing 5 MOTION/VERIFIED PETITION for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice by Edward M. Gleason, Jr. and DESIGNATION of Local Counsel Nathan R. Ring (Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 0978-6076396) by Defendant General Teamsters, Airline, Aerospace, and Allied Employees, Warehousemen, Drivers, Construction, Rock and Sand, Local Union No. 986, Counter Claimant General Teamsters, Airline, Aerospace, and Allied Employees, Warehousemen, Drivers, Construction, Rock and Sand, Local Union No. 986. (Ring, Nathan)
July 2, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE TO COUNSEL PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE IA 11-2. Counsel Edward M. Gleason, Jr. to comply with completion and filing of the Verified Petition and Designation of Local Counsel. For your convenience, click on the following link to obtain the form from the Court's website - #www.nvd.uscourts.gov. Upon approval of the Verified Petition, counsel is required to register for the Court's Case Management and Electronic Case Filing (CM/ECF) system and the electronic service of documents. Please visit the Court's website www.nvd.uscourts.gov to register Attorney. Verified Petition due by 7/16/2020. (no image attached) (DKJ)
July 2, 2020 Filing 3 ANSWER to #1 Complaint,, (, Discovery Plan/Scheduling Order due by 8/16/2020.), COUNTERCLAIM against SP Plus Corporation by General Teamsters, Airline, Aerospace, and Allied Employees, Warehousemen, Drivers, Construction, Rock and Sand, Local Union No. 986. filed by General Teamsters, Airline, Aerospace, and Allied Employees, Warehousemen, Drivers, Construction, Rock and Sand, Local Union No. 986. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit)(Ring, Nathan) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court.
May 29, 2020 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to General Teamsters, Airline, Aerospace, and Allied Employees, Warehousemen, Drivers, Construction, Rock and Sand, Local Union No. 986. (JQC)
May 29, 2020 Case randomly assigned to Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey and Magistrate Judge Daniel J. Albregts. (JQC)
May 28, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT to Vacate Arbitration Award against General Teamsters, Airline, Aerospace, and Allied Employees, Warehousemen, Drivers, Construction, Rock and Sand, Local Union No. 986 (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0978-6021490) by SP Plus Corporation. Proof of service due by 8/26/2020. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Civil Cover Sheet, #7 Summons) (Trimmer, Paul) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court. Modified event on 5/29/2020(MMM).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: SP Plus Corporation v. General Teamsters, Airline, Aerospace, and Allied Employees, Warehousemen, Drivers, Construction, Rock and Sand, Local Union No. 986
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: General Teamsters, Airline, Aerospace, and Allied Employees, Warehousemen, Drivers, Construction, Rock and Sand, Local Union No. 986
Represented By: Edward M. Gleason, Jr.
Represented By: Nathan R. Ring
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SP Plus Corporation
Represented By: Lynne McChrystal
Represented By: Paul T. Trimmer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?